Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Darrin P Gayles
Referred: Edwin G Torres
Case #: 1:21-cv-21698
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:0101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:May 03, 2021
Terminated:Aug 29, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Oct 30, 2021 5:23 AM EDT
Defendant
Google, LLC.
1201 Hays Street
Tallahassee, FL 32301
Represented By
Brian M. Willen
Wilson Sonsini Goodrick & Rosati, P.C.
contact info
David T. Coulter
Stearns Weaver Miller Weissler Alhadeff , Sitterson, P.A.
contact info
Lucy Yen
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, P.C.
contact info
Jay Brian Shapiro
Stearns Weaver Miller Weissler Alhadeff & Sitterson
contact info
Defendant
YouTube, Inc.
1000 Cherry Avenue
San Bruno, CA 94066
Represented By
David T. Coulter
Stearns Weaver Miller Weissler Alhadeff , Sitterson, P.A.
contact info
Jay Brian Shapiro
Stearns Weaver Miller Weissler Alhadeff & Sitterson
contact info
Defendant
Youtube, LLC.
901 Cherry Avenue
San Bruno, CA 94066
Represented By
Brian M. Willen
Wilson Sonsini Goodrick & Rosati, P.C.
contact info
David T. Coulter
Stearns Weaver Miller Weissler Alhadeff , Sitterson, P.A.
contact info
Lucy Yen
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, P.C.
contact info
Jay Brian Shapiro
Stearns Weaver Miller Weissler Alhadeff & Sitterson
contact info
Plaintiff
ATHOS OVERSEAS, LTD.
3860 SW 8th Street, PH
Coral Gables, FL 33193
Represented By
Reinaldo J. Dorta, Jr.
Dorta & Ortega, P.A.
contact info
Omar Ortega
Dorta & Ortega, P.A.
contact info
Natalie A. Ferral
Dorta , Ortega, P.A.
contact info
Rosdaisy Rodriguez Arriaga
Dorta , Ortega, P.A.
contact info

GPO Mar 29 2022
ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants, YouTube, Inc., YouTube, LLC, and Google LLC's 14 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles. See attached document for full details. (bhy)
GPO Nov 16 2022
ORDER granting 103 Plaintiff's Jury Demand or, Alternatively, Motion for Jury Trial. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles. See attached document for full details. (bhy)
GPO Aug 29 2023
AMENDED REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 115 and 113 (Motions for Summary Judgment), CORRECTING Scrivener's Errors ONLY and VACATING 171. No Additional Objections Period Applicable. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 8/29/2023. See attached document for full details. (jfz) Modified event on 8/29/2023 (pes).
GPO Aug 29 2023
ORDER AFFIRMING AND ADOPTING 185 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re Plaintiff Athos Overseas, Ltd.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, [ECF Nos. 113, 125], and Defendants YouTube, Inc., YouTube, LLC, and Google LLC's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment, [ECF Nos. 115, 134-1].The Status Conference set for August 30, 2023, at 10:00 A.M. is CANCELLED. This action is CLOSED for administrative purposes. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 8/29/2023. See attached document for full details. (nce)
GPO May 02 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 191 Defendants' motion for costs and 196 Defendants' motion for attorneys' fees. We recommend that Defendants' motion for costs be granted in part and denied in part, and Defendants' motion for attorneys' fees be granted in part and denied in part. Objections to R&R due by 5/16/2024. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 5/2/2024. See attached document for full details. (MJS)
GPO Jul 16 2024
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS; granting 191 Motion for Bill of Costs; granting in part and denying in part 196 Motion for Attorney Fees; Adopting 206 Report and Recommendations on 191 Motion for Bill of Costs filed by Youtube, LLC., Google, LLC., 196 Motion for Attorney Fees, filed by Youtube, LLC., Google, LLC., 206 Report and Recommendations,. Certificate of Appealability: No Ruling. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 7/16/2024. See attached document for full details. (nwn)

Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
216 216 order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Wed 09/04 1:27 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER. Based on the214 Notice of Withdrawal, Attorney David T. Coulter shall be withdrawn as counsel of record for the Defendants. Defendants shall continue to be represented by the law firms Wilson Sonsini Goodrich and Rosati and Stearns Weaver Miller Weissler Alhadeff & Sitterson, P.A. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 9/4/2024. (aci)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
215 215 notice Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney Fri 08/30 8:48 AM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re214 Notice (Other). Wrong Event Selected - Document is a Motion ; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. A motion event must always be selected when filing a motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document. (cds)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
214 214 notice Notice (Other) Thu 08/29 2:36 PM
Defendant's NOTICE of Withdrawal as Counsel by Google, LLC., YouTube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Shapiro, Jay)
Related: [-]