Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Leo T Sorokin
Case #: 1:21-cv-10842
Nature of Suit870 Federal Tax Suits - Taxes (U.S. Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause26:7401 IRS: Tax Liability
Case Filed:May 21, 2021
Terminated:Aug 23, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 17, 2021 3:31 AM EST
Defendant
Scott M. McClain
693 Commercial Street
Weymouth, MA 02189
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Edward J. Murphy
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info

GPO Jul 28 2022
District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOC. NO. 30) (Belmont, Kellyann)

Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, April 04, 2025
53 53 4 pgs order Order Fri 04/04 8:52 AM
District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. ORDER AMENDING ORDER OF SALE OF AUGUST 23, 2022 (ECF NO. 37 ) . (FGD)
Related: [-]
52 52 order Order on Motion to Amend Fri 04/04 8:50 AM
District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re:50 Assented to MOTION to Amend37 Order on Motion for Order of Sale by United States of America. ALLOWED. (FGD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
51 51 5 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Thu 04/03 3:49 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re50 Assented to MOTION to Amend37 Order on Motion for Order of Sale filed by United States of America. (Murphy, Edward)
Related: [-]
50 50 motion Amend Thu 04/03 3:49 PM
Assented to MOTION to Amend37 Order on Motion for Order of Sale by United States of America.(Murphy, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
49 49 order Order on Motion to Withdraw Thu 04/03 10:31 AM
District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re:48 MOTION to Withdraw46 Assented to MOTION to Amend. ALLOWED. (FGD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
48 48 motion Withdraw Wed 04/02 3:29 PM
MOTION to Withdraw46 Assented to MOTION to Amend37 Order on Motion for Order of Sale and allow private sale by United States of America.(Murphy, Edward)
Related: [-]
47 47 5 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Wed 04/02 1:04 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re46 Assented to MOTION to Amend37 Order on Motion for Order of Sale and allow private sale filed by United States of America. (Murphy, Edward)
Related: [-]
46 46 motion Amend Wed 04/02 1:03 PM
Assented to MOTION to Amend37 Order on Motion for Order of Sale and allow private sale by United States of America.(Murphy, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order