California Central District Court
Judge:Hernan D Vera
Referred: Margo A Rocconi
Case #: 2:21-cv-04211
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:77 Securities Fraud
Case Filed:May 20, 2021
Terminated:Jan 22, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 16, 2021 1:23 AM PST
Defendant
Brookdale Consulting LLC
Defendant
Steven Robert Comisar
Defendant
Dale Jay Engelhardt
27525 Puerta Real, Suite 100-483
Mission Viejo, CA 92691
Defendant
Ross Gregory Erskine
Represented By
Bernard Conrad Jasper
Jasper Law
contact info
Michael J. Rosen
Michael J Rosen PA
contact info
Blair Berk
Tarlow And Berk PC
contact info
Lawrence William Horwitz
Lockett And Horwitz
contact info
Yiying Wang Fong
Lockett And Horwitz Aplc
contact info
Defendant
Executive Performance Group, Inc.
Defendant
Meridian Point, LLC
Represented By
Bernard Conrad Jasper
Jasper Law
contact info
Michael J. Rosen
Michael J Rosen PA
contact info
Lawrence William Horwitz
Lockett And Horwitz
contact info
Yiying Wang Fong
Lockett And Horwitz Aplc
contact info
Defendant
Personal Group, LLC
Represented By
Bernard Conrad Jasper
Jasper Law
contact info
Michael J. Rosen
Michael J Rosen PA
contact info
Lawrence William Horwitz
Lockett And Horwitz
contact info
Yiying Wang Fong
Lockett And Horwitz Aplc
contact info
Plaintiff
U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By
Tracy Schloss Combs
Us Securities And Exchange Commission
contact info
Casey R. Fronk
Us Securities And Exchange Commission
contact info
Amy J. Longo
Us Securities And Exchange Commission
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
LFS Funding Limited Partnership
Terminated: 05/25/2021
Defendant
Stephen Michael Thompson
Terminated: 05/25/2021


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, January 17, 2025
147 147 notice Clerical Error (G-11) Fri 01/17 2:05 PM
NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error, the following docket entry has been corrected as indicated below: Re: Abstract of Judgment issued146 . Filed date: January 14, 2025. Other: Abstract was not docketed correctly and does not indicate amounts or linked back to Judgment. Corrected Abstract of Judgment is being docketed forthwith. (bm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
149 149 misc Abstract of Judgment issued Fri 01/17 2:16 PM
ABSTRACT of Judgment issued in favor of Plaintiff U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission and against Dale Jay Engelhardt in the principal amount of $ 54,620.00, interest in the amount of $ 0.00, attorneys fees of $ 0.00, costs of $ 0.00. RE: Judgment139 (bm)
Related: [-]
148 148 misc Abstract of Judgment issued Fri 01/17 2:11 PM
ABSTRACT of Judgment issued in favor of Plaintiff U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission and against Dale Jay Engelhardt in the principal amount of $ 109,240.00, interest in the amount of $ 0.00, attorneys fees of $ 0.00, costs of $ 0.00. RE: Judgment139 (bm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
146 146 misc Abstract of Judgment issued Fri 01/17 1:39 PM
NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR ISSUED ON 1/17/2025, SEE DKT. No.147 . ABSTRACT of Judgment issued in favor of Plaintiff U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission and against Dale Jay Engelhardt (bm) Modified on 1/17/2025 (bm)
Related: [-]