Kansas District Court
Judge:Kathryn H Vratil
Referred: Angel D Mitchell
Case #: 6:21-cv-01125
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:May 05, 2021
Terminated:Aug 11, 2021
Last checked: Monday Nov 01, 2021 3:32 AM CDT
Defendant
Center Industries Corporation
Represented By
Boyd A. Byers
Foulston Siefkin Llp - Wichita
contact info
Morgan E. Geffre
Foulston Siefkin Llp - Wichita
contact info
Plaintiff
Barbara Wiegand
Represented By
Larry G. Michel
Kennedy Berkley Yarnevich & Williamson, Chtd. - Salina
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, August 20, 2021
31 31 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 08/20 5:01 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL Filed Jointly by Center Industries Corporation. (Geffre, Morgan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 11, 2021
30 30 order Administratively Closing Case Wed 08/11 11:27 AM
ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE: Parties shall file stipulation of dismissal by 9/10/2021. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 8/11/2021. (kas)
Related: [-]
29 29 adr ADR Report Wed 08/11 10:11 AM
ADR REPORT by Center Industries Corporation. ADR session held on: August 3, 2021 and conducted by Michelle Minor. Results of ADR: Case settled at ADR. Status of litigation at time of ADR: Partial Discovery(Geffre, Morgan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 29, 2021
28 28 discov Notice to Take Deposition Thu 07/29 4:27 PM
NOTICE by Defendant Center Industries Corporation of taking deposition of Barbara Wiegand on 08/24/2021 (Geffre, Morgan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 28, 2021
27 27 notice Notice of Service Wed 07/28 1:10 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE by Barbara Wiegand of Discovery Responses (Michel, Larry)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 20, 2021
26 26 service Return of Service of Subpoena Tue 07/20 2:16 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) filed by Defendant Center Industries Corporation executed upon Manpower Staffing Solutions on 07/13/2021 by Certified Mail (Geffre, Morgan)
Related: [-]
25 25 service Return of Service of Subpoena Tue 07/20 2:09 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) filed by Defendant Center Industries Corporation executed upon Collins Bus Corporation on 07/12/2021 by Certified Mail (Geffre, Morgan)
Related: [-]
24 24 service Return of Service of Subpoena Tue 07/20 11:47 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) filed by Defendant Center Industries Corporation executed upon Alcoa Aerospace Center on 07/12/2021 by Certified Mail (Geffre, Morgan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 15, 2021
23 23 service Return of Service of Subpoena Thu 07/15 4:33 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) filed by Defendant Center Industries Corporation executed upon Siemens Wind Power on 07/12/2021 by Certified Mail (Geffre, Morgan)
Related: [-]
22 22 service Return of Service of Subpoena Thu 07/15 4:32 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) filed by Defendant Center Industries Corporation executed upon Lowen Corporation on 07/12/2021 by Certified Mail (Geffre, Morgan)
Related: [-]
21 21 service Return of Service of Subpoena Thu 07/15 4:31 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) filed by Defendant Center Industries Corporation executed upon Hospira, Inc. on 07/12/2021 by Certified Mail (Geffre, Morgan)
Related: [-]
20 20 service Return of Service of Subpoena Thu 07/15 4:29 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) filed by Defendant Center Industries Corporation executed upon Cessna Aircraft on 07/12/2021 by Certified Mail (Geffre, Morgan)
Related: [-]
19 19 service Return of Service of Subpoena Thu 07/15 4:26 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) filed by Defendant Center Industries Corporation executed upon Hutchinson Clinic on 07/12/2021 by Certified Mail (Geffre, Morgan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 14, 2021
18 18 notice Notice of Service Wed 07/14 1:19 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE by Barbara Wiegand of Plaintiff's 1st Combined Written Discovery Requests to Defendant (Michel, Larry)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 06, 2021
17 17 12 pgs order Order on Motion for Order Tue 07/06 12:26 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER granting15 the parties' Joint Motion for Entry of Protective Order. The parties shall abide by the terms of the attached order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 7/6/21. (ks)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 02, 2021
16 16 notice Notice of Service Fri 07/02 11:46 AM
NOTICE OF SERVICE by Center Industries Corporation of Discovery (Geffre, Morgan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 30, 2021
15 15 3 pgs motion Order Wed 06/30 5:11 PM
Joint MOTION for Order (Protective Order) by Defendant Center Industries Corporation Related [+] (Byers, Boyd)
Related: [-] ferred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell
Wednesday, June 23, 2021
14 14 order Scheduling Order Wed 06/23 2:55 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: estimated trial time 5 days. Discovery deadline 11/23/2021. Dispositive motion deadline 12/22/2021. Mediation deadline 9/3/2021. Mediation Notice or Confidential Settlement Report Due to Magistrate Judge on 7/23/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/7/2021. Jury Trial set for 8/1/2022 at 09:00 AM in Wichita Courtroom (Unknown) before District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/14/2021 at 11:00 AM in Telephone ADM - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 3977627 before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 6/23/2021. (ht)
Related: [-]
13 13 minutes Scheduling Conference Wed 06/23 10:31 AM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 6/23/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ht)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 16, 2021
12 12 notice Notice of Service Wed 06/16 4:33 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE by Center Industries Corporation of Defendant's Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures (Geffre, Morgan)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 11, 2021
11 11 notice Notice of Service Fri 06/11 2:37 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE by Barbara Wiegand of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures (Michel, Larry)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 09, 2021
10 10 notice Joint Mediation Notice Wed 06/09 4:50 PM
JOINT MEDIATION NOTICE - Mediation to be held August 3, 2021 by Barbara Wiegand (Michel, Larry)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 27, 2021
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 05/27 3:56 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Center Industries Corporation.(Byers, Boyd)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 17, 2021
8 8 order Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling Mon 05/17 11:06 AM
INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 6/23/2021 at 10:00 AM in Telephone ADM - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 3977627 before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 6/2/2021. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 6/16/2021. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 6/16/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order Deadline 6/16/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 5/14/2021. (ht)
Related: [-]
7 7 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Inspect Mon 05/17 10:28 AM
ORDER granting6 Motion to Inspection and Reproduction of KHRC Records. See text of order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 5/17/2021. (bh)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 14, 2021
6 6 motion Inspect Fri 05/14 2:25 PM
Joint MOTION to Inspect and for Reproduction of Kansas Human Rights Commission Records by Defendant Center Industries Corporation Related [+] (Geffre, Morgan)
Related: [-] ferred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell
5 5 misc Entry of Appearance Fri 05/14 2:14 PM
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Morgan E. Geffre on behalf of Center Industries Corporation (Geffre, Morgan)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Entry of Appearance Fri 05/14 2:12 PM
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Boyd A. Byers on behalf of Center Industries Corporation (Byers, Boyd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 11, 2021
3 3 service Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED Tue 05/11 9:17 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Barbara Wiegand upon Center Industries Corporation served on 5/6/2021, answer due 5/27/2021 (Michel, Larry)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 05, 2021
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 05/05 4:14 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Barbara Wiegand. (Michel, Larry)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (attorney) Wed 05/05 4:12 PM
COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5480107.), filed by Barbara Wiegand.(Michel, Larry)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Judge Assignment Wed 05/05 4:21 PM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
Related: [-]
service Summons Issued Wed 05/05 4:47 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Center Industries Corporation (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
Related: [-]