California Northern District Court
Judge:William H Orrick
Case #: 3:21-cv-03437
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:May 07, 2021
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 03, 2021 2:29 AM PDT
Defendant
Altria Client Services LLC
Defendant
Juul Labs, Inc.
Defendant
eLiquitech, Inc.
Defendant
Riaz Valani
Defendant
Tobacco Technology, Inc.
Defendant
Nicholas Pritzker
1 Letterman Drive Building C Suite C4-420
San Francisco, CA 94129
Defendant
Philip Morris USA Inc.
6601 W. Broad Street
Richmond, VA 23230
Defendant
James Monsees
89 Belgrave Avenue
San Francisco,, CA 94117
Defendant
McLane Company, Inc.
Defendant
Hoyoung Huh
6 Redberry Ridge
Portola Valley, CA 94028
Defendant
Eby-Brown Company, LLC
Defendant
Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc.
Defendant
Adam Bowen
Defendant
Altria Group, Inc.
Defendant
Altria Group Distribution Company
Defendant
Altria Enterprises LLC
6601 W Broad Street
Richmona, VA 23230
Plaintiff
M.W.
Represented By
Christopher G. Paulos
Levin, Papantonio, Rafferty, Proctor, Buchanan, O'Brien
contact info
Matthew D. Schultz
Levin, Papantonio, Rafferty, Proctor, Buchanan, O'Brien
contact info
Neil E. McWilliams, Jr.
Levin, Papntonio, Rafferty, Proctor, Buchanan, Obrien,
contact info
Plaintiff
Dawn Walser
Represented By
Christopher G. Paulos
Levin, Papantonio, Rafferty, Proctor, Buchanan, O'Brien
contact info
Matthew D. Schultz
Levin, Papantonio, Rafferty, Proctor, Buchanan, O'Brien
contact info
Neil E. McWilliams, Jr.
Levin, Papntonio, Rafferty, Proctor, Buchanan, Obrien,
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, August 26, 2024
utility MDL Member Case Closed Mon 08/26 9:25 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE CLOSED: Pursuant to the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, civil case no. 21-03437 is terminated. cc: JPMDL (kab-adi, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 06/24 3:40 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice by M.W., Dawn Walser (Paulos, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 26, 2023
5 5 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Sun 11/26 8:17 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Dawn Walser (Paulos, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 12, 2021
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 05/12 9:24 PM
Summons Issued as to Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Enterprises LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., Adam Bowen, Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc., Eby-Brown Company, LLC, Hoyoung Huh, Juul Labs, Inc., McLane Company, Inc., James Monsees, Philip Morris USA Inc., Nicholas Pritzker, Tobacco Technology, Inc., Riaz Valani, eLiquitech, Inc. (jlgS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Proposed Summons Wed 05/12 12:07 PM
Proposed Summons.(Paulos, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment A
utility Create Case Association Wed 05/12 9:08 PM
Cases associated: Create association to 3:19-md-02913-WHO. (jlgS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility MDL Member Case Wed 05/12 9:09 PM
DIRECT MEMBER CASE OPENED MDL 2913: Opened in California Northern District as 3:21-cv-03437-WHO cc: JPMDL (jlgS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 07, 2021
2 2 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Fri 05/07 3:40 PM
Case assigned to Judge William H. Orrick. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (haS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 05/07 3:24 PM
COMPLAINT and JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15941405.). Filed byDawn Walser, M.W..(Paulos, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet