California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:21-mj-01850
Case Filed:May 11, 2021
Terminated:Jun 08, 2021
Last checked: Thursday May 13, 2021 12:51 AM PDT
Defendant
Christian Soldi (1)
Represented By
Eugene G Iredale
Iredale & Yoo, Apc
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
Edward Christopher Beeler
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/06/2021 6:53 PM PST
Monday, May 10, 2021
Arrest of Christian Soldi (no document attached) (lrc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 11, 2021
1 1 3 pgs COMPLAINT as to Christian Soldi.(lrc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
2 2 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Christian Soldi: Initial Appearance set for 5/11/2021 before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. (no document attached) (aef)
Related: [-]
3 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: Initial Appearance as to Christian Soldi held on 5/11/2021. Defendant consents to VTC. Attorney Eugene G Iredale retained as counsel for Christian Soldi. Bond set as to Christian Soldi (1) $25,000 PS secured by 1 FRRA. Rule 5 advisement provided. ( Preliminary Hearing set for 5/25/21 at 9:00am before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. Arraignment set for 6/08/21 at 9:00am before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. ) (CD# 5/11/2021 JLB 21-1:2:31-2:47). (Plaintiff Attorney John Scannell AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Eugene Iredale RET). (aje)
Related: [-]
4 4 ***English. No Interpreter needed as to Christian Soldi (no document attached) (aje)
Related: [-]
5 5 2 pgs ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Bond set for Christian Soldi (1) $25,000 PS secured by 1 FRRA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 5/11/2021. (ekb) (jms).
Related: [-]
6 6 2 pgs ORDER as to Christian Soldi: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 5/11/21. (aje)
Related: [-]