Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:19-bk-36313

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:David R Jones
Case #: 4:21-ap-03270
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2021
Terminated:Feb 16, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
JS Compliance, LLC
330 Rayford Road Suite 319
Spring, TX 77386
Represented By
JS Compliance, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Dean Foods Company
2711 Haskell Avenue Suite 3400
Dallas, TX 75204
Represented By
Kara E. Casteel
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:11 PM CDT
Monday, October 30, 2023
12 12 trustee Remark (batch) Mon 10/30 11:28 AM
Remark: Judge Christopher M. Lopez added to case. Involvement of Judge Marvin Isgur Terminated. . (RosarioSaldana)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 16, 2022
court Close Adversary Case Wed 02/16 2:46 PM
Adversary Case 4:21-ap-3270 Closed. (emiller)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 06, 2021
11 11 notice Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Wed 10/06 9:08 AM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Daniel H. Golden (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 09, 2021
10 10 notice Notice Thu 09/09 11:22 AM
Notice of Scheduling of Mediation . Filed by Daniel H. Golden(Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, August 12, 2021
9 9 notice Notice Thu 08/12 10:59 AM
Notice of Selection of Mediator . Filed by Daniel H. Golden (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 03, 2021
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 08/03 3:53 PM
Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand Related [+] Filed by JS Compliance, LLC (Voge, Jamey)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, June 21, 2021
7 7 notice Notice Mon 06/21 10:58 PM
Notice of Service of Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures . Filed by Dean Foods Company (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 12, 2021
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 05/12 4:47 PM
Summons Service Executed on JS Compliance, LLC 5/11/2021. (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 05, 2021
5 5 court Summons Issued Wed 05/05 11:47 AM
Summons Issued on JS Compliance, LLC Date Issued 5/5/2021. (gkel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 04, 2021
4 4 misc Summons - Request for Issuance Tue 05/04 10:22 AM
Request for Issuance of Summons on JS Compliance, LLC. (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 02, 2021
3 3 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 05/02 11:44 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 05/02/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Order Regarding the Exchange of Exhibits and Witness lists in all contested matters and adversary proceedings
Friday, April 30, 2021
2 2 order Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists (Adversary) Fri 04/30 6:00 AM
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 29, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint [system event] Thu 04/29 12:52 PM
Adversary case 21-03270 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Complaint by Dean Foods Company against JS Compliance, LLC. Fee Amount $350 (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
crditcrd none Thu 04/29 1:38 PM
Receipt of Complaint 21-03270 [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 22997673. Fee amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]