Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Terry R Means
Case #: 4:21-cv-00665
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:May 19, 2021
Re-opened:Mar 10, 2023
Terminated:Jul 28, 2022
Last checked: Monday Feb 19, 2024 1:43 AM CST
Defendant
Aaron Dean
Represented By
Kenneth E East
Law Office Of Kenneth E. East
contact info
Defendant
The City of Fort Worth
Represented By
Lynn Marie Winter
Cox PLLC
contact info
Laetitia Coleman Brown
Fort Worth City Attorney'S Office
contact info
Carl Ray Qualls, III
City Of Fort Worth Attorney'S Office
contact info
Guardian Ad Litem
Guardian Ad Litem
Represented By
Luke Dow
Luke Dow Law Firm
contact info
J. Luke Dow
Wenholz Dow, P.C.
contact info
Movant
Jerome Ekpo Eschor
Represented By
Bassey O Akpaffiong
Law Office Of Bassey O Akpaffiong
contact info
Tanika J Solomon
Law Office Of Tanika J. Solomon
contact info
Plaintiff
David C Bakutis
Represented By
John P Kennedy
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Rizwan A Qureshi
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
John J Coyle
Mceldrew Purtell
contact info
Plaintiff
Amber Carr
Represented By
Jay D Ellwanger
Ellwanger Henderson Lllp
contact info
Jozef Sebastian Van Coevorden
Ellwanger Law LLP
contact info
David Warren Henderson
Ellwanger Henderson Lllp
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Betsy Price
Terminated: 09/02/2021
Defendant
Police Chief Ed Kraus
Terminated: 09/02/2021
Represented By
James T Jeffrey, Jr
Law Offices Of Jim Jeffrey
contact info
Defendant
Mayor Betsy Price
Terminated: 02/18/2022
Represented By
Christopher Allen Klement
Fee Smith Sharp & Vitullo LLP
contact info
Darrell G-M Noga
Fee Smith, Sharp & Vitullo LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Ashley Carr
Terminated: 09/02/2021
Represented By
John P Kennedy
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Daniel Newcomb Purtell
Mceldrew Young Purtell Merritt
contact info
Rizwan A Qureshi
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
John J Coyle
Mceldrew Purtell
contact info
Stacy Sylvester Lee Merritt, Sr
Merritt Law Firm LLC
contact info
Mark V Maguire
Mceldrew Young & Purteli
contact info
Stacy L Merritt, L
Mceldrew Young Purtell Merritt
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, April 25, 2025
142 142 9 pgs order Order for Scheduling Order Proposal Fri 04/25 10:48 AM
ORDER TO SUBMIT JOINT STATUS REPORT AND PROPOSED DISCOVERY PLAN: The parties are ordered to electronically file with the clerk of the court the signed joint status report and proposed discovery plan (one instrument) within 28 days of the date of the filing of this order. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 4/25/2025) (jnp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
141 141 1 pgs order Order Lifting Stay ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Thu 04/24 4:02 PM
ORDER LIFTING PARTIAL STAY: Before the Court is plaintiff David Bakutis's original and amended unopposed motions to lift the partial stay (docs.139 and140 ). Having reviewed the motions and the applicable law, the Court concludes that the motions should be, and they are hereby, GRANTED. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 4/24/2025) (jnp)
Related: [-]