Arizona District Court
Case #: 2:21-mj-08114
Case Filed:May 10, 2021
Last checked: Wednesday May 12, 2021 12:19 AM MST
Defendant
Jose Roberto Osuna-Leyva (1)
Represented By
Jeanette Elizabeth Alvarado
Federal Public Defenders Office - Phoenix
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Esther J Winne
Us Attorneys Office - Phoenix, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2021 12:43 AM MST
Thursday, May 06, 2021
Arrest of Jose Roberto Osuna-Leyva on 5/6/2021. (MJF)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 10, 2021
1 1 4 pgs COMPLAINT as to Jose Roberto Osuna-Leyva. (MJF)
Related: [-]