Michigan Western District Court
Case #: 1:21-cr-00092
Case Filed:May 04, 2021
Terminated:Dec 21, 2022
Last checked: Monday May 30, 2022 1:26 PM EDT
defendant
Adarius Ferguson (1)
Represented By
Michael J. Harrison
Harrison Law PLC
contact info
Joshua James Reuter
Warner Norcross & Judd LLP
contact info
Donald Sappanos
Donald L. Sappanos PC
contact info
Christopher E. Tracy
Warner Norcross & Judd (kz)
contact info
Brian Patrick Lennon
Warner Norcross & Judd LLP
contact info
Kelsey Marie Dame
Warner Norcross & Judd Llp (grand Rapids)
contact info
plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Katie Patricia Zell
U.S. Attorney (grand Rapids)
contact info
Hagen Walter Frank
U.S. Attorney (grand Rapids)
contact info
Adam Barrett Townshend
U.S. Attorney (grand Rapids)
contact info
Daniel Y. Mekaru
U.S. Attorney (grand Rapids)
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
defendant
Christopher Campbell (2)
Terminated: 02/17/2022
Represented By
Lawrence J. Phelan
contact info
defendant
Marquis Davis (6)
Terminated: 02/17/2022
Represented By
Daniel R. Fagan
Daniel R. Fagan & Associates, PC
contact info
defendant
Jaylen Sulton (5)
Terminated: 02/16/2022
Represented By
Caleb Michael Grimes
Caleb Grimes Law, PLC
contact info
Lucas Xavier Dillon, Sr.
Dillon & Samuel, PLLC
contact info
defendant
Elisha Vary (7)
Terminated: 12/02/2021
Represented By
Sean Tilton
Federal Public Defender (grand Rapids)
contact info
defendant
Tipton Lamar Walker (4)
Terminated: 12/06/2021
Represented By
Deno P. Fotieo
contact info
defendant
Joshawn Wilson (3)
Terminated: 02/18/2022
Represented By
John R. Beason
Law Offices Of John R. Beason
contact info
Mary Chartier-Mittendorf
Chartier & Nyamfukudza PLC
contact info

GPO May 20 2021
ORDER OF DETENTION pending trial as to defendant Jaylen Sulton; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (ald)
GPO May 21 2021
ORDER OF DETENTION pending trial as to defendant Elisha Vary; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (ald)
GPO Jun 07 2021
ORDER OF DETENTION pending trial as to defendant Tipton Lamar Walker; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (ald)
GPO Jul 26 2021
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the guilty plea of Elisha Vary as to Counts 1, 2, 4, 5, 6 and 7 of the Indictment be accepted; objections to R&R due within 14 days; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)
GPO Aug 11 2021
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 87 as to Elisha Vary ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)

Docket last updated: 12/05/2024 3:58 PM EST
Tuesday, May 04, 2021
1 1 33 pgs INDICTMENT as to Adarius Ferguson, Christopher Campbell, Joshawn Wilson, Tipton Lamar Walker, Jaylen Sulton, Marquis Davis, Elisha Vary (ns) Modified on 5/6/2021 (jln).
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION and ORDER TO SEAL CASE until defendant is arrested, the investigation is completed, or further order of this court; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (ns) Modified on 5/6/2021 (jln).
Related: [-]
3 3 PENALTY SHEET re Indictment1 as to Adarius Ferguson, Christopher Campbell, Joshawn Wilson, Tipton Lamar Walker, Jaylen Sulton, Marquis Davis, Elisha Vary (ns) Modified on 5/6/2021 (jln).
Related: [-]