Iowa Northern District Court
Judge:Mark A Roberts
Case #: 6:21-cv-02031
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Case Filed:May 11, 2021
Terminated:Apr 01, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Nov 07, 2021 4:39 AM CST
Counter Claimant
CUSB Bank
Represented By
Dustan J Cross
Gislason & Hunter, LLP
contact info
Michael S Dove
Gislason & Hunter LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Janeice E Brubaker
Represented By
Lylea D Critelli
Critelli PC
contact info
Nicholas V Critelli, Jr
Critelli Law
contact info
Counter Defendant
John Eric Brubaker
Represented By
Lylea D Critelli
Critelli PC
contact info
Nicholas V Critelli, Jr
Critelli Law
contact info
Cross Claimant
CUSB Bank
Represented By
Dustan J Cross
Gislason & Hunter, LLP
contact info
Michael S Dove
Gislason & Hunter LLP
contact info
Cross Defendant
Ashley Kuper
Represented By
Andrew C Johnson
Bradshaw Fowler Proctor & Fairgrave PC
contact info
Cross Defendant
Reed B Kuper
Represented By
Andrew C Johnson
Bradshaw Fowler Proctor & Fairgrave PC
contact info
Defendant
CUSB Bank
111 North Elm Street
Cresco, IA 52136
Represented By
Dustan J Cross
Gislason & Hunter, LLP
contact info
Michael S Dove
Gislason & Hunter LLP
contact info
Defendant
Reed B Kuper
3492 Golf Course Rd
Osage, IA 50461
Represented By
Andrew C Johnson
Bradshaw Fowler Proctor & Fairgrave PC
contact info
Defendant
Douglas R Yegge
75 Whispering Pines
Clinton, IA 50461
Represented By
James D Bruhn
Farwell & Bruhn
contact info
Defendant
Teresa Yegge
75 Whispering Pines
Clinton, IA 50461
Represented By
James D Bruhn
Farwell & Bruhn
contact info
Defendant
Yegge, Inc
Yegge, Inc. 700 6th Avenue
DeWitt, IA 52742
Represented By
James D Bruhn
Farwell & Bruhn
contact info
Defendant
Ashley Kuper
Represented By
Andrew C Johnson
Bradshaw Fowler Proctor & Fairgrave PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Janeice E Brubaker
7 Bennetts Rd
Forksville, PA 18616
Represented By
Lylea D Critelli
Critelli PC
contact info
Nicholas V Critelli, Jr
Critelli Law
contact info
Plaintiff
John Eric Brubaker
7 Bennetts Road
Forksville, PA 18616
Represented By
Lylea D Critelli
Critelli PC
contact info
Nicholas V Critelli, Jr
Critelli Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, April 01, 2022
58 58 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Fri 04/01 4:06 PM
ORDER re57 Joint Motion to Dismiss: The parties' motion to have the Court approve their Stipulation and dismiss the case is denied. Rather, the parties' claims against each other are deemed to be dismissed voluntarily, without need of court approval, under Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). The parties have agreed that the receiver shall be discharged as part of the settlement agreement. The parties' motion is granted with respect to the discharge of the receiver and the receiver is hereby discharged. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 4/1/2022. (jjh)
Related: [-]
57 57 motion Dismiss Fri 04/01 11:37 AM
JOINT MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiffs Janeice E Brubaker, John Eric Brubaker, Counter Defendants Janeice E Brubaker, John Eric Brubaker Responses due by 4/15/2022 (Critelli, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Mediated Agreement
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 04/05 10:03 AM
***Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the filing of57 Stipulation and58 Order. (pac)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 28, 2022
56 56 minutes ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 03/28 10:16 AM
ORDER granting the oral motion to extend the deadline to file the stipulation of dismissal. The parties have until 04/04/22 to file a stipulation of dismissal. If the case is not settled, response to54 Motion for Summary Judgment shall be due by 04/11/22. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 3/28/22. (ksy)
Related: [-]