Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Bernard A Friedman
Referred: Anthony P Patti
Case #: 2:21-cv-11007
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgement
Case Filed:May 03, 2021
Terminated:Feb 22, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Oct 30, 2021 6:12 AM EDT
Defendant
Tracey Abdur-Rasheed
Defendant
Orthopedic Physical Therapy & Rehabilitation, LLC
Defendant
Revival Physical Therapy LLC
Defendant
Scan True, LLC
Defendant
Sinai University Medical Group PC
Defendant
Tox Testing, Inc.
Defendant
US Healthcare MI, PC
Defendant
United One Medical Transportation LLC
Defendant
Nileshkumar G. Patel, M.D.
Defendant
Colita Coles
Defendant
Michael Davis
Defendant
DeMonio Dukes
Defendant
Deon Edwards
Defendant
Yolanda Houston
Defendant
Cathy Jones
Defendant
Mario Jones
Defendant
Tanae Rasheed
Defendant
Kavell Rashid
Defendant
Britney Robinson
Defendant
Justin Sandifer
Defendant
Abdul Shabazz
Defendant
Canaan Thomas
Defendant
Deontae Thompson
Defendant
Robert Thompson
Defendant
American Specialty Pharmacy, Inc.
Defendant
Ascension Macomb Oakland Hospital
Defendant
Auto RX, LC
Defendant
Muhammad Awaisi, M.D.
Defendant
Biomolecular Integrations, Inc.
Defendant
Citizens Insurance Company of the Midwest
400 Lincoln Street
Worcester, MA 01653
Represented By
Timothy M. O'Connor
Hewson And Vanhellemont
contact info
Defendant
City 2 City Transportation, LLC
Defendant
Five Star Comfort Care, LLC
Defendant
GREATER LAKES AMBULATORY SURGICAL CENTER, LLC
Defendant
American Medical Center
Defendant
Akhtar A. Ali, Ph.D.
Defendant
Level 1 Physical Therapy & Rehab, LLC
Defendant
Meds Direct Pharmacy #2
Defendant
Michigan Institute of Musculoskeletal Medicine
Defendant
Mobile MRI Staffing, LLC
Defendant
Mobile MRI, LLC
Defendant
Northland Healthcare Services, PLLC
Defendant
Optimal Therapy
Defendant
Orchard Laboratories Corp. d/b/a Orchard Toxicology
Defendant
Orthopedic Medical Supplies, Inc.
Plaintiff
West Bend Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By
Jason Fathallah
Husch Blackwell LLP
contact info
A J Fabianczyk
Husch Blackwell LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Prescription Partners, LLC
Terminated: 07/26/2021
Defendant
Rent & Save Auto Rental, Inc.
Terminated: 07/26/2021
Defendant
Select Medical Group of Michigan PLLC
Terminated: 07/26/2021
Defendant
Select Specialists, LLC
Terminated: 07/26/2021
Defendant
Total Toxicology Labs, LLC
Terminated: 09/20/2021
Defendant
Pedro O. Toweh, M.D.
Terminated: 07/26/2021
Defendant
US Health Pharmaceuticals LLC
Terminated: 09/20/2021
Defendant
United Lab RX, LLC
Terminated: 07/26/2021
Defendant
Level 1 Health Systems of Michigan, LLC
Terminated: 07/26/2021
Defendant
Continuous Transportation
Terminated: 08/27/2021
Defendant
Dependable Health Management, Inc.
Terminated: 08/27/2021
Defendant
Jiab Suleiman, D.O., P.C.
Terminated: 07/26/2021
Defendant
Affiliated Diagnostic of Oakland, LLC
Terminated: 07/26/2021
Defendant
Livonia Care Pharmacy, Inc.
Terminated: 08/27/2021
Defendant
Michigan Automobile Insurance Placement Facility
Terminated: 06/22/2021
Defendant
Michigan First Rehab, LLC
Terminated: 07/26/2021
Defendant
Michigan Pain Specialists, PLLC
Terminated: 07/01/2021
Defendant
New Clear Images
Terminated: 09/20/2021

GPO Feb 21 2023
OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 112 AND DENYING DEFENDANT'S COUNTER MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 114. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, February 22, 2023
121 121 order Judgment* Wed 02/22 8:18 PM
JUDGMENT in favor of plaintiff against defendants. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 21, 2023
120 120 26 pgs order Memorandum Opinion & Order Tue 02/21 6:48 PM
OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT112 AND DENYING DEFENDANT'S COUNTER MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT114 . Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur)
Related: [-]
119 119 notice Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument* Tue 02/21 6:24 PM
Notice of Determination of Motions Without Oral Argument re112 114 Cross Motions for Summary Judgment. (JCur)
Related: [-]