California Northern District Court
Judge:William H Orrick
Case #: 3:21-cv-03316
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2021
Last checked: Monday Oct 25, 2021 2:47 AM PDT
Defendant
Andrew M. Saul
Represented By
Valerie Elizabeth Smith
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Margaret Branick-Abilla
Social Security Administration
contact info
Michelle Lo
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Shawnee LaVern Carroll
7096 Calistoga Lane
Dublin, CA 94568

GPO May 07 2021
ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero denying 6 Motion to Appoint Counsel without prejudice. (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Copy placed in O:Drive on 5/7/2021 Modified on 5/7/2021 (klhS, COURT STAFF).

Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
86 86 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing Wed 02/26 11:32 AM
CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING ZOOM HEARING - Case Management Conference reset for 8/19/2025 02:00 PM via Videoconference. Case Management Statement due by 8/12/2025. This proceeding will be held via Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/who] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmd, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
85 85 misc Case Management Statement Tue 02/25 11:23 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Updated JCMS Related to Stay filed by Andrew M. Saul. (Smith, Valerie)
Related: [-]