Washington Western District Court
Judge:John C Coughenour
Case #: 2:21-cv-00649
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrim
Case Filed:May 17, 2021
Terminated:Nov 04, 2021
Case in other court:King County Superior Court, 21-00002-05474-5
Last checked: Saturday Nov 13, 2021 2:38 AM PST
Defendant
Daiya Healthcare PLLC
Represented By
Erin C Seeberger
Bennett Bigelow & Leedom
contact info
Defendant
Bhupinder Walia
Represented By
Erin C Seeberger
Bennett Bigelow & Leedom
contact info
Defendant
Jane Doe Walia
Represented By
Erin C Seeberger
Bennett Bigelow & Leedom
contact info
Plaintiff
Markita Guiden
Represented By
Andrea H McNeely
Gordon Thomas Honeywell Llp (tac)
contact info
Stephanie L Bloomfield
Gordon Thomas Honeywell Llp (tac)
contact info
Plaintiff
Ngoc Tran
Represented By
Andrea H McNeely
Gordon Thomas Honeywell Llp (tac)
contact info
Stephanie L Bloomfield
Gordon Thomas Honeywell Llp (tac)
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Thursday, November 04, 2021
utility Terminate Civil Case Thu 11/04 11:26 AM
***Civil Case Terminated per the filing of Parties'15 Joint Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). (SR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 03, 2021
15 15 misc Stipulation Wed 11/03 3:08 PM
STIPULATION of Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by parties (Seeberger, Erin)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 30, 2021
14 14 order Protective Order Mon 08/30 8:39 AM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re Parties'13 Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order . Signed by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (SR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 26, 2021
13 13 motion Stipulated Motion Thu 08/26 4:55 PM
Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order , filed by Plaintiffs Markita Guiden, Ngoc Tran. Noting Date 8/26/2021, (Bloomfield, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 24, 2021
12 12 order JCC-Interim JSR Minute Order Tue 08/24 12:01 PM
MINUTE ENTRY SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT DATES All counsel and any pro se parties are directed to meet and confer and to provide the Court with a combined Joint Status Report (the Report) by the deadline set below. This meet-and-confer must be a face-to-face meeting or a telephonic conference. If the parties are unable to agree on any part of the Report, they may answer in separate paragraphs; no separate reports are to be filed. The Report must contain the following information: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; and 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation. The deadlines below may be extended only by court order. Any request for extension of these deadlines should be made by email to Courtroom Deputy Clerk Gabriel Traber at gabriel_traber@wawd.uscourts.gov. The parties who have appeared in this matter must meet and confer before contacting the Court to request an extension. If this case involves claims that are exempt from the requirements of FRCP 26(a) and 26(f), please notify the Courtroom Deputy Clerk. Please note: Initial Disclosures are not to be filed. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 11/1/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/8/2021, Joint Status Report due by 11/15/2021, (GT)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Stricken Hearing Tue 08/24 12:01 PM
In light of the current General Order restricting courtroom capacity to 25 people due to the highly contagious delta variant of the COVID-19 virus, the Status Conference in this matter is hereby stricken. The parties will be directed by separate entry to meet and confer and submit a joint status report.(GT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 25, 2021
10 10 discov Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 05/25 4:41 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Daiya Healthcare PLLC (Seeberger, Erin)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 24, 2021
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Mon 05/24 9:18 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) re:1 Notice of Removal, . Attorney Erin C Seeberger added to party Jane Doe Walia(pty:dft) by Daiya Healthcare PLLC, Bhupinder Walia, Jane Doe Walia.(Seeberger, Erin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 19, 2021
8 8 misc JCC-Set Status Conference Wed 05/19 1:58 PM
MINUTE ENTRY re: STATUS CONFERENCE. The attorney who will be responsible for trying the case, or that attorney's representative, should attend the conference and be prepared to discuss the following matters at the conference: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation; If counsel's office is outside of the Greater Metropolitan Seattle area, local counsel should attend on behalf of non-local counsel. If local counsel is unavailable, non-local counsel may make arrangements to participate telephonically in the conference by contacting the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at Gabriel_Traber@wawd.uscourts.gov at least TEN (10) DAYS in advance of the proceeding. Counsel do NOT need to file a Joint Status Report or Rule 26(f) Report in advance of the Status Conference. Counsel should plan on arriving 10-15 minutes early to check in with the Courtroom Deputy Clerk as the Court's calendar begins promptly at 9:00 a.m. COUNSEL OR THE PRO SE PARTY WHO FILED THIS MATTER SHALL IMMEDIATELY NOTIFY ALL PARTIES OF THE DATE AND TIME OF THE SCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. Status Conference set for 8/31/2021 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (GT)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Discovery and Depositions Order (FORM) Wed 05/19 1:54 PM
ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (GT)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Jury Demand Wed 05/19 8:59 AM
DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiffs Markita Guiden, Ngoc Tran (Bloomfield, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 18, 2021
5 5 utility Judge Assignment Letter (Removal & Transfer cases only) Tue 05/18 4:27 PM
LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (RE)
Related: [-]
utility Corporate Disclosure Statement - Notice of Deadlines Tue 05/18 4:22 PM
NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Defendant Daiya Healthcare PLLC must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 5/25/2021. (RE)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 05/18 4:24 PM
U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour added. (RE)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 17, 2021
4 4 misc Praecipe to Attach Document Mon 05/17 4:53 PM
PRAECIPE to attach document (Praecipe - Exhibit B) re1 Notice of Removal, by Defendants Daiya Healthcare PLLC, Bhupinder Walia(Seeberger, Erin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
3 3 misc Declaration (non motion) Mon 05/17 1:52 PM
DECLARATION of Erin C. Seeberger re1 Notice of Removal, by Defendants Daiya Healthcare PLLC, Bhupinder Walia (Seeberger, Erin)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 05/17 1:40 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET re1 Notice of Removal, ; filed by Defendants Daiya Healthcare PLLC, Bhupinder Walia. (Seeberger, Erin)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Mon 05/17 1:39 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 21 2-05474 5; Related [+] Attorney Erin C Seeberger added to party Daiya Healthcare PLLC(pty:dft), Attorney Erin C Seeberger added to party Bhupinder Walia(pty:dft), filed by Bhupinder Walia, Daiya Healthcare PLLC.(Seeberger, Erin)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-7086814
Att: 1 Exhibit