New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Diane Gujarati
Referred: James R Cho
Case #: 1:21-cv-02489
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:May 05, 2021
Terminated:Sep 29, 2023
Last checked: Monday Nov 01, 2021 4:51 AM EDT
Defendant
Angelo Corrao
Represented By
Kyle Francis Oakes Monaghan
Milman Labuda Law Group PLLC
contact info
Michael James Mauro
contact info
Emanuel Kataev
Milman Labuda Law Group PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Manda International Corporation
Represented By
Kyle Francis Oakes Monaghan
Milman Labuda Law Group PLLC
contact info
Michael James Mauro
contact info
Emanuel Kataev
Milman Labuda Law Group PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Anthony Morali
Represented By
Scott K. Winikow
Donovan Hatem LLP
contact info
Defendant
Joseph Morali
Represented By
Scott K. Winikow
Donovan Hatem LLP
contact info
Defendant
Morali and Associates
Represented By
Scott K. Winikow
Donovan Hatem LLP
contact info
Defendant
Touraj Naghieh
Represented By
Mark S Friedlander
contact info
Defendant
Strikeforce Mechanical Corporation
Represented By
Kyle Francis Oakes Monaghan
Milman Labuda Law Group PLLC
contact info
Michael James Mauro
contact info
Emanuel Kataev
Milman Labuda Law Group PLLC
contact info
Defendant
CRI Holding Corp.
Represented By
Mark S Friedlander
contact info
Plaintiff
JGIAP RH 160 LLC
Represented By
Ryan M. Wilson
Armstrong Teasdale LLP
contact info
Nicholas Peppler
Armstrong Teasdale LLP
contact info

GPO Aug 16 2023
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 99, 102, 106, 113. This Court respectfully recommends granting the motions to dismiss plaintiff's RICO claims against all defendants, declining supplemental jurisdiction over the state law claims, and dismissing plaintiff's Complaint without prejudice. This Court further recommends granting plaintiff leave to file an amended pleading within 30 days of a Memorandum and Order adopting the recommendations herein. Finally, this Court recommends denying the parties' cross-motions for sanctions. Objections to R&R due by 8/30/2023. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 8/16/2023. (JP)
GPO Sep 28 2023
MEMORANDUM & ORDER: As set forth in the attached Memorandum & Order, the Court adopts in part the recommendations in the August 16, 2023 Report & Recommendation of Magistrate Judge James R. Cho, ECF No. 124. The Manda Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. 99, the Morali Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. 102, and the CRI Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. 106, are GRANTED. Plaintiff's Complaint, ECF No. 1, is DISMISSED without leave to amend. Dismissal is with prejudice with respect to the RICO claims and without prejudice with respect to the state law claims. The Manda Defendants' Motion for Sanctions, ECF No. 113, and the Rule 11 Respondents' request for an award of attorneys' fees and expenses, see ECF No. 116, are DENIED. The Manda Defendants' motion for a pre-motion conference, ECF No. 122, is DENIED as moot. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment accordingly and to close this case. Ordered by Judge Diane Gujarati on 9/28/2023. (MP)

Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, September 29, 2023
131 131 order Judgment - Clerk Fri 09/29 12:48 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT that the Manda Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. 99, the Morali Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. 102, and the CRI Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. 106, are granted; that Plaintiff's Complaint, ECF No. 1, is dismissed without leave to amend; that dismissal is with prejudice with respect to the RICO claims and without prejudice with respect to the state law claims; that the Manda Defendants' Motion for Sanctions, ECF No. 113, and the Rule 11 Respondents' request for an award of attorneys' fees and expenses, see ECF No. 116, are denied; and that the Manda Defendants' motion for a pre-motion conference, ECF No. 122, is denied as moot. Signed Brenna B. Mahoney, Clerk of Court by Jalitza Poveda, Deputy Clerk on 9/29/2023. (TLH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
130 130 5 pgs order Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Motion for Sanctions Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference Order on Report and Recommendations Order on Motion to Set Aside Thu 09/28 4:57 PM
MEMORANDUM & ORDER: As set forth in the attached Memorandum & Order, the Court adopts in part the recommendations in the August 16, 2023 Report & Recommendation of Magistrate Judge James R. Cho, ECF No. 124. The Manda Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. 99, the Morali Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. 102, and the CRI Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. 106, are GRANTED. Plaintiff's Complaint, ECF No. 1, is DISMISSED without leave to amend. Dismissal is with prejudice with respect to the RICO claims and without prejudice with respect to the state law claims. The Manda Defendants' Motion for Sanctions, ECF No. 113, and the Rule 11 Respondents' request for an award of attorneys' fees and expenses, see ECF No. 116, are DENIED. The Manda Defendants' motion for a pre-motion conference, ECF No. 122, is DENIED as moot. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment accordingly and to close this case. Ordered by Judge Diane Gujarati on 9/28/2023. (MP)
Related: [-]