Hindu American Foundation v. Viswanath et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Amit P Mehta |
Case #: | 1:21-cv-01268 |
Nature of Suit | 320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander |
Case Filed: | May 07, 2021 |
Terminated: | Dec 20, 2022 |
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 03, 2021 4:54 AM EDT |
Defendant
RASHEED AHMED
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JOHN PRABHUDOSS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
RAJU RAJAGOPAL
6456 Mystic Street
Oakland, CA 94618 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
AUDREY TRUSCHKE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SUNITA VISWANATH
361 Warren Street
Brooklyn, NY 11201 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
HINDU AMERICAN FOUNDATION
910 17th St. NW, Suite 316A
Washington, DC, DC 20006 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Friday, March 24, 2023 | ||
65 | 65
5
pgs
misc
Memorandum
Fri 03/24 5:29 PM
MEMORANDUM re63 Letter by RASHEED AHMED, JOHN PRABHUDOSS, RAJU RAJAGOPAL, AUDREY TRUSCHKE, SUNITA VISWANATH. (Colangelo-Bryan, Joshua) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2023 | ||
64 | 64
5
pgs
misc
Memorandum
Thu 03/23 7:13 PM
MEMORANDUM re63 Letter by HINDU AMERICAN FOUNDATION. (Esper, Dilan) |