Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Federico A Moreno
Case #: 1:21-cv-21735
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:May 06, 2021
Terminated:Jun 08, 2021
Case in other court:11th Judicial Circuit, Miami-Dade County, FL, 21-006344-CA-01
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 02, 2021 5:27 AM EDT
Defendant
LKQ Pick Your Part Southeast, LLC
Represented By
Craig R. Annunziata
Fisher & Phillips LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Mario Vilan
Represented By
Peter Michael Hoogerwoerd
Remer & Georges-Pierre, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 19, 2022
14 14 1 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Tue 04/19 4:07 PM
Final Order of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 4/19/2022. See attached document for full details. (mti)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 14, 2022
13 13 misc Stipulation of Dismissal - aty Thu 04/14 12:04 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Mario Vilan (Hoogerwoerd, Peter)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 08, 2021
12 12 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Tue 06/08 3:43 PM
ORDER granting9 Motion to Compel Arbitration and Placing Case in Civil Suspense File. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 6/8/2021. See attached document for full details. (mmd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 27, 2021
11 11 respm Response to Motion Thu 05/27 9:34 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re9 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), and Compel Arbitration filed by Mario Vilan. Replies due by 6/3/2021. (Hoogerwoerd, Peter)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 14, 2021
10 10 misc Status Report Fri 05/14 5:03 PM
STATUS REPORT (Defendant's Removal Status Report) by LKQ Pick Your Part Southeast, LLC(Annunziata, Craig)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - State Court Records
Thursday, May 13, 2021
9 9 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Thu 05/13 2:25 PM
Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), and Compel Arbitration by LKQ Pick Your Part Southeast, LLC. Responses due by 5/27/2021(Annunziata, Craig)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 (Declaration of Craig Gleerup),
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 (Arbitration Agreement)
8 8 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 05/13 2:19 PM
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by LKQ Pick Your Part Southeast, LLC identifying Corporate Parent LKQ Corporation for LKQ Pick Your Part Southeast, LLC (Annunziata, Craig)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 10, 2021
7 7 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Mon 05/10 11:24 AM
NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE IN REMOVAL CASES. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/7/2021. See attached document for full details. (mmd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 06, 2021
6 6 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 05/06 4:59 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Craig R. Annunziata on behalf of LKQ Pick Your Part Southeast, LLC (Annunziata, Craig)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice (Other) Thu 05/06 4:58 PM
NOTICE by LKQ Pick Your Part Southeast, LLC (Annunziata, Craig)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
4 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Incorrect case opening information. The Filer selected the incorrect Cause of Action when filing. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (drz)
Related: [-]
3 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (drz)
Related: [-]
2 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (drz)
Related: [-]
1 1 4 pgs cmp Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) Thu 05/06 1:07 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - 11th Judicial Circuit Complaint 2021-006344-CA-01) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14666715, filed by LKQ Pick Your Part Southeast, LLC.(Annunziata, Craig) Modified Text on 5/6/2021 (drz). ( No Answer, Affirmative Defenses or Motion to Dismiss Filed in State Court)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Thu 05/06 1:49 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (drz)
Related: [-]
order Clerks Notice of Docket Correction - ELECTRONIC CASE Thu 05/06 1:50 PM
Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (drz)
Related: [-]
order Clerks Notice of Docket Correction - ELECTRONIC CASE Thu 05/06 1:50 PM
Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Incorrect case opening information. The Filer selected the incorrect Cause of Action when filing. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (drz)
Related: [-]