Virginia Eastern District Court
Case #: 1:21-cr-00049
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2021
Last checked: Saturday May 01, 2021 3:21 AM EDT
Defendant
Matthew Erausquin (1)
Represented By
Christopher Bryan Amolsch
Law Office Of Christopher Amolsch
contact info
Frank Salvato
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Maureen Cain
Us Attorney'S Office (alexandria)
contact info
Whitney Kramer
Us Attorney'S Office (alexandria)
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2021 4:38 AM EDT
Monday, November 16, 2020
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Matthew Erausquin (1). (dest, ) [1:20-mj-00312-MSN]
Related: [-]
2 2 AFFIDAVIT by USA as to Matthew Erausquin1 Complaint (dest, ) [1:20-mj-00312-MSN]
Related: [-]
4 4 Redacted Criminal Case Cover Sheet (dest, ) [1:20-mj-00312-MSN]
Related: [-]
5 5 MOTION to Seal by USA as to Matthew Erausquin. (dest, ) [1:20-mj-00312-MSN]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER granting5 Motion to Seal until the arrest of the defendant as to Matthew Erausquin (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 11/16/2020. (dest, ) [1:20-mj-00312-MSN]
Related: [-]
7 7 Arrest Warrant Issued by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson in case as to Matthew Erausquin. (dest, ) [1:20-mj-00312-MSN]
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 19, 2020
Case unsealed as to Matthew Erausquin per A-USA (Maureen Cain- JFA chambers (DS). (dest, ) [1:20-mj-00312-MSN] (Entered: 11/19/2020)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 01, 2020
Arrest of Matthew Erausquin in Southern District of Florida (Miami). (dest, ) [1:20-mj-00312-MSN]
Related: [-]
8 8 Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to Matthew Erausquin (dest, ) [1:20-mj-00312-MSN]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 14, 2020
9 9 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict by USA as to Matthew Erausquin.(Cain, Maureen) [1:20-mj-00312-MSN]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
10 10 ORDER granting9 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Indictment as to Matthew Erausquin (1). IT IS ORDERED that the deadline to indict the defendant in this matter is hereby extended to February 18, 2021. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 12/14/2020. (dest, ) [1:20-mj-00312-MSN]
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 26, 2020
11 11 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Frank Salvato appearing for Matthew Erausquin And Notice as to Attorney Schedule (Salvato, Frank) [1:20-mj-00312-MSN]
Related: [-]
12 12 First MOTION for Release of Brady Materials by Matthew Erausquin. (Salvato, Frank) [1:20-mj-00312-MSN]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 21, 2021
13 13 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Christopher Bryan Amolsch appearing for Matthew Erausquin (Amolsch, Christopher) [1:20-mj-00312-MSN]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 11, 2021
14 14 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict by USA as to Matthew Erausquin.(Cain, Maureen) [1:20-mj-00312-MSN]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, February 12, 2021
15 15 Reply to Motion by Matthew Erausquin re14 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict (Salvato, Frank) [1:20-mj-00312-MSN]
Related: [-]
16 16 ORDERED that the deadline to indict the defendant in this matter is hereby extended to March 31, 2021. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 02/12/2021. (choy, ) [1:20-mj-00312-MSN]
Related: [-]
17 17 ORDERED that the government arrange for defendant to be transported to this district without further delay, unless there is good reason for delay which the government submits to the Court and to defense counsel. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 02/12/2021. (choy, )(c/s on 02/12/2021) [1:20-mj-00312-MSN]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 19, 2021
18 18 4 pgs Memorandum by USA as to Matthew Erausquin re: status of Defendant's transport (Cain, Maureen) [1:20-mj-00312-MSN]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 25, 2021
19 19 Reply by Matthew Erausquin To Government Status Update (Salvato, Frank) [1:20-mj-00312-MSN]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 26, 2021
20 20 ORDERED that the Complaint will be dismissed if the defendant is not produced in this district and housed in Alexandria Adult Detention Center by Monday, March 8, 2021. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 02/26/2021. (choy, )(c/s on 02/26/2021) [1:20-mj-00312-MSN]
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 07, 2021
21 21 NOTICE Of Position on Scheduling by Matthew Erausquin (Salvato, Frank) [1:20-mj-00312-MSN]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 08, 2021
22 22 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 03/05/2021 as to Matthew Erausquin. (choy, ) [1:20-mj-00312-MSN]
Related: [-]
23 23 Video or Telephone Conferencing Order for Criminal Proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 3/8/21. (tfitz, ) [1:20-mj-00312-MSN]
Related: [-]
24 24 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan: USA appeared through Maureen Cain. Deft appeared w/counsel Chris Amolsch & Frank Salvato. Rule 5 Hearing held in arresting district (Southern District of Florida). Status Conference as to Matthew Erausquin held via zoom on 3/8/2021. Deft requests continuance for PH/DH-Granted. Preliminary/Detention Hearing set for 3/22/2021 at 02:00 PM in Alexandria Remote before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. Deft remanded to the custody of the USMS. (Tape #FTR.)(tfitz, ) [1:20-mj-00312-MSN]
Related: [-]
25 25 Temporary Detention Order as to Matthew Erausquin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 3/8/21. (tfitz, ) [1:20-mj-00312-MSN]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 10, 2021
26 26 Addendum to Pretrial Services Bond Report (Sealed Document) as to Matthew Erausquin (smith, teneisha) [1:20-mj-00312-MSN]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 18, 2021
Detention Hearing set for 3/22/2021 at 02:30 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 400 before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. Preliminary Hearing set for 3/22/2021 at 02:30 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 400 before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff (per MSN chambers). (lcre, ) [1:20-mj-00312-MSN]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 22, 2021
27 27 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict by USA as to Matthew Erausquin.(Cain, Maureen) [1:20-mj-00312-MSN]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
28 28 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff:Preliminary Hearing as to Matthew Erausquin held on 3/22/2021. US appeared through Maureen Cain. Deft appeared with counsel Frank Salvato and Christopher Amolsch. Govt adduced evidence. Govt rest. Govt's Exhibit 1 admitted into evidence. Court finds PC. Detention Hearing as to Matthew Erausquin held on 3/22/2021. Govt seeks detention. Deft argued for bond-GRANTED. Matter continued for further proceedings before the Grand Jury. Deft release pending meeting all conditions in Order Setting Conditions of Release. (Tape #FTR.)(lcre, ) [1:20-mj-00312-MSN]
Related: [-]
29 29 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Matthew Erausquin (1) PR bond with conditions entered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 3/22/2021. (lcre, ) (Main Document 29 replaced on 3/25/2021) (lcre, ). Modified on 3/25/2021 (lcre, ). [1:20-mj-00312-MSN]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 23, 2021
30 30 ORDERED that the Joint Motion to Extend Time Period for Indictment is GRANTED; The period of this extension is excludable time for the reasons states in the aforementioned Motion; No further extension will be permitted. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 03/23/2021. (choy, ) [1:20-mj-00312-MSN]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 25, 2021
31 31 PR Bond with conditions Entered as to Matthew Erausquin (lcre, ) (Main Document 31 replaced on 3/25/2021) (lcre, ). (Main Document 31 replaced on 4/28/2021) (choy, ). [1:20-mj-00312-MSN]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 30, 2021
32 32 MOTION ON CONDITIONS OF RELEASE by Matthew Erausquin.(Amolsch, Christopher) [1:20-mj-00312-MSN]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
33 33 ORDERED that the Defendant's Motion on Conditions of Release is GRANTED; that Mr. Erausquin is permitted to travel from the Middle District of Pennsylvania to the Eastern District of Virginia so that he might meet with Counsel, both now and in the future, for as long as he remains on pretrial release; that Counsel need not file a Motion with the Court each time Mr. Erausquin wishes to travel from the Middle District of Pennsylvania to the Eastern District of Virginia so that he might meet with Counsel, as long as Mr. Erausquin first obtains the permission of his pretrial services officer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 03/30/2021. (choy, )(c/s on 03/31/2021) [1:20-mj-00312-MSN]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 28, 2021
34 34 INDICTMENT as to Matthew Erausquin (1) counts 1-6, 7, 8, 9-11. (kgall)
Related: [-]
37 37 Redacted Criminal Case Cover Sheet. (kgall)
Related: [-]