Illinois Northern District Court
Case #: 1:20-cr-00513
Case Filed:Aug 18, 2020
Last checked: Sunday May 02, 2021 2:17 AM CDT
Defendant
Noah J. Grimes (1)
Represented By
Marci L. Sahinoglu
Law Office Of Michael J. Monaco
contact info
Michael Joseph Monaco
Law Office Of Michael J. Monaco
contact info
Defendant
Katarzyna J. Podgorska (2)
Represented By
Donald John Angelini, Jr.
Angelini & Ori, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Pretrial Services
contact info
Kathryn E Malizia
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Matthew Hernandez
United States Attorney'S Office (ndil - Chicago)
contact info
AUSA - Chicago
United States Attorney'S Office (ndil - Chicago)
contact info

GPO Apr 29 2021
PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING DISCOVERY as to Noah J. Grimes, Katarzyna J. Podgorska. Signed by the Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 4/29/2021.Mailed notice (rj, )PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING DISCOVERY as to Noah J. Grimes, Katarzyna J. Podgorska. Signed by the Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 4/29/2021.Mailed notice (rj, )

Docket last updated: 04/25/2025 2:01 PM CDT
Tuesday, August 18, 2020
1 1 10 pgs INDICTMENT as to Noah J. Grimes (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4-10, 11, Katarzyna J. Podgorska (2) count(s) 1, 3, 8-10 (sxb, )
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs DESIGNATION Sheet: FELONY (Category 2). (sxb, )
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz as to Noah J. Grimes, Katarzyna J. Podgorska: To issue bench warrant. The government will seek to have the defendant detained without bond pursuant to Title 18, United States Code, Section 3142 as to Noah J. Grimes and Katarzyna J. Podgorska. The District Court Clerk's Office is directed to disclose to the Assistant U.S. Attorney assigned to this case for the government, the name of the judge, magistrate judge, and the docket number assigned to this case, in order to expedite the arraignment of the arrested defendant(s). Prior to sealing, the government requests that four (4) certified copies of the indictment and the arrest warrant for Noah J. Grimes to be provided to the Assistant U.S. Attorney assigned to this case, Kathryn Malizia, kathryn.malizia@usdoj.gov, and to IRS Special Agent John Leonard, in order to execute the extradition and arrest of the defendant(s). It is hereby ordered that the indictment and arrest warrants be sealed until the time of the arrest of all defendants in this case or further order of the court, whichever occurs earlier. This order does not prohibit law enforcement personnel from disclosing the indictment and arrest warrants as necessary to facilitate the enforcement of criminal law, including the execution of the warrants, to any federal official, including appropriate U.S. Embassy and State Department personnel; official of the Australian government, or law enforcement personnel in Australia; to assist the official receiving the information in the performance of that official's duties. (sxb, )
Related: [-]