Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:J Philip Calabrese
Case #: 1:21-cv-00904
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2021
Terminated:Sep 30, 2021
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 27, 2021 7:16 AM EDT
Defendant
Lisa Carmichael
Represented By
Giselle S. Spencer
Ennis Britton
contact info
Robert J. McBride
Ennis Britton
contact info
Kyle A. Wheeler
Ennis Britton
contact info
Defendant
Chris Miller
Represented By
Giselle S. Spencer
Ennis Britton
contact info
Robert J. McBride
Ennis Britton
contact info
Kyle A. Wheeler
Ennis Britton
contact info
Defendant
Ontario Local School District Board of Education
Represented By
Giselle S. Spencer
Ennis Britton
contact info
Robert J. McBride
Ennis Britton
contact info
Kyle A. Wheeler
Ennis Britton
contact info
Plaintiff
Terance Trammell
Represented By
Carrie J. Dyer
Mansell Law
contact info
Gregory R. Mansell
Mansell Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Thursday, September 30, 2021
12 12 2 pgs notice Notice of Dismissal Thu 09/30 4:27 PM
Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by Terance Trammell. (Mansell, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 09, 2021
11 11 1 pgs minutes Mediation Conference ~Util - Terminate Referral Thu 09/09 3:41 PM
Minutes of proceedings before Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. Mediation Conference held on 9/9/2021. The parties were able to reach an agreement. The parties shall file a notice of dismissal with prejudice by the close of business (5:00 pm) on September 30, 2021. The Court shall retainjurisdiction to enforce the terms of the settlement agreement. (Court Reporter/ECRO: J. Lowbridge) (Time: 4 hrs.) (S,S)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 16, 2021
10 10 6 pgs order Order Fri 07/16 10:37 AM
Order Setting Mediation Conference for 9/9/2021 at 10:00 a.m. via video conference (Cleveland) before Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. Confidential Mediation Statements due 9/2/2021. All parties and lead counsel are ordered to appear for the conference by Zoom videoconferencing. Parties with ultimate settlement authority must also be present. Counsel will receive, via email, an invite to the scheduled mediation conference, as well as instructions regarding usage. Counsel in turn, shall forward the invite and instructions to their clients, and are responsible for ensuring their clients' participation in the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg on 7/16/2021. (S,S)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 14, 2021
order Minute Order _ Case Management Conference Order of Referral to Judicial Officer for Mediation or Settlement Wed 07/14 3:44 PM
Minute Order [non-document]: The Court held a Case Management Conference by phone on July 14, 2021. Carrie Dyer appeared for Plaintiff. Kyle Wheeler and Giselle Spencer appeared for Defendants. The parties agreed that he case is appropriate for mediation at this time. Therefore, under N.D. Ohio Local Rule 16.4(e), this matter is referred to United States Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenburg for mediation. Counsel will receive further instructions from Judge Greenberg's chambers. Judge J. Philip Calabrese on 7/14/2021. (Y,A)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 07, 2021
9 9 2 pgs motion Attend by Telephone Wed 07/07 11:46 AM
Unopposed Motion to attend Case Management Conference by telephone filed by Plaintiff Terance Trammell. (Dyer, Carrie)
Related: [-]
8 8 4 pgs notice Report of Parties Planning Meeting (atty event) Wed 07/07 11:44 AM
Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Terance Trammell. (Dyer, Carrie)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Notice of Hearing or Conference Wed 07/07 11:53 AM
IMPORTANT: Notice [non-document]: The case management conference scheduled for 7/14/2021 at 3:00 PM will now be held by telephone. The Court will email counsel dial-in information prior to the conference. (Y,A)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 28, 2021
7 7 10 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Mon 06/28 5:12 PM
Answer to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Lisa Carmichael, Chris Miller, Ontario Local School District Board of Education. (Spencer, Giselle)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 19, 2021
6 6 3 pgs order Case Management Conference Scheduling Order Wed 05/19 3:18 PM
Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 7/14/2021 at 3:00 PM in Chambers 16B before Judge J. Philip Calabrese. SO ORDERED . Judge J. Philip Calabrese on 5/19/2021. (Y,A)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 5 pgs Rule 26 Report of Parties
Tuesday, May 18, 2021
5 5 1 pgs service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 05/18 1:44 PM
Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Lisa Carmichael. Lisa Carmichael waiver sent on 4/30/2021, answer due 6/29/2021 filed on behalf of Lisa Carmichael (Spencer, Giselle)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 05/18 1:43 PM
Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Chris Miller. Chris Miller waiver sent on 4/30/2021, answer due 6/29/2021 filed on behalf of Chris Miller (Spencer, Giselle)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 05/18 1:42 PM
Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Ontario Local School District Board of Education. Ontario Local School District Board of Education waiver sent on 4/30/2021, answer due 6/29/2021 filed on behalf of Ontario Local School District Board of Education (Spencer, Giselle)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 30, 2021
2 2 2 pgs oth_evt Magistrate Consent Form Issued by Intake Fri 04/30 4:08 PM
Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons not provided, therefore not issued. (M,MT)
Related: [-]
1 1 11 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 04/30 2:50 PM
Complaint with jury demand against all Defendants. Filing fee paid $402.00, Receipt number AOHNDC-10809911. Filed by Terance Trammell. (Dyer, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Exhibit A - EEOC Notice of RTS,
Att: 2 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judge Fri 04/30 4:07 PM
Judge J. Philip Calabrese assigned to case. (M,MT)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Fri 04/30 4:07 PM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (M,MT)
Related: [-]