Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:J P Boulee
Referred: John K Larkins, III
Case #: 1:21-cv-02077
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12101 et seq. Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990
Case Filed:May 17, 2021
Terminated:Dec 03, 2021
Last checked: Saturday Nov 13, 2021 5:09 AM EST
Defendant
Sharon Boston
Defendant
Vangie Dennis
Defendant
Nerissa Thompson
Defendant
Wellstar Health System
Represented By
Charles L. Bachman, Jr.
Gregory, Doyle, Calhoun & Rogers, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Destiny Clifford
265 18th Street, NW Apt. 2334
Atlanta, GA 30363


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, December 03, 2021
order Order Fri 12/03 10:42 AM
ORDER : After reviewing Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss and Defendant'response thereto, this Court finds that it is appropriate to construe Plaintiff's Motion as a Notice of Dismissal pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41. The Clerk is DIRECTED to dismiss this action with prejudice and close this case. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 12/3/21. (bnw)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Fri 12/03 10:44 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Destiny Clifford re Order. (bnw)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Fri 12/03 10:45 AM
Civil Case Terminated. Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III terminated from case. (bnw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 02, 2021
18 18 respm Response to Motion Thu 12/02 4:08 PM
RESPONSE re17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Wellstar Health System. (Bachman, Charles)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 01, 2021
17 17 motion Dismiss Thu 12/02 9:54 AM
MOTION to Dismiss by Destiny Clifford. (rjc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 17, 2021
16 16 2 pgs order Order for Service of Report and Recommendation Wed 11/17 2:34 PM
ORDER for Service of15 Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins III. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins III on 11/17/2021. (cmd)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Report and Recommendation Wed 11/17 2:32 PM
NON-FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM: It is RECOMMENDED that Wellstar's motion to dismiss [Doc.13 ] be GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Specifically, it is RECOMMENDED that the motion to dismiss be GRANTED as to Plaintiff's Georgia Disability Code claim and ADA claims to the extent that they are alleged against Dennis, Thompson, or Boston and that the motion be DENIED as to Plaintiff's failure-to-accommodate claim. Finally, it is RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff be ORDERED to amend her complaint consistent with the instructions above within 14 days following the District Court's ruling on this report and recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins III on 11/17/2021. (cmd)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Wed 11/17 2:35 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Destiny Clifford re15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Wellstar Health System,16 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation,. (cmd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 22, 2021
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Wed 09/22 4:35 PM
Submission of14 Order to Show Cause,, to Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins. (ayw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 02, 2021
14 14 3 pgs order Order to Show Cause Thu 09/02 12:49 PM
ORDER - Plaintiff is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE why the claims addressed in the motion should not be dismissed no later than September 16, 2021. The Court will take Plaintiffs failure to do so as an indication that she is not interested in prosecuting this case, and will recommend the dismissal of this action. The Clerk is DIRECTED to resubmit the case to the undersigned after September 17, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 9/2/2021. (tcc)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Thu 09/02 12:54 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Destiny Clifford re14 Order to Show Cause. (tcc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 24, 2021
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Tue 08/24 8:59 AM
Submission of13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM to Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins. (aaq)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 04, 2021
13 13 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 08/04 12:59 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint with Brief In Support by Wellstar Health System. (Bachman, Charles)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 22, 2021
12 12 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 07/27 9:39 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Wellstar Health System et al with Jury Demand filed by Destiny Clifford.(ah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit List,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Exhibit F,
Att: 8 Exhibit G,
Att: 9 Exhibit H,
Att: 10 Exhibit I,
Att: 11 Exhibit J,
Att: 12 Exhibit K,
Att: 13 Exhibit L,
Att: 14 Exhibit M,
Att: 15 Exhibit N,
Att: 16 Exhibit O,
Att: 17 Exhibit P,
Att: 18 Exhibit Q,
Att: 19 Exhibit R,
Att: 20 Exhibit S,
Att: 21 Exhibit T,
Att: 22 Exhibit U,
Att: 23 Exhibit V,
Att: 24 Exhibit W,
Att: 25 Exhibit X,
Att: 26 Exhibit Y,
Att: 27 Exhibit Z,
Att: 28 Exhibit AA,
Att: 29 Exhibit BB,
Att: 30 Exhibit CC,
Att: 31 Exhibit DD,
Att: 32 Exhibit EE,
Att: 33 Exhibit FF,
Att: 34 Exhibit GG,
Att: 35 Exhibit HH,
Att: 36 Exhibit II,
Att: 37 Exhibit JJ,
Att: 38 Exhibit KK
Thursday, July 08, 2021
11 11 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Motion for Leave to File Thu 07/08 11:28 AM
ORDER GRANTING9 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file an amended complaint no later than 7/22/2021. Wellstar's7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim is DENIED AS MOOT and without prejudice to is reasserting its arguments. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 7/8/2021. (adg)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Thu 07/08 11:30 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Destiny Clifford re11 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Order on Motion for Leave to File. (adg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 30, 2021
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Wed 06/30 4:02 PM
Submission of7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM to Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins. (rjc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 23, 2021
10 10 respm Response to Motion Wed 06/23 11:59 AM
RESPONSE re9 MOTION for Leave to File to Amend Complaint filed by Wellstar Health System. (Bachman, Charles)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 15, 2021
9 9 motion Leave to File Document Wed 06/16 3:28 PM
MOTION for Leave to Amend First Complaint with Brief In Support by Destiny Clifford.(rjc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service and Compliance
Friday, June 04, 2021
8 8 misc Certificate of Interested Persons Fri 06/04 3:18 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons by Wellstar Health System. (Bachman, Charles)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 06/04 3:17 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Wellstar Health System. (Bachman, Charles)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 27, 2021
6 6 service Return of Service Executed Thu 05/27 3:48 PM
Return of Service Executed by Destiny Clifford. Wellstar Health System served on 5/18/2021, answer due 6/8/2021. (rjc)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 17, 2021
5 5 service Summons Issued Tue 05/18 12:52 PM
Summons Issued as to Sharon Boston. (eop)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 05/18 12:51 PM
Summons Issued as to Nerissa Thompson. (eop)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 05/18 12:50 PM
Summons Issued as to Vangie Dennis. (eop)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 05/18 12:49 PM
Summons Issued as to Wellstar Health System. (eop)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 05/18 12:44 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Destiny Clifford. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number GAN100130020)(eop)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet