Kraemer v. Crossover Market, LLC et al
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Lee Yeakel |
Case #: | 1:21-cv-00398 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | May 05, 2021 |
Terminated: | Nov 22, 2021 |
Last checked: Monday Nov 01, 2021 4:24 AM CDT |
Defendant
Crossover Market, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ESW Capital, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Trilogy Enterprises, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carol Kraemer
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, November 22, 2021 | ||
28 | 28
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Mon 11/22 2:02 PM
ORDER CLOSING CASE. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt) |
|
Wednesday, November 17, 2021 | ||
27 | 27
2
pgs
motion
Dismiss
Wed 11/17 3:38 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Carol Kraemer.(Tran, Trang) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, October 26, 2021 | ||
26 | 26
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Tue 10/26 11:30 AM
ORDER GRANTING25 Motion for Extension of Time to File Dismissal Paperwork. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt) |
|
Friday, October 22, 2021 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Fri 10/22 4:45 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dismissal Paperwork by Crossover Market, LLC, ESW Capital, LLC, Trilogy Enterprises, Inc..(Fox, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, September 27, 2021 | ||
24 | 24
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Hearings
Mon 09/27 1:44 PM
ORDER for parties to file a Motion to Dismiss or Stipulation of dismissal and CANCELLING Initial Pretrial Conference scheduled for October 12, 2021.Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (cc3) |
|
Friday, August 06, 2021 | ||
23 | 23
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Fri 08/06 4:48 PM
ORDER SETTING Initial Pretrial Conference by phone set for 10/12/2021 at 02:30 PM before Judge Lee Yeakel. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt) |
|
Tuesday, July 06, 2021 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order
Tue 07/06 5:57 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Carol Kraemer. (Tran, Trang) |
|
Friday, July 02, 2021 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties
Fri 07/02 10:30 AM
Certificate of Interested Parties by Carol Kraemer. (Tran, Trang) |
|
Monday, June 14, 2021 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties
Mon 06/14 11:13 PM
Certificate of Interested Parties by ESW Capital, LLC. (Fox, Stephen) |
|
19 | 19
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 06/14 11:12 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by ESW Capital, LLC.(Fox, Stephen) |
|
18 | 18
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties
Mon 06/14 11:08 PM
Certificate of Interested Parties by Trilogy Enterprises, Inc.. (Fox, Stephen) |
|
17 | 17
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 06/14 11:05 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Trilogy Enterprises, Inc..(Fox, Stephen) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties
Mon 06/14 9:56 PM
Certificate of Interested Parties DEFENDANT ESW CAPITAL, LLC'S CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS by ESW Capital, LLC. (Fox, Stephen) |
|
15 | 15
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 06/14 9:53 PM
DEFENDANT ESW CAPITAL, LLC'S ORIGINAL ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL COMPLAINT ANSWER to1 Complaint by ESW Capital, LLC.(Fox, Stephen) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties
Mon 06/14 9:41 PM
Certificate of Interested Parties DEFENDANT TRILOGY ENTERPRISES, INC.'S CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS by Trilogy Enterprises, Inc.. (Fox, Stephen) |
|
13 | 13
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 06/14 9:29 PM
DEFENDANT TRILOGY ENTERPRISES, INC.'S ORIGINAL ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL COMPLAINT ANSWER to1 Complaint by Trilogy Enterprises, Inc..(Fox, Stephen) |
|
Friday, June 11, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties
Fri 06/11 3:18 PM
Certificate of Interested Parties by Crossover Market, LLC. (Fox, Stephen) |
|
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 06/11 3:17 PM
Defendant Crossover Market, LLC's Original ANSWER to1 Complaint by Crossover Market, LLC.(Fox, Stephen) |
|
Wednesday, June 02, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 06/02 4:58 PM
ORDER GRANTING8 unopposed Motion to extend the deadline for each of the Defendants to file an answer to Plaintiff's Original Complaint by ten days; Crossover Market, LLC answer due 6/11/2021; ESW Capital, LLC answer due 6/14/2021; Trilogy Enterprises, Inc. answer due 6/14/2021. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Pro Hac Vice Letter
Wed 06/02 11:07 AM
Letter to Dan Syed re: non-admitted status. (lt) |
|
Tuesday, June 01, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 06/01 5:26 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Crossover Market, LLC, ESW Capital, LLC, Trilogy Enterprises, Inc..(Fox, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, May 19, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 05/19 10:52 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carol Kraemer. Trilogy Enterprises, Inc. served on 5/14/2021, answer due 6/4/2021. (Tran, Trang) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 05/19 10:51 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carol Kraemer. ESW Capital, LLC served on 5/14/2021, answer due 6/4/2021. (Tran, Trang) |
|
Monday, May 17, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 05/17 6:02 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carol Kraemer. Crossover Market, LLC served on 5/11/2021, answer due 6/1/2021. (Tran, Trang) |
|
Thursday, May 06, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Thu 05/06 1:02 PM
Summons Issued as to Crossover Market, LLC, Trilogy Enterprises, Inc., ESW Capital, LLC. (lt) |
|
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 05/06 12:01 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Carol Kraemer. (Tran, Trang) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Filing
Thu 05/06 11:00 AM
NOTICE of Filing of Consent by Carol Kraemer(Tran, Trang) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Consent of Carol Kraemer | ||
Wednesday, May 05, 2021 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 05/05 6:13 PM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14774118), filed by Carol Kraemer.(Tran, Trang) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 05/06 8:03 AM
Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj) |
||
misc
To be Referred to AU Mag Judge
Thu 05/06 8:04 AM
If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Lane (cj) |
||
misc
Jury Demand
Thu 05/06 8:05 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Carol Kraemer. (cj) |