New York Southern District Court
Judge:Jennifer L Rochon
Referred: Barbara C Moses
Case #: 1:21-cv-03989
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Case Filed:May 04, 2021
Terminated:Mar 20, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, March 20, 2025
34 34 15 pgs order Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Thu 03/20 6:16 PM
OPINION AND ORDER for26 Report and Recommendations. For the foregoing reasons, the Court adopts the R&R in its entirety. The petition is denied. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the case. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 3/20/2025) (jca)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
33 33 misc Opposition Brief Fri 08/16 1:41 PM
OPPOSITION BRIEF re:29 Brief Objections to Report and Recommendation . Document filed by Marlyn Kopp..(Hudson, Jalina)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
32 32 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 08/01 12:18 PM
ORDER granting31 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply The request is GRANTED. Respondent shall respond to Petitioner's objections by August 16, 2024. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 8/1/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
31 31 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 07/31 3:37 PM
FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to29 Brief Objections to Report and Recommendation addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Jalina J. Hudson dated 7/31/2024. Document filed by Marlyn Kopp..(Hudson, Jalina)
Related: [-]
30 30 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 07/31 3:33 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jalina J Hudson on behalf of Marlyn Kopp..(Hudson, Jalina)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
29 29 misc Brief Fri 07/19 2:38 PM
BRIEF //Objections to Report and Recommendation . Document filed by Malik Layne..(McArdle, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
28 28 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 06/20 4:04 PM
ORDER granting27 Letter Motion for Extension of Time.The request is GRANTED. The parties shall file objections no later than July 19, 2024. SO ORDERED. Objections to R&R due by 7/19/2024. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 6/20/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
27 27 motion Extension of Time Tue 06/18 6:02 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to file written objections to the R&R addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Christopher L. McArdle dated June 18, 2024. Document filed by Malik Layne..(McArdle, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
26 26 order Report and Recommendations Fri 06/07 6:17 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re:1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Malik Layne. After careful review of the record, I cannot conclude that the decision of the Appellate Division affirming petitioner's conviction "was contrary to, or involved an unreasonable application of, clearly established Federal law, as determined by the Supreme Court of the United States." 28 U.S.C. § 2254(d)(2). I therefore recommend, respectfully, that the petition be denied. I further recommend that no certificate of appealability issue. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to substitute "Marlyn Kopp, Superintendent, Sing Sing Correctional Facility," as the respondent in this action. Objections to R&R due by 6/21/2024 (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 6/7/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
25 25 misc Notice of Filing Transcript Fri 04/05 12:40 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 11/16/2022 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(js)
Related: [-]
24 24 misc Transcript Fri 04/05 12:36 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 11/16/2022 before Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Marissa Lewandowski, (631) 813-9335. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/26/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/6/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/8/2024.(js)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 16, 2022
minutes Oral Argument Wed 11/16 12:59 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara Moses: Oral Argument held on 11/16/2022 re:1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Malik Layne. (tk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
23 23 misc Letter Wed 09/28 2:51 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Christopher L. McArdle dated September 28, 2022 re: Status update per the Court's order dated September 27, 2022 (ECF No. 22). Document filed by Malik Layne..(McArdle, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
22 22 3 pgs order Order 1 - Terminate Hearings Tue 09/27 4:47 PM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT This case has been reassigned to the undersigned. All counsel must familiarize themselves with the Court's Individual Rules, which are available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-jennifer-1-rochon. Unless and until the Court orders otherwise, all prior orders, dates, and deadlines shall remain in effect notwithstanding the case's reassignment. Any conference or oral argument before or directed by the Magistrate Judge will proceed as ordered. However, all previously-scheduled appearances or conferences before the District Judge are hereby adjourned pending further notice from the Court. Additionally, within two weeks of the filing of this Order, the parties are hereby ORDERED to file on ECF a joint letter updating the Court on the status of the case. The joint letter shall not exceed four (4) pages. If this case has been settled or otherwise terminated, counsel need not submit such letter or appear, provided that a stipulation of discontinuance, voluntary dismissal, or other proof of termination is filed on the docket prior to the joint letter submission deadline, using the appropriate ECF Filing Event. See SDNY ECF Rules & Instructions§§ 13.17-13.19, available at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf filing.php. Requests for extensions or adjournment of dates not affected by this Order may be made only in accordance with the Court's Individual Rules and Practices, which are available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-jennifer-1-rochon. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 9/27/2022) (jca)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 26, 2022
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment Mon 09/26 4:35 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon. Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil is no longer assigned to the case..(kgo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 26, 2022
21 21 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Oral Argument Tue 07/26 5:40 PM
ORDER granting20 Letter Motion for Oral Argument. Application GRANTED. Oral argument will take place on November 16, 2022, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 20A of the Daniel Patrick Moynihan United States Courthouse. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 7/26/2022) (rro)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Tue 07/26 5:41 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Oral Argument set for 11/16/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 20A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses. (rro)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 16, 2021
20 20 motion Oral Argument Tue 11/16 5:31 PM
LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument on Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus (ECF No. 1) addressed to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses from Christopher L. McArdle dated November 16, 2021. Document filed by Malik Layne..(McArdle, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 12, 2021
19 19 respoth Reply Memorandum of Law in Support (non-motion) Fri 11/12 11:44 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, . Document filed by Malik Layne..(McArdle, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 13, 2021
18 18 order Memo Endorsement ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys Wed 10/13 6:31 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:17 Letter filed by Malik Layne. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Attorney Madeline Byrd terminated. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 10/13/2021) (va)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 12, 2021
17 17 misc Letter Tue 10/12 11:44 AM
LETTER addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Madeline E. Byrd dated October 12. 2021 re: Withdrawing as Counsel. Document filed by Malik Layne..(Byrd, Madeline)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 15, 2021
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 09/15 6:48 PM
ORDER granting15 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re15 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to14 Memorandum of Law in Opposition,13 Response to Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus addressed to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses from Christopher L. McArdle date. Application GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 9/15/2021) (rro)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 09/15 6:49 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Michael Capra answer due 11/12/2021. (rro)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 14, 2021
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 09/14 4:54 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to14 Memorandum of Law in Opposition,13 Response to Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus addressed to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses from Christopher L. McArdle dated September 14, 2021. Document filed by Malik Layne..(McArdle, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 13, 2021
14 14 30+ pgs respoth Memorandum of Law in Opposition (non-motion) Mon 09/13 3:09 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition to Habeas Petition . Document filed by Michael Capra..(Lyons, Paul)
Related: [-]
13 13 answer Response to Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Mon 09/13 2:48 PM
RESPONSE to1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,. Document filed by Michael Capra..(Lyons, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 State Court Record Table of Contents,
Att: 2 State Court Record
Thursday, July 08, 2021
10 10 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 07/08 11:20 AM
ORDER granting9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re9 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses from Paul B. Lyons dated July 7, 2021. Application GRANTED. Michael Capra answer due 8/12/2021 (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 7/8/2021) (cf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 07, 2021
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 07/07 6:15 PM
FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses from Paul B. Lyons dated July 7, 2021. Document filed by Michael Capra..(Lyons, Paul)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 02, 2021
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 07/02 12:02 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul Bernard Lyons on behalf of Michael Capra..(Lyons, Paul)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 12, 2021
7 7 1 pgs order Order to Answer, 28 U.S.C. 2254 Thu 05/13 11:43 AM
ORDER TO ANSWER, 28 U.S.C. 2254 Having determined that the Petition under 28 U.S.C. § 2254 (Dkt. No. 1) should not be summarily dismissed, the Court hereby orders that: The Clerk of Court is directed to serve a copy of this Order to Answer and the Petition on the Attorney General of the State of New York and on the District Attorney of New York County by electronic means through the use of the court's CM/ECF system. Within sixty days of the date of this order, Respondent must file and serve (1) an answer, motion, or other response to the petition, and (2) the transcripts and briefs identified in Rule 5(c) of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases in the United States District Courts. Petitioner may file and serve any reply papers within thirty days from the date Petitioner is served with Respondents answer. Michael Capra answer due on 7/12/2021. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 5/12/2021) (cf) . Modified on 5/13/2021 (cf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 05, 2021
6 6 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Wed 05/05 11:49 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Habeas Corpus. Referred to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 5/5/2021) (nb)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 05/05 10:15 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Madeline Byrd on behalf of Malik Layne..(Byrd, Madeline)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 05/05 10:13 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sharon Steinerman on behalf of Malik Layne..(Steinerman, Sharon)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Wed 05/05 10:16 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 05/05 10:19 AM
Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 05/05 10:20 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 04, 2021
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 05/04 8:31 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(McArdle, Christopher)
Related: [-]
2 2 23 pgs respoth Memorandum of Law in Support (non-motion) Tue 05/04 8:30 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, . Document filed by Malik Layne..(McArdle, Christopher)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Tue 05/04 8:28 PM
PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254. County of Conviction: New York. (Filing Fee $ 5.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24493823)Document filed by Malik Layne..(McArdle, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-1,
Att: 2 Exhibit A-2,
Att: 3 Exhibit A-3,
Att: 4 Exhibit B-1,
Att: 5 Exhibit B-2,
Att: 6 Exhibit B-3,
Att: 7 Exhibit B-4,
Att: 8 Exhibit C-1,
Att: 9 Pre-Trial Transcript,
Att: 10 Trial Transcript,
Att: 11 Sentencing Transcript I,
Att: 12 Sentencing Transcript II