Vermont District Court
Judge:Christina Reiss
Case #: 2:21-cv-00132
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:May 20, 2021
Terminated:Nov 22, 2021
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 16, 2021 3:26 AM EST
Defendant
Christine Brock
Represented By
David A. Boyd, Esq.
Office Of The Vermont Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Anne Damone
Represented By
David A. Boyd, Esq.
Office Of The Vermont Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Patricia Gabel
Represented By
David A. Boyd, Esq.
Office Of The Vermont Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Gaye Paquette
Represented By
David A. Boyd, Esq.
Office Of The Vermont Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Amanda Stites
Represented By
David A. Boyd, Esq.
Office Of The Vermont Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Margaret Villeneuve
Represented By
David A. Boyd, Esq.
Office Of The Vermont Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
Courthouse News Service
Represented By
Jonathan E. Ginsberg, Esq.
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP
contact info
William Hibsher, Esq.
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP
contact info
Robert B. Hemley, Esq.
Gravel & Shea PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Gannett Vermont Publishing, Inc.
Represented By
Jonathan E. Ginsberg, Esq.
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP
contact info
William Hibsher, Esq.
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP
contact info
Robert B. Hemley, Esq.
Gravel & Shea PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Gray Media Group, Inc.
Represented By
Jonathan E. Ginsberg, Esq.
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP
contact info
William Hibsher, Esq.
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP
contact info
Robert B. Hemley, Esq.
Gravel & Shea PC
contact info
Plaintiff
New England First Amendment Coalition
Represented By
Jonathan E. Ginsberg, Esq.
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP
contact info
William Hibsher, Esq.
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP
contact info
Robert B. Hemley, Esq.
Gravel & Shea PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Sample News Group, LLC
Represented By
Jonathan E. Ginsberg, Esq.
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP
contact info
William Hibsher, Esq.
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP
contact info
Robert B. Hemley, Esq.
Gravel & Shea PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Vermont Community Newspaper Group, LLC
Represented By
Jonathan E. Ginsberg, Esq.
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP
contact info
William Hibsher, Esq.
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP
contact info
Robert B. Hemley, Esq.
Gravel & Shea PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Vermont Journalism Trust, Ltd.
Represented By
Jonathan E. Ginsberg, Esq.
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP
contact info
William Hibsher, Esq.
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP
contact info
Robert B. Hemley, Esq.
Gravel & Shea PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Vermont Press Association, Inc.
Represented By
Jonathan E. Ginsberg, Esq.
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP
contact info
William Hibsher, Esq.
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP
contact info
Robert B. Hemley, Esq.
Gravel & Shea PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Da Capo Publishing, Inc
Represented By
Jonathan E. Ginsberg, Esq.
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP
contact info
William Hibsher, Esq.
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP
contact info
Robert B. Hemley, Esq.
Gravel & Shea PC
contact info

GPO Nov 19 2021
OPINION AND ORDER denying as moot 26 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 43 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part Request for Permanent Injunctive Relief and denies Request for Declaratory Relief re: 16 First Amended Complaint. Defendants are ENJOINED from delaying public access to electronically filed civil complaints until the Vermont Superior Courts' pre-access review process is complete. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 11/19/2021. (law)

Docket last updated: 03/24/2023 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, December 27, 2021
71 71 order Stipulation and Order Mon 12/27 12:14 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER to Stay Litigation of Costs and Fees Pending Appeal. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 12/27/2021. (kp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 23, 2021
70 70 misc Stipulation Thu 12/23 2:28 PM
STIPULATION to Stay Litigation of Costs and Fees Pending Appeal by Christine Brock, Anne Damone, Patricia Gabel, Gaye Paquette, Amanda Stites, Margaret Villeneuve (Boyd, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 22, 2021
69 69 appeal Transmitted Index on Appeal Wed 12/22 4:28 PM
TRANSMITTED Index on Appeal Circuit No. 21-3098 re:66 Notice of Appeal. (gmg)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 20, 2021
67 67 motion Attorney Fees (non-EAJA) Mon 12/20 8:44 AM
MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by Courthouse News Service, Da Capo Publishing, Inc, Gannett Vermont Publishing, Inc., Gray Media Group, Inc., New England First Amendment Coalition, Sample News Group, LLC, Vermont Community Newspaper Group, LLC, Vermont Journalism Trust, Ltd., Vermont Press Association, Inc..(Hemley, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of William J. Hibsher,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Declaration of Robert B. Hemley,
Att: 8 Exhibit 1,
Att: 9 Declaration of Ritchie E. Berger,
Att: 10 Exhibit A,
Att: 11 Declaration of Rachel Matteo-Boehm,
Att: 12 Certificate of Service
appeal USCA Appeal Fees Mon 12/20 3:05 PM
USCA Appeal Fees Received $ 505.00 PAID. Receipt number 4682025413 re66 Notice of Appeal filed by Gaye Paquette, Christine Brock, Amanda Stites, Anne Damone, Margaret Villeneuve, Patricia Gabel. (gmg)
Related: [-]