District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:James E Boasberg
Referred: G Michael Harvey
Case #: 1:21-mc-00048
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
CauseMS:Adminis
Case Filed:May 05, 2021
Terminated:Sep 21, 2021

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 7:20 AM EDT
Monday, December 19, 2022
52 52 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance Mon 12/19 2:22 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to COMMODITY FUTURES TRADING COMMISSION. Attorney Michael William Solinsky terminated. (Solinsky, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 16, 2022
51 51 1 pgs service Attachment for Contempt quashed Fri 12/16 10:38 AM
ATTACHMENT for Contempt quashed. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 12/16/2022. (nbn)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 12, 2022
50 50 order .Order Mon 12/12 4:09 PM
ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: 1) The fee award is REINSTITUTED; and 2) Respondents shall pay the CFTC the sum of $52,327.50 in fees by January 5, 2023. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 12/12/2022. (lcjeb2)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 12/12 4:17 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Respondents shall pay the CFTC the sum of $52,327.50 in fees by 1/5/2023. (nbn)
Related: [-]