Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:21-bk-70145

New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Robert E Grossman
Case #: 8:21-ap-08092
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
Case Filed:May 03, 2021
Terminated:Dec 22, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Thomas Kloss
23 Laurel Lane
Shirley, NY 11967
Represented By
Thomas Kloss
contact info
Plaintiff
Long Island Spine Specialists, P.C.
763 Larkfield Road 2nd Floor
Commack, NY 11725
Represented By
Meredith Frances McBride
Butler Tibbetts, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Wednesday, December 22, 2021
court Close Adversary Case Wed 12/22 11:19 AM
Adversary Case 8:21-ap-8092 Closed (one)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 01, 2021
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Settled/Withdrawn/Marked Off Without Hearing (Document BK & AP) Mon 11/01 10:21 AM
Settled without hearin Related [+] Stipulation for Judgment in favor of Plaintiff for $22,506.36. (mtt)
Related: [-] 3 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Friday, October 29, 2021
14 14 order Judgment (Signed by Judge) (1/1/11) Fri 10/29 2:00 PM
Stipulated Judgment of Nondischargeability of Debt Owed to Long Island Spine Specialists, P.C.; Judgment is hereby entered in favor of Plaintiff and against Debtor/Defendant Thomas Kloss determining that the amount of $22,506.36 is non-dischargeable pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §523. Related [+]. Signed on 10/29/2021 (one)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Long Island Spine Specialists, P.C.,8 Statement filed by Plaintiff Long Island Spine Specialists, P.C.,11 Notice of Proposed Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Long Island Spine Specialists, P.C.
13 13 misc Declaration Fri 10/29 10:11 AM
Declaration Filed by Richard A Jacoby on behalf of Thomas Kloss (Jacoby, Richard)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Affidavit Fri 10/29 10:09 AM
Affidavit Re: under Rule 4007 Filed by Richard A Jacoby on behalf of Thomas Kloss (Jacoby, Richard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 28, 2021
11 11 notice Notice of Proposed Stipulation Thu 10/28 3:25 PM
Notice of Proposed Stipulation By and Between Plaintiff and Debtor to Non-dischargeability of debt Filed by Long Island Spine Specialists, P.C. Related [+]. (McBride, Meredith)
Related: [-] 8
Monday, September 20, 2021
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned AP) Wed 09/22 3:44 PM
Adjourned Without Hearing Pre-Trial Conference set for 11/01/2021 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 860 (Judge Grossman), CI, NY Related [+] (mtt)
Related: [-] 3 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Friday, September 17, 2021
10 10 misc Letter of Adjournment - (Do not use to adjourn 341 meetings) Fri 09/17 10:30 AM
Letter of Adjournment: Hearing rescheduled from 9/20/2021 to 11/1/2021 at 9:30 a.m. Filed by Meredith Frances McBride on behalf of Long Island Spine Specialists, P.C. Related [+] (McBride, Meredith)
Related: [-] Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned AP)
Thursday, September 16, 2021
9 9 misc Letter Thu 09/16 2:46 PM
Letter requesting adjournment Filed by Meredith Frances McBride on behalf of Long Island Spine Specialists, P.C. Related [+] (McBride, Meredith)
Related: [-] Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned AP)
Friday, August 06, 2021
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned AP) Mon 08/09 2:04 PM
Adjourned Without Hearing Pre-Trial Conference set for 09/20/2021 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 860 (Judge Grossman), CI, NY Related [+] (mtt)
Related: [-] 3 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Thursday, July 15, 2021
8 8 misc Statement Thu 07/15 3:11 PM
Statement Stipulated Judgment of Nondischargeability of Debt Owed Filed by Meredith Frances McBride on behalf of Long Island Spine Specialists, P.C. (McBride, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 12, 2021
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned AP) Mon 07/12 11:44 AM
Adjourned Without Hearing Pre-Trial Conference set for 08/09/2021 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 860 (Judge Grossman), CI, NY Related [+] (one)
Related: [-] 3 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
Thursday, July 08, 2021
7 7 misc Letter of Adjournment - (Do not use to adjourn 341 meetings) Thu 07/08 1:46 PM
Letter of Adjournment: Hearing rescheduled from 7/12/2021 at 9:30 a.m. to 8/9/2021 at 9:30 a.m. Filed by Meredith Frances McBride on behalf of Long Island Spine Specialists, P.C. Related [+] (McBride, Meredith)
Related: [-] 5 Alias/Supplemental Summons Issued (Auto), Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned AP)
6 6 misc Letter Thu 07/08 1:41 PM
Letter Requesting Adjournment of PC Filed by Meredith Frances McBride on behalf of Long Island Spine Specialists, P.C. (McBride, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 07, 2021
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned AP) Tue 06/08 1:58 PM
Adjourned Without Hearing Pre-Trial Conference set for 07/12/2021 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 860 (Judge Grossman), CI, NY Related [+] (mtt)
Related: [-] 3 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Tuesday, June 01, 2021
5 5 court Alias/Supplemental Summons Issued (Auto) Tue 06/01 8:23 AM
Alias/Supplemental Summons Issued by Clerk's Office against Thomas Kloss Answer Due 7/1/2021. Pre-Trial Conference set for 7/12/2021 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 860 (Judge Grossman), CI, NY. (one)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 28, 2021
4 4 misc Letter Fri 05/28 11:45 AM
Letter requesting Amended Summons Filed by Meredith Frances McBride on behalf of Long Island Spine Specialists, P.C. (McBride, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 04, 2021
3 3 cmp Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto) Tue 05/04 12:06 PM
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office against Thomas Kloss. Answer Due: 6/3/2021. Pre-Trial Conference set for 6/7/2021 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 860 (Judge Grossman), CI, NY. (one)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Adversary Cover Sheet Tue 05/04 9:23 AM
Adversary Cover Sheet Filed by Meredith F McBride on behalf of Long Island Spine Specialists, P.C. Related [+] (McBride, Meredith)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Long Island Spine Specialists, P.C.
Monday, May 03, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 05/03 4:09 PM
Adversary case 8 21-08092 Complaint by Long Island Spine Specialists, P.C. against Thomas Kloss. Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of Suit: (67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)). (McBride, Meredith) Modified on 5/4/2021 (one)
Related: [-]