Oregon District Court
Judge:Jolie A Russo
Case #: 3:21-cv-00745
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause15:5(a) Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:May 14, 2021
Terminated:Sep 27, 2021
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 10, 2021 1:01 AM PST
Defendant
Joseph Beekman
Represented By
Karen L. O'Connor
Stoel Rives LLP
contact info
Caroline Jane Sundbaum
Stoel Rives LLP
contact info
Defendant
Urban Waxx LLC
Represented By
Karen L. O'Connor
Stoel Rives LLP
contact info
Caroline Jane Sundbaum
Stoel Rives LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Adriana Garcia
Represented By
Christina E. Stephenson
Meyer Stephenson
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, September 27, 2021
14 14 2 pgs order Judgment - Terminate Case Mon 09/27 4:49 PM
STIPULATED GENERAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the parties hereby stipulate that this case is dismissed with prejudice, without costs or attorneys fees to any party, and with no right of appeal. Signed on 9/27/21 by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (gm)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Voluntary Dismissal of Case Mon 09/27 2:28 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal . Filed by All Defendants. (Sundbaum, Caroline)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 30, 2021
12 12 order 1 - Scheduling Mon 08/30 9:29 AM
ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: As this case is reported settled, the Telephonic Rule 16 Conference which was set for 9/2/2021 at 1:30PM is Stricken. The parties shall submit Final Papers on or before 9/29/2021. (gm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 17, 2021
11 11 order 1 - Scheduling Tue 08/17 9:45 AM
ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Resetting the Telephonic Rule 16 Conference from 8/31/2021 at 1:30PM to 9/2/2021 at 1:30PM in Portland Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. Local Rules 16-2(b) and 26-1 require that counsel confer prior to the conference. At the conference, counsel should be prepared to discuss the status of the case, relevant dates and deadlines, and any other significant issues. If consents are going to be filed, it is helpful if they are filed prior to the time of the conference, particularly if a firm trial date is desired. (gm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 20, 2021
10 10 order 1 - Scheduling Tue 07/20 2:14 PM
ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Setting a Telephonic Rule 16 Conference for 8/31/2021 at 1:30PM in Portland Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. Local Rules 16-2(b) and 26-1 require that counsel confer prior to the conference. At the conference, counsel should be prepared to discuss the status of the case, relevant dates and deadlines, and any other significant issues. If consents are going to be filed, it is helpful if they are filed prior to the time of the conference, particularly if a firm trial date is desired. (gm)
Related: [-]
9 9 oth_doc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 07/20 1:36 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Urban Waxx LLC. (Sundbaum, Caroline)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 07/20 1:35 PM
Answer to1 Complaint, Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by Joseph Beekman, Urban Waxx LLC. (Sundbaum, Caroline)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 25, 2021
7 7 service Waiver of Service Summons Tue 05/25 4:36 PM
Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Joseph Beekman waiver sent on 5/21/2021. Filed by Adriana Garcia. (Stephenson, Christina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment
6 6 service Waiver of Service Summons Tue 05/25 4:33 PM
Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Urban Waxx LLC waiver sent on 5/21/2021. Filed by Adriana Garcia. (Stephenson, Christina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment
Friday, May 21, 2021
5 5 service Summons Issued Fri 05/21 2:13 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Joseph Beekman, Urban Waxx LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 20, 2021
4 4 service Proposed Summons Thu 05/20 3:52 PM
Proposed Summons Filed by Adriana Garcia. (Stephenson, Christina)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Proposed Summons Thu 05/20 3:49 PM
Proposed Summons Filed by Adriana Garcia. (Stephenson, Christina)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 14, 2021
2 2 order 3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT Fri 05/14 4:04 PM
Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 9/13/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 10/12/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 10/12/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (sss)
Related: [-]
1 1 14 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 05/14 10:18 AM
Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8082320 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Adriana Garcia against Joseph Beekman, Urban Waxx LLC. (Stephenson, Christina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet