North Carolina Eastern District Court
Judge:Louise Wood Flanagan
Case #: 4:21-cv-00068
Nature of Suit340 Torts - Personal Injury - Marine
Cause46:183 Limitation of Liability
Case Filed:May 04, 2021
Last checked: Sunday Oct 31, 2021 4:34 AM EDT
Claimant
Estate of William Watkins Merriman IV
Represented By
Robert E. Zaytoun
Zaytoun Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Charles K. McCotter, Jr.
Charles K. Mccotter, Jr.
contact info
John R. Taylor
Zaytoun Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Claimant
Connie Merriman
Represented By
Robert E. Zaytoun
Zaytoun Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Charles K. McCotter, Jr.
Charles K. Mccotter, Jr.
contact info
John R. Taylor
Zaytoun Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Counter Claimant
Estate of William Watkins Merriman IV
Represented By
Robert E. Zaytoun
Zaytoun Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
John R. Taylor
Zaytoun Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Counter Claimant
Connie Merriman
Represented By
Robert E. Zaytoun
Zaytoun Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
John R. Taylor
Zaytoun Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Counter Defendant
Deborah W Andrews
Represented By
Geoffrey A. Losee
Rountree Losee LLP
contact info
Pardis Camarda
Rountree Losee LLP
contact info
In Re
Deborah W Andrews
Represented By
Geoffrey A. Losee
Rountree Losee LLP
contact info
Corey Thomas Zurbuch
Rountree Losee LLP
contact info
Pardis Camarda
Rountree Losee LLP
contact info
Mediator
Barbara Weyher
Yates, McLamb & Weyher, L.L.P. Post Office Box 2889 421 Fayetteville Street, Suite 1200
Raleigh, NC 27602


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, September 01, 2022
58 58 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 09/01 4:37 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal (JOINT) by Estate of William Watkins Merriman IV, Connie Merriman (Puryear, Paul)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 25, 2022
57 57 8 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Thu 08/25 4:18 PM
Memorandum in Support regarding56 MOTION to Quash Claimant's Subpoena to Verizon dated August 1, 2022 filed by Deborah W Andrews. (Camarda, Pardis)
Related: [-]
56 56 motion Quash Thu 08/25 4:13 PM
MOTION to Quash Claimant's Subpoena to Verizon dated August 1, 2022 filed by Deborah W Andrews. (Camarda, Pardis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Subpoena to Verizon dated August 1, 2022,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Limitation Plaintiff's Motion