Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Jeffrey J Helmick
Referred: Jonathan D Greenberg
Case #: 1:21-cv-00988
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Case Filed:May 12, 2021
Terminated:Mar 18, 2025
Petitioner
Tariq M. Debardeleben
Respondent
Harold May

GPO May 11 2023
Report and Recommendation that the 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be DENIED. (Objections to Report & Recommendation due by 5/25/2023), Referral Terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg on 5/11/23. (D,Ky)
GPO Mar 18 2025
Memorandum Opinion and Order overruling Petitioner's objections, adopting the Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg, and denying Petitioner's petition. Because Harold May currently is the Warden of the Mansfield Correctional Institution, I order that May be substituted as the Respondent in this case. re 11, 13. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 3/18/2025. (M,SM)

Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Thursday, April 17, 2025
appeal Acknowledgment from the USCA Thu 04/17 9:32 AM
Acknowledgment from the USCA for Sixth Circuit of receipt of16 Notice of Appeal (USCA# 25-3286 . Date filed in USCA 4/16/2025. (H,JL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
17 17 appeal Transcript Request - Appeal Tue 04/15 1:22 PM
Transcript Request by Tariq M. Debardeleben re16 Notice of Appeal,. Transcript is unnecessary, there were no hearings. (Patituce, Joseph)
Related: [-]
16 16 appeal Notice of Appeal Tue 04/15 1:20 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals as to14 Memorandum Opinion and Order,, Order Adopting Report and Recommendation,15 Judgment, by Tariq M. Debardeleben. ( Filing fee $ 605 receipt number AOHNDC-13052326.). (Patituce, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
15 15 order Judgment Tue 03/18 1:41 PM
Judgment Entry : For the reasons stated in the Memorandum Opinion and Order filed contemporaneously, I overrule the objections filed by Petitioner Tariq M. Debardeleben, (Doc. No.13 ), to the Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg, (Doc. No.11 ), adopt the Report and Recommendation, and deny the petition. (Doc. No.1 ). re14 . Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 3/18/2025. (M,SM)
Related: [-]
14 14 12 pgs order Memorandum Opinion and Order Order Adopting Report and Recommendation Tue 03/18 1:39 PM
Memorandum Opinion and Order overruling Petitioner's objections, adopting the Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg, and denying Petitioner's petition. Because Harold May currently is the Warden of the Mansfield Correctional Institution, I order that May be substituted as the Respondent in this case. re11 ,13 . Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 3/18/2025. (M,SM)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 26, 2023
13 13 oth_ans Objection to Report and Recommendation Mon 06/26 11:16 AM
Objection to Report and Recommendation filed by Tariq M. Debardeleben. Related document(s)11 . (Patituce, Megan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 23, 2023
12 12 motion Extension (other) Tue 05/23 1:49 PM
Unopposed Motion for extension of time until June 26, 2023 to file Objections filed by Petitioner Tariq M. Debardeleben. Related document(s)11 . (Patituce, Megan)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for extension of time (other) Tue 05/23 6:48 PM
Order [non-document] granting Petitioner's unopposed Motion for an extension of time until 6/26/2023 to file any objections to the Report and Recommendation. re11 ,12 . Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 5/23/2023.(M,SM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 11, 2023
11 11 minutes ~Util - Terminate Referral Report and Recommendation Thu 05/11 11:42 AM
Report and Recommendation that the1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be DENIED. (Objections to Report & Recommendation due by 5/25/2023), Referral Terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg on 5/11/23. (D,Ky)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 28, 2021
10 10 oth_ans Traverse to Return of Writ Tue 09/28 3:10 PM
Traverse to Return of Writ filed by Tariq M. Debardeleben. Related document(s)7 . (Patituce, Megan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 09, 2021
order Order on Motion for extension of time (other) Thu 09/09 2:38 PM
Order [non-document] granting in part petitioner's9 Unopposed Motion for extension of time to File Traverse. Petitioner is granted an extension of time, until 9/28/2021, to file traverse. Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg on 9/9/2021. (S,S)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 08, 2021
9 9 motion Extension (other) Wed 09/08 12:34 PM
Unopposed Motion for extension of time until October 13, 2021 to File Traverse filed by Petitioner Tariq M. Debardeleben. (Patituce, Megan)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 06, 2021
8 8 motion Extension (other) Fri 08/06 9:08 AM
Unopposed Motion for extension of time until September 13, 2021 to File Traverse filed by Petitioner Tariq M. Debardeleben. (Patituce, Megan)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for extension of time (other) Fri 08/06 2:57 PM
Order [non-document] granting petitioner's8 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until September 13, 2021 to File Traverse. No further extensions will be granted absent good cause shown. Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg on 8/6/2021.(S,S)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 12, 2021
7 7 answer Return of Writ (2254) Mon 07/12 1:03 PM
Return of Writ (2254)1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254), filed by Lyneal Wainwright.(Rosenberg, Hilda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit State Court Record Exhibits 1-17 Bookmarked,
Att: 2 Volume(s) Transcript of Jury Trial- Vol. I,
Att: 3 Volume(s) Transcript of Jury Trial- Vol. II,
Att: 4 Volume(s) Transcript of Jury Trial- Vol. III,
Att: 5 Volume(s) Transcript of Jury Trial- Vol. IV,
Att: 6 Volume(s) Transcript of Jury Trial- Vol. V,
Att: 7 Volume(s) Transcript of Jury Trial- Vol. VI,
Att: 8 Volume(s) Transcript of Jury Trial- Vol. VII,
Att: 9 Volume(s) Transcript of Jury Trial- Vol. VIII,
Att: 10 Volume(s) Transcript of Jury Trial- Vol. IX
Thursday, July 08, 2021
order Order on Motion for extension of time to answer Thu 07/08 9:25 AM
Order [non-document] granting Respondent's6 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until August 9, 2021 to answer Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Approved by Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg on 7/8/2021. (S,SR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 07, 2021
6 6 motion Extension (answer complaint) Wed 07/07 4:43 PM
Unopposed Motion for extension of time until August 9, 2021 to answer Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Respondent Lyneal Wainwright. (Rosenberg, Hilda)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 07, 2021
5 5 notice Attorney Appearance (atty event) Mon 06/07 1:02 PM
Attorney Appearance by Hilda Rosenberg filed by on behalf of Lyneal Wainwright. (Rosenberg, Hilda)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 27, 2021
4 4 order Magistrate Judges Initial Order Thu 05/27 8:44 AM
Magistrate Judge's Amended Initial Order (to correct Respondent). Respondent shall file an answer to the petition within 45 days from the date of this order; petitioner shall have 30 days from the filing of respondent's answer to respond; respondent shall have 15 days from the filing of petitioner's reply brief to respond. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg on 5/27/2021. (Issued by ordinary mail to Respondent, with copy of petition for writ of habeas corpus, and via email to Brian Higgins, Office of Ohio Attorney General, on 5/27/2021.) (S,S)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Magistrate Judges Initial Order Thu 05/27 8:39 AM
Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Respondent shall file an answer to the petition within 45 days from the date of this order; petitioner shall have 30 days from the filing of respondent's answer to respond; respondent shall have 15 days from the filing of petitioner's reply brief to respond. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg on 5/27/2021. (Issued by ordinary mail to Respondent, with copy of petition for writ of habeas corpus, and via email to Brian Higgins, Office of Ohio Attorney General, on 5/27/2021.) (S,S)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 14, 2021
order Automatic Reference of Administrative Action Fri 05/14 2:23 PM
Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 5/14/2021. (S,AL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 13, 2021
2 2 order Administrative Track DCM Initial Order Thu 05/13 7:55 AM
Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (L,MI)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judge Thu 05/13 7:54 AM
Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick assigned to case. (L,MI)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Thu 05/13 7:54 AM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (L,MI)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 12, 2021
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254) Wed 05/12 6:57 PM
Petition under 28 USC 2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a person in state custody. Filing fee paid $ 5, receipt number BOHNDC-10830138.. Filed by Tariq M Debardeleben. (Patituce, Megan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Brief in Support