New York Southern District Court
Judge:Denise L Cote
Case #: 1:21-cv-04460
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332bc Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:May 18, 2021
Terminated:Jan 19, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Nov 14, 2021 5:29 AM EST
Defendant
6W Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By
Melissa Lerner
Lavely & Singer Professional Corp.
contact info
Andrew Brad Brettler
Lavely & Singer Professional Corp.
contact info
Defendant
Erich Bergen
Represented By
Melissa Lerner
Lavely & Singer Professional Corp.
contact info
Andrew Brad Brettler
Lavely & Singer Professional Corp.
contact info
Plaintiff
MZA Events, Inc.
Represented By
Bennet J. Moskowitz
Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP
contact info
Bennet Jerome Moskowitz
Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP
contact info
Steven A. Stein
Greenberg Glusker Fields Claman & Machtinger LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, February 16, 2022
37 37 order Stipulation and Order of Voluntary Dismissal ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Wed 02/16 10:44 AM
STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a), Plaintiff MZA Events, Inc. and Defendants Erich Bergen and 6W Entertainment, Inc. stipulate to the dismissal of this action, with prejudice. Each party to bear its/his own costs and fees. IT IS SO STIPULATED. So ordered. 6W Entertainment, Inc. and Erich Bergen terminated. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 2/16/2022) (vfr)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Event Type Error Wed 02/16 10:12 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Steven Stein to RE-FILE Document 36 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. Use the event type Proposed Stipulation and Order found under the event list Proposed Orders. Make sure to attach the correct signed (scanned ink signature image) PDF. (tp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 15, 2022
36 36 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 02/15 5:52 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, against the defendant(s) All Defendants and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by MZA Events, Inc.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Stein, Steven)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 19, 2022
34 34 1 pgs order Order of Discontinuance ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 01/19 4:34 PM
ORDER OF DISCONTINUANCE.... It having been reported to this Court that this case has been settled, it is hereby ORDERED that the above-captioned action is discontinued without costs to any party and without prejudice to restoring the action to this Court's calendar if the application to restore the action is made by February 18, 2022. If no such application is made by that date, today's dismissal of the action is with prejudice. See Muze, Inc. v. Digital On Demand, Inc. 356 F. 3d 492, 494 n.1 (2d Cir. 2004). ( Motions due by 2/18/2022.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 1/19/2022) (vfr)
Related: [-]
33 33 misc Letter Wed 01/19 2:27 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Steven A. Stein dated January 19, 2022 re: Joint Status Update. Document filed by MZA Events, Inc...(Stein, Steven)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 10, 2021
adr Notice of Mediator Assignment Wed 11/10 1:02 PM
NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator.(ah)
Related: [-]
adr Mediation Conference Scheduled Wed 11/10 1:03 PM
FIRST MEDIATION CONFERENCE. Mediation Conference scheduled for 12/30/2021 at 10:00 AM in telephone or video conference.(ah)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 22, 2021
32 32 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 10/22 11:15 AM
ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the case management plan entered on July 30, 2021 is amended as follows. The following schedule shall govern the further conduct of pretrial proceedings in this case. This case will be referred to mediation to occur in December 2021. The Clerk of Court will contact the parties when a mediator has been selected. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all fact discovery must be completed by January 28, 2022. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants shall notify the Court by January 28, 2022 if they intend to file a motion for summary judgment. Any motion for summary judgment will be filed by February 18, 2022. Any opposition must be filed by March 11, 2022. Any reply must be filed by March 25, 2022. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that in the event no motion is filed, plaintiff's identification of experts and disclosure of expert testimony conforming to the requirements of Rule 26(a)(2)(B), Fed. R. Civ. O., must occur by February 18, 2022. Defendants' identification of experts and disclosure of expert testimony must occur by March 11, 2022. Depositions of expert witnesses must occur by April 1, 2022. SO ORDERED. ( Deposition due by 4/1/2022., Fact Discovery due by 1/28/2022., Motions due by 2/18/2022., Responses due by 3/11/2022, Replies due by 3/25/2022.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 10/22/2021) (vfr)
Related: [-]
31 31 order Mediation Referral Order Fri 10/22 10:56 AM
AMENDED MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that this case is referred for mediation to the Court-annexed Mediation Program to occur in December 2021. The parties are notified that Local Rule 83.9 shall govern the mediation and are directed to participate in the mediation in good faith. The mediation will have no effect upon any scheduling Order issued by this Court without leave of this Court. Mediators will be assigned based on the nature of suit. Additional expertise requests should promptly be directed to the Mediation Office. SO ORDERED. Please reference the following when corresponding with the Mediation Office. E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone (212) 805-0643, and facsimile (212) 805-0647. Mediator to be Assigned by 11/1/2021. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 10/22/2021) (vfr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 21, 2021
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Tue 11/02 12:28 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Denise L. Cote: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 10/21/2021. (jwh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 13, 2021
30 30 2 pgs misc Letter Wed 10/13 3:09 PM
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Steven A. Stein dated October 13, 2021 re: Response to Court's 9/16/2021 Notice of Pretrial Conference. Document filed by MZA Events, Inc...(Stein, Steven)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 16, 2021
29 29 2 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Thu 09/16 4:38 PM
NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference by telephone set for 10/21/2021 at 04:00 PM before Judge Denise L. Cote. The parties shall use the following dial-in credentials for the conference. Dial-in: 888-363-4749 Access code: 4324948. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 9/16/2021) (vfr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 14, 2021
28 28 order Protective Order Tue 09/14 11:53 AM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 9/14/2021) (vfr)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 13, 2021
27 27 7 pgs misc Proposed Protective Order Mon 09/13 2:07 PM
PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Document filed by MZA Events, Inc...(Stein, Steven)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 08, 2021
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment Wed 09/08 4:33 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Denise L. Cote. Judge Vernon S. Broderick is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 22, 2021
23 23 2 pgs order Order Thu 07/22 11:20 AM
ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby: ORDERED that, in light of the public health crisis, the Court will not be holding an initial pretrial conference. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, by July 30, 2021, the parties submit a joint letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, providing the following information in separate paragraphs: as further set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 7/22/2021) (kv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 20, 2021
22 22 14 pgs answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 07/20 6:47 PM
ANSWER to18 Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by 6W Entertainment, Inc., Erich Bergen..(Lerner, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 13, 2021
21 21 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Tue 07/13 3:44 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT terminating15 Motion to Dismiss;20 LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Andrew Brettler dated July 12, 2021. ENDORSEMENT: APPLICATION GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the open motion at Document 15. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 7/13/2021) (cf)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 12, 2021
20 20 1 pgs misc Letter Mon 07/12 5:06 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Andrew Brettler dated July 12, 2021 re: Motion To Dismiss. Document filed by 6W Entertainment, Inc., Erich Bergen..(Brettler, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 07, 2021
19 19 1 pgs order Order Wed 07/07 5:35 PM
ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby: ORDERED that Defendants shall file a letter within seven (7) days deciding whether their motion to dismiss should be deemed moot without prejudice to refile a new motion to dismiss in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(3), or if I should evaluate Defendants' current motion to dismiss in light of the facts alleged in the amended complaint. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 7/7/2021) (kv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 06, 2021
18 18 19 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Tue 07/06 9:21 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against 6W Entertainment, Inc., Erich Bergen with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by MZA Events, Inc...(Moskowitz, Bennet)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 2 3 pgs Exhibit B
Wednesday, June 16, 2021
17 17 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 06/16 4:45 PM
ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby: ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file any amended complaint by July 6, 2021. It is unlikely that Plaintiff will have a further opportunity to amend. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if no amended complaint is filed, Plaintiff shall serve any opposition to the motion to dismiss by July 15, 2021. Defendants' reply, if any, shall be served by July 29, 2021. SO ORDERED., ( Amended Pleadings due by 7/6/2021.) (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 6/16/2021) (ama)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 15, 2021
16 16 18 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Tue 06/15 7:30 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:15 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by 6W Entertainment, Inc., Erich Bergen..(Brettler, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A (April 13, 2021 Email),
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion To Dimiss
15 15 motion Dismiss Tue 06/15 7:26 PM
MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by 6W Entertainment, Inc., Erich Bergen..(Brettler, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 07, 2021
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 06/07 5:16 PM
ORDER granting13 Motion for MELISSA Y. LERNER to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vernon S. Broderick)(Text Only Order) (msa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 03, 2021
misc Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion Thu 06/03 8:55 AM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 13 MOTION for MELISSA Y. LERNER to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24621937. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 02, 2021
13 13 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 06/02 8:26 PM
MOTION for MELISSA Y. LERNER to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24621937. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by 6W Entertainment, Inc., Erich Bergen..(Lerner, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, June 01, 2021
12 12 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 06/01 3:51 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER: THEREFORE, it is hereby stipulated and agreed between counsel for the respective parties that Defendants may file a response to the Complaint on or before June 15, 2021. 6W Entertainment, Inc. answer due 6/15/2021; Erich Bergen answer due 6/15/2021. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 6/1/2021) (va)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Proposed Stipulation and Order Tue 06/01 9:10 AM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by 6W Entertainment, Inc., Erich Bergen..(Brettler, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 25, 2021
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 05/25 4:19 PM
ORDER granting7 Motion for Steven A. Stein to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vernon S. Broderick)(Text Only Order) (msa)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 24, 2021
9 9 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 05/24 4:44 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Document filed by MZA Events, Inc...(Moskowitz, Bennet)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 05/24 4:43 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Document filed by MZA Events, Inc...(Moskowitz, Bennet)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 05/24 3:31 PM
MOTION for Steven A. Stein to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24580737. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by MZA Events, Inc...(Stein, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Steven Stein In Support of Pro Hac Vice admission,
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
misc Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion Mon 05/24 3:48 PM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 7 MOTION for Steven A. Stein to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24580737. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 20, 2021
6 6 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 05/20 2:23 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by MZA Events, Inc...(Moskowitz, Bennet)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/20 12:20 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bennet Jerome Moskowitz on behalf of MZA Events, Inc...(Moskowitz, Bennet)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 19, 2021
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Wed 05/19 9:34 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 05/19 9:34 AM
Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 05/19 9:35 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 18, 2021
4 4 service Affidavit of Service Other Tue 05/18 2:56 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet, Corporate Disclosure Statement served on MZA Events, Inc. on May 18, 2021. Service was accepted by Steven Stein, attorney for MZA Events, Inc.. Service was made by E-Mail. Document filed by 6W Entertainment, Inc., Erich Bergen..(Brettler, Andrew)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 05/18 2:23 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by 6W Entertainment, Inc...(Brettler, Andrew)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 05/18 2:21 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Brettler, Andrew)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Tue 05/18 2:08 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 653109/2021. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24554788).Document filed by 6W Entertainment, Inc., Erich Bergen..(Brettler, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 17 pgs Exhibit 1 (Summons & Complaint with Exhibit A)