South Dakota District Court
Case #: 4:21-mj-00070
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2021
Terminated:May 04, 2021
Last checked: Saturday May 01, 2021 2:30 AM CDT
Defendant
David Robert Farrell (1)
Represented By
Amanda D. Kippley
Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jeffrey C. Clapper
U.S. Attorney'S Office (sioux Falls, Sd)
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/23/2021 5:09 PM CDT
Thursday, April 29, 2021
Set Hearing as to David Robert Farrell: Preliminary Hearing set for 5/10/2021 at 2:30 PM in Sioux Falls Courtroom 3 - Room 117* before US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy. (CG)
Related: [-]
1 1 2 pgs COMPLAINT as to David Robert Farrell (1). NOTICE REGARDING COOPERATOR INFORMATION: All plea agreements and sentencing memoranda contain a sealed supplement which includes either a statement there was cooperation or a statement there was no cooperation. It is not possible to determine from examination of docket entries whether a defendant did or did not cooperate with the government. (DJP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 5 pgs Affidavit
2 2 Final BAIL Report as to David Robert Farrell. In a multi-defendant case, access to this document is restricted to counsel of record for the defendant and government counsel. (Dumdei, Sheila)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy: Arraignment as to David Robert Farrell held on 4/29/2021; Detention Hearing as to David Robert Farrell held on 4/29/2021; Initial Appearance as to David Robert Farrell held on 4/29/2021. TEXT ORDER. Pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the Court confirms the United States' obligation to disclose to the defendant all exculpatory evidence--that is, evidence that favors the defendant or casts doubt on the United States' case, as required by Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny, and ORDERS the United States to do so. Failure to disclose exculpatory evidence in a timely manner may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, or sanctions by the Court . (Court Reporter: FTR #3) (DJP)
Related: [-]
4 4 3 pgs ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to David Robert Farrell Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 4/29/2021. (DJP)
Related: [-]
5 5 3 pgs SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER as to David Robert Farrell. Suppression Voluntariness Motion due by 5/11/2021. Motions due by 6/15/2021. Plea Agreement due by 6/15/2021. Jury Trial set for 6/29/2021 at 9:00 AM in Sioux Falls Courtroom 2* before U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 4/29/21. (SKK)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Amanda D. Kippley appearing for David Robert Farrell. (Kippley, Amanda)
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs REQUEST for Notice Pursuant To Fed. R. Evid. 404(b) by David Robert Farrell . (Kippley, Amanda)
Related: [-]
8 8 2 pgs REQUEST for Notice Pursuant To Fed. R. Evid. 609(b) by David Robert Farrell . (Kippley, Amanda)
Related: [-]