California Northern District Court
Judge:Beth Labson Freeman
Case #: 5:21-cv-03559
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:May 12, 2021
Terminated:May 20, 2021
Last checked: Monday Nov 08, 2021 2:05 AM PST
Defendant
Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University
Represented By
Laura Christine Hurtado
Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP
contact info
Jacob R. Sorensen
Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP
contact info
Sarah G. Flanagan
Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Lucia Bicknell
Represented By
Jonathan J. Amoona
Winston Strawn LLP
contact info
Adam I Dale
Winston Strawn LLP
contact info
Jeffrey L. Kessler
Winston & Strawn LLP
contact info
Jeanifer Ellen Parsigian
Winston And Strawn LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Emily Brieant
Represented By
Jonathan J. Amoona
Winston Strawn LLP
contact info
Adam I Dale
Winston Strawn LLP
contact info
Jeffrey L. Kessler
Winston & Strawn LLP
contact info
Jeanifer Ellen Parsigian
Winston And Strawn LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Caroline Guden
Represented By
Jonathan J. Amoona
Winston Strawn LLP
contact info
Adam I Dale
Winston Strawn LLP
contact info
Jeffrey L. Kessler
Winston & Strawn LLP
contact info
Jeanifer Ellen Parsigian
Winston And Strawn LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Haley Koo
Represented By
Jonathan J. Amoona
Winston Strawn LLP
contact info
Adam I Dale
Winston Strawn LLP
contact info
Jeffrey L. Kessler
Winston & Strawn LLP
contact info
Jeanifer Ellen Parsigian
Winston And Strawn LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Nathan Lietzke
Represented By
Jonathan J. Amoona
Winston Strawn LLP
contact info
Adam I Dale
Winston Strawn LLP
contact info
Jeffrey L. Kessler
Winston & Strawn LLP
contact info
Jeanifer Ellen Parsigian
Winston And Strawn LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Emily Molins
Represented By
Jonathan J. Amoona
Winston Strawn LLP
contact info
Adam I Dale
Winston Strawn LLP
contact info
Jeffrey L. Kessler
Winston & Strawn LLP
contact info
Jeanifer Ellen Parsigian
Winston And Strawn LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Evan Kai Rayle
Represented By
Jonathan J. Amoona
Winston Strawn LLP
contact info
Adam I Dale
Winston Strawn LLP
contact info
Jeffrey L. Kessler
Winston & Strawn LLP
contact info
Jeanifer Ellen Parsigian
Winston And Strawn LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Nikolas Stemmet
Represented By
Jonathan J. Amoona
Winston Strawn LLP
contact info
Adam I Dale
Winston Strawn LLP
contact info
Jeffrey L. Kessler
Winston & Strawn LLP
contact info
Jeanifer Ellen Parsigian
Winston And Strawn LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, May 20, 2021
27 27 2 pgs order Order Thu 05/20 1:39 PM
ORDER APPROVING VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/20/2021. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 19, 2021
26 26 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 05/19 3:37 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Lucia Bicknell, Emily Brieant, Caroline Guden, Haley Koo, Nathan Lietzke, Emily Molins, Evan Kai Rayle, Nikolas Stemmet (Kessler, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
25 25 respm Notice of Withdrawal of Motion Wed 05/19 3:34 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Motion to Expedite Discovery (Kessler, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
24 24 4 pgs order Order on Stipulation Wed 05/19 2:46 PM
ORDER GRANTING 23 STIPULATION RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND PENDING MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/19/2021. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 05/19 1:24 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND PENDING MOTIONS filed by Lucia Bicknell, Emily Brieant, Caroline Guden, Haley Koo, Nathan Lietzke, Emily Molins, Evan Kai Rayle, Nikolas Stemmet. (Kessler, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 18, 2021
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 05/18 1:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Christine Hurtado Notice of Appearance of Laura C. Hurtado on Behalf of Defendant Stanford University (Hurtado, Laura)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 05/18 1:45 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah G. Flanagan Notice of Appearance of Sarah G. Flanagan on Behalf of Defendant Stanford University (Flanagan, Sarah)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Tue 05/18 1:43 PM
Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement and Civil Local Rule 3-15 Certification of Defendant The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University (Sorensen, Jacob)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 05/18 1:35 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob R. Sorensen Notice of Appearance of Jacob R. Sorensen on Behalf of Defendant Stanford University (Sorensen, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 17, 2021
18 18 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Mon 05/17 10:20 AM
CLERKS NOTICE CONVERTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO ZOOM WEBINAR. Case Management Conference set for 5/20/2021 10:30 AM before Judge Beth Labson Freeman will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/blf Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish t o be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at blfcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than May 18, 2021 at 2:00 PM PST. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Related [+] (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-] (s) 17
17 17 1 pgs order Order Mon 05/17 7:48 AM
ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR MAY 20, 2021, AT 10:30 A.M. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/17/2021. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 13, 2021
16 16 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 05/13 3:49 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Emily Brieant, Nathan Lietzke, Haley Koo, Lucia Bicknell, Evan Kai Rayle, Caroline Guden, Nikolas Stemmet, Emily Molins. Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University served on 5/13/2021, answer due 6/3/2021. (Parsigian, Jeanifer)
Related: [-]
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Thu 05/13 1:25 PM
ORDER GRANTING 7 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/13/2021. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Thu 05/13 1:21 PM
ORDER GRANTING 5 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/13/2021. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Thu 05/13 1:19 PM
ORDER GRANTING 4 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/13/2021. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
12 12 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Thu 05/13 12:59 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING MOTION HEARING and CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Motion hearing as to10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities reset for 10/21/2021 09:00 AM. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 10/21/2021 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 10/21/2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 12, 2021
11 11 motion Expedite Wed 05/12 5:12 PM
MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by Lucia Bicknell, Emily Brieant, Caroline Guden, Haley Koo, Nathan Lietzke, Emily Molins, Evan Kai Rayle, Nikolas Stemmet.(Parsigian, Jeanifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Expedite Discovery
10 10 motion Preliminary Injunction Wed 05/12 4:14 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Lucia Bicknell, Emily Brieant, Caroline Guden, Haley Koo, Nathan Lietzke, Emily Molins, Evan Kai Rayle, Nikolas Stemmet. Motion Hearing set for 6/17/2021 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 5/26/2021. Replies due by 6/2/2021.(Parsigian, Jeanifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Jeffrey Kessler,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 to Kessler Decl,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 to Kessler Decl,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 to Kessler Decl,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 to Kessler Decl,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 to Kessler Decl,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6 to Kessler Decl,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7 to Kessler Decl,
Att: 9 Exhibit 8 to Kessler Decl,
Att: 10 Exhibit 9 to Kessler Decl,
Att: 11 Exhibit 10 to Kessler Decl,
Att: 12 Exhibit 11 to Kessler Decl,
Att: 13 Exhibit 12 to Kessler Decl,
Att: 14 Exhibit 13 to Kessler Decl,
Att: 15 Exhibit 14 to Kessler Decl,
Att: 16 Exhibit 15 to Kessler Decl,
Att: 17 Exhibit 16 to Kessler Decl,
Att: 18 Exhibit 17 to Kessler Decl,
Att: 19 Exhibit 18 to Kessler Decl,
Att: 20 Exhibit 19 to Kessler Decl,
Att: 21 Exhibit 20 to Kessler Decl,
Att: 22 Exhibit 21 to Kessler Decl,
Att: 23 Declaration of Lucia Bicknell,
Att: 24 Declaration of Emily Brieant,
Att: 25 Declaration of Caroline Guden,
Att: 26 Declaration of Haley Koo,
Att: 27 Declaration of Nathan Lietzke,
Att: 28 Declaration of Emily Molins,
Att: 29 Declaration of Evan Kai Rayle,
Att: 30 Declaration of Nikolas Stemmet,
Att: 31 Declaration of Joe Ming,
Att: 32 Declaration of Lisa Koo,
Att: 33 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Proposed Preliminary Injunction
9 9 service Summons Issued Wed 05/12 3:57 PM
Summons Issued as to Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University. (sfbS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Wed 05/12 3:51 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 9/30/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/7/2021 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor.(sfbS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 05/12 2:56 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Adam I. Dale ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15958535.) filed by Lucia Bicknell, Emily Brieant, Caroline Guden, Haley Koo, Nathan Lietzke, Emily Molins, Evan Kai Rayle, Nikolas Stemmet. (Dale, Adam)
Related: [-]
6 6 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Wed 05/12 2:14 PM
Case assigned to Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (haS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 05/12 12:33 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Jonathan Amoona ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15957700.) filed by Lucia Bicknell, Emily Brieant, Caroline Guden, Haley Koo, Nathan Lietzke, Emily Molins, Evan Kai Rayle, Nikolas Stemmet. (Amoona, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 05/12 12:25 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Jeffrey L. Kessler ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15957661.) filed by Lucia Bicknell, Emily Brieant, Caroline Guden, Haley Koo, Nathan Lietzke, Emily Molins, Evan Kai Rayle, Nikolas Stemmet. (Kessler, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Wed 05/12 12:15 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Lucia Bicknell, Emily Brieant, Caroline Guden, Haley Koo, Nathan Lietzke, Emily Molins, Evan Kai Rayle, Nikolas Stemmet.. (Parsigian, Jeanifer)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Wed 05/12 10:38 AM
Proposed Summons. (Parsigian, Jeanifer)
Related: [-]
1 1 50 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 05/12 10:36 AM
COMPLAINT for Fraud/Intentional Misrepresentation, Fraudulent Concealment, Fraudulent Inducement, Negligent Misrepresentation, Breach of Contract, Breach of the Implied Covenant of Good Faith and Fair Dealing, and Violation of California UCL against Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15956948.). Filed byEmily Brieant, Nathan Lietzke, Haley Koo, Lucia Bicknell, Evan Kai Rayle, Caroline Guden, Nikolas Stemmet, Emily Molins.(Parsigian, Jeanifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet