Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:20-bk-30319

Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Elizabeth D Katz
Case #: 3:21-ap-03008
Nature of Suit63 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(8), student loan
Case Filed:May 12, 2021
Terminated:Jan 07, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
The National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2005-3
Rodney Square North 1100 North Market St
Wilmington, DE 19890
Represented By
The National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2005-3
contact info
Plaintiff
Nicole M Chisholm
74 Partridge Dr
Springfield, MA 01119
Represented By
Gerald Glasser
Kalill, Glasser & Associates
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Friday, January 07, 2022
utility Disposition of Adversary Fri 01/07 7:55 AM
Disposition of Adversary Number 21-3008 Judgment Entered Re: Complaint. (pf)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Fri 01/07 7:56 AM
Adversary Case 21-3008 Closed. (pf)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 25, 2021
33 33 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 12/26 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 12/25/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 31 Judgment
32 32 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 12/26 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 12/25/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 30 Order on Motion for Approval
Thursday, December 23, 2021
31 31 order Judgment Thu 12/23 9:11 AM
Judgment dated 12/23/2021. See Order for Full Text. (pf)
Related: [-]
30 30 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Approval Thu 12/23 9:09 AM
Endorsed Order dated 12/23/2021 Re:29 Joint Motion filed by Plaintiff Nicole M Chisholm to Approve28 Stipulation and Agreement for Judgment. GRANTED. SEE JUDGMENT OF EVEN DATE. THE PRETRIAL HEARING SET FOR FEBRUARY 10, 2022 IS CANCELED. (pf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 22, 2021
29 29 motion Approve Wed 12/22 2:16 PM
Joint Motion filed by Plaintiff Nicole M Chisholm to Approve28 Stipulation and Agreement for Judgment with certificate of service. (Glasser, Gerald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
28 28 misc Stipulation Wed 12/22 2:13 PM
Stipulation and Agreement for Judgment By Plaintiff Nicole M Chisholm and National Collegiate Student Loan Trust with certificate of service. (Glasser, Gerald)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 11, 2021
27 27 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 12/12 12:22 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 12/11/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 25 Order on Motion For Summary Judgment
26 26 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 12/12 12:22 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 12/11/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 24 Order
Thursday, December 09, 2021
25 25 1 pgs order Order on Motion For Summary Judgment Thu 12/09 10:20 AM
Proceeding Memorandum and Order dated 12/9/2021 Re:18 Motion filed by Defendant The National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2005-3 For Summary Judgment. WITHDRAWN IN OPEN COURT. (pf)
Related: [-]
24 24 1 pgs order Order (Generic) Thu 12/09 10:17 AM
Proceeding Memorandum and Order dated 12/9/2021 Re: Pre-Trial Hearing on3 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Nicole M Chisholm. THIS HEARING IS CONTINUED TO FEBRUARY 10, 2022 AT 11:00AM. THE CONTINUED HEARING WILL BE CONDUCTED TELEPHONICALLY; PARTIES MAY PARTICIPATE BY DIALING 888-363-4734, AND ENTERING ACCESS CODE 496 4809 WHEN PROMPTED. (pf)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Scheduled/Cont/Resched (No Forms Attached) Thu 12/09 10:15 AM
Pre-Trial Hearing Held and Continued to 2/10/2022 at 11:00 AM at a Telephonic Hearing Re:3 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Nicole M Chisholm. (pf)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Held Thu 12/09 10:19 AM
Hearing Held Re:18 Motion filed by Defendant The National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2005-3 For Summary Judgment. (pf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 18, 2021
23 23 answer Opposition Thu 11/18 2:07 PM
Opposition with certificate of service filed by Plaintiff Nicole M Chisholm Re:18 Motion filed by Defendant The National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2005-3 For Summary Judgment with certificate of service. (Glasser, Gerald)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 29, 2021
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 10/30 12:26 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 10/29/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 20 Order To Set Hearing
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Sat 10/30 12:26 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing. Related [+] Notice Date 10/29/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19 Hearing Scheduled
Wednesday, October 27, 2021
20 20 2 pgs order Order To Set Hearing Wed 10/27 4:35 PM
Proceeding Memorandum and Order dated 10/27/2021 Re:3 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Nicole M Chisholm. IN THE INTEREST OF JUDICIAL ECONOMY, THE PRE-TRIAL HEARING SET FOR NOVEMBER 10, 2021 HAS BEEN RESCHEDULED. THE PRE-TRIAL HEARING WILL NOW BE HELD ON THURSDAY, DECEMBER 9, 2021 AT 10:00AM BY ZOOM VIDEO CONFERENCE. LINK FOR PARTICIPATION IN ZOOM VIDEO CONFERENCE: https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1610073814?pwd=dWxrZHN2NVR2TTBXU3gwbWkvNlVTUT09 Meeting ID: 161 007 3814 Passcode: 628392 For telephonic participation: 1 646 828 7666 Meeting ID: 161 007 3814 Passcode: 628392 (pf)
Related: [-]
19 19 court Hearing Scheduled (Forms Attached) Wed 10/27 3:52 PM
VIDEO Hearing Scheduled for 12/9/2021 at 10:00 AM Re:18 Motion of Defendant The National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2005-3 for Summary Judgment. Objections due by 12/06/21 at 4:00PM. (spr)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 22, 2021
18 18 motion Summary Judgment Fri 10/22 1:04 PM
Motion filed by Defendant The National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2005-3 For Summary Judgment with certificate of service. (O'Connor, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Att: 3 Exhibit B
Thursday, September 02, 2021
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend Thu 09/02 1:24 PM
Endorsed Order dated 9/2/2021 Re:16 Assented to Motion filed by Defendant The National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2005-3 for Enlargement of Deadlines [Re:10 Pre-Trial Order]. GRANTED; THE HEARING OF 09/03/21 IS CONTINUED TO 11/10/21 AT 11:00AM. THE CONTINUED HEARING WILL BE CONDUCTED TELEPHONICALLY. PARTIES MAY PARTICIPATE BY DIALING 888-363-4734, AND ENTERING ACCESS CODE 496 4809 WHEN PROMPTED. ALL RELATED DEADLINES ARE EXENDED ACCORDINGLY. (pf)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Scheduled/Cont/Resched (No Forms Attached) Thu 09/02 1:25 PM
Pre-Trial Conference Continued to 11/10/2021 at 11:00 AM at a Telephonic Hearing Related [+]. (pf)
Related: [-] 3 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Nicole M Chisholm
Tuesday, August 31, 2021
16 16 motion Extend Time Tue 08/31 12:35 PM
Assented to Motion filed by Defendant The National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2005-3 for Enlargement of Deadlines [Re:10 Pre-Trial Order] with certificate of service. (O'Connor, John)
Related: [-]
Saturday, June 12, 2021
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 06/13 12:24 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 06/12/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice
Thursday, June 10, 2021
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 06/11 12:38 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 06/10/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Pre-Trial Order
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice Thu 06/10 9:51 AM
Endorsed Order dated 6/10/2021 Re:11 Motion filed by John J. O'Connor Jr. on behalf of Brian D. Roth to Appear pro hac vice for Defendant The National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2005-3. GRANTED. (pf)
Related: [-]
court Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Thu 06/10 8:44 AM
Receipt Number phv-36691-1623256341, Fee Amount $100.00 Re:12 Notice of Fee Due (Pro Hac Vice) issued to Brian D. Roth representing The National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2005-3 Re:11 Motion for Brian D. Roth to Appear pro hac vice. (sas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 09, 2021
12 12 notice Notice of Fee Due (Pro Hac Vice) Wed 06/09 12:30 PM
Notice of Fee Due (Pro Hac Vice) issued to Brian D. Roth representing The National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2005-3 Re:11 Motion for Brian D. Roth to Appear pro hac vice filed by Defendant The National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2005-3. PHV Fee Due 6/21/2021. (pf)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Appear pro hac vice Wed 06/09 12:21 PM
Motion filed by John J. O'Connor Jr. on behalf of Brian D. Roth to Appear pro hac vice for Defendant The National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2005-3 with certificate of service. (O'Connor, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Brian D. Roth
Tuesday, June 08, 2021
10 10 order Pre-Trial Order Tue 06/08 9:22 AM
Scheduling and Pretrial Order dated 6/8/2021 Re:3 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Nicole M Chisholm. Pre-Trial Conference set for 9/3/2021 at 11:00 AM at a Telephonic Hearing. See Order for Full Text. IMPORTANT DEADLINES - DO NOT IGNORE. (pf)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 21, 2021
9 9 misc Statement Fri 05/21 1:15 PM
Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement with certificate of service filed by Defendant The National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2005-3 (O'Connor, John)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 05/21 1:12 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by The National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2005-3. (O'Connor, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 13, 2021
7 7 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 05/13 3:39 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by John J. O'Connor Jr. filed by Defendant The National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2005-3 (O'Connor, John)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 05/13 12:40 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Kristyn M Kelley with certificate of service filed by Defendant The National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2005-3 (Kelley, Kristyn)
Related: [-]
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 05/13 12:30 PM
Summons Service Executed on The National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2005-3 on 5/12/2021. (Glasser, Gerald)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 12, 2021
4 4 court Summons Issued Wed 05/12 2:35 PM
Summons Issued on The National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2005-3 Answer Due 6/11/2021. Summons must be served within seven (7) days of issuance. (pf)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 05/12 12:11 PM
Amended Complaint by Gerald Glasser on behalf of Nicole M Chisholm against The National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2005-3. (Glasser, Gerald)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Adversary Cover Sheet Wed 05/12 10:50 AM
Adversary Cover Sheet filed by Plaintiff Nicole M Chisholm (Glasser, Gerald)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 05/12 10:47 AM
DISREGARD. Adversary case 21-03008 Complaint by Nicole M Chisholm against The National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2005-3. Fee Amount $0.00. Nature of Suit(63 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(8), student loan))(Glasser, Gerald) CORRECTIVE ENTRY: Disregard - see doc. #3 for correct pdf image. (pf)
Related: [-]