84 Lumber Company v. F.H. Paschen, S.N. Nielsen & Associates, LLC et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Sarah S Vance |
Referred: | Alma L Chasez |
Case #: | 2:12-cv-01748 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Jul 05, 2012 |
Re-opened: | May 05, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jan 22, 2018 |
Last checked: Friday Jun 10, 2016 5:17 PM CDT |
Counter Claimant
Safeco Insurance Company of America
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
J&A Construction Management Resources Co. Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Continental Casualty Company
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
F. H. Paschen, S. N. Nielsen & Associates, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
84 Lumber Company
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
J&A Construction Management Resources Co. Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
F. H. Paschen, S. N. Nielsen & Associates, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
F. H. Paschen, S. N. Nielsen & Associates, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Safeco Insurance Company of America
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Continental Casualty Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
84 Lumber Company
|
Represented By
|
Third Party Defendant
Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland
|
Represented By
|
Third Party Defendant
J&A Construction Management Resources Co. Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Third Party Defendant
Maggie's Management, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Third Party Plaintiff
F. H. Paschen, S. N. Nielsen & Associates, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Third Party Plaintiff
J&A Construction Management Resources Co. Inc.
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Third Party Defendant
J & A Construction Management Services, Inc.
Terminated: 03/22/2013
|
Represented By
|