Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:21-bk-10609

Louisiana Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Meredith S Grabill
Case #: 2:21-ap-01020
Nature of Suit1 null
Case Filed:May 20, 2021
Terminated:Sep 29, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
UTC Laboratories, LLC
935 Gravier Street Suite 2020
New Orleans, LA 70112
Represented By
Justin Alsterberg
Sternberg, Naccari & White, LLC
contact info
Michael S. Finkelstein
Sternberg, Naccari & White, LLC
contact info
M. Suzanne Montero
Sternberg, Naccari & White, LLC
contact info
Scott L. Sternberg
Sternberg, Naccari & White, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Prima Health, LLC
Represented By
Prima Health, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Strategic Value Group, LLC
33530 1st Way S Suite 102
Federal Way, WA 98003
Represented By
Mary E Roper
Roper Ligh, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/22/2025 1:07 PM CDT
Wednesday, September 29, 2021
court Close Adversary Case Wed 09/29 3:12 PM
Adversary Case Closed 2:21-ap-1020. (Nunnery, J.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 15, 2021
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Wed 09/15 11:17 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Documen Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)10 Order) Notice Date 09/15/2021. (Admin.
Monday, September 13, 2021
10 10 1 pgs order Order (Generic) Mon 09/13 10:43 AM
Order Remanding Proceeding to the Civil District Court for theParish of Orleans. Signed on September 13, 2021 (Nunnery, J.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 05, 2021
9 9 order Continuing Pre Trial (Order) Thu 08/05 12:29 PM
Order Granting Motion to Continue Pre Trial Conference. Signed on August 5, 2021 Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 9/13/2021 at 10:00 AM via Dial-In Number: 888-684-8852, Access Code:1118441. (Nunnery, J.)
Related: [-] 5 Order Setting Trial and Pre-Trial Conference,8 Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing filed by Defendant UTC Laboratories, LLC
8 8 motion Continue Hearing (Motion) (AP) Thu 08/05 8:43 AM
Motion to Continue Hearing On Pre-Trial Conference Filed by UTC Laboratories, LLC Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)5 Order Setting Trial and Pre-Trial Conference) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support #2 Proposed Order) (Finkelstein, Michael
Tuesday, August 03, 2021
7 7 court Document (AP) Tue 08/03 4:43 PM
Return Mail- No address for Defendant Prima Health, LL Related [+]. (Nunnery, J.)
Related: [-] 5 Order Setting Trial and Pre-Trial Conference
Saturday, July 24, 2021
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 07/24 11:17 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Documen Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)5 Order Setting Trial and Pre-Trial Conference) Notice Date 07/24/2021. (Admin.
Thursday, July 22, 2021
5 5 order Setting Trial and Pre-Trial Conference (Order) Thu 07/22 1:17 PM
Order Setting Pre-Trial Conference. Signed on July 22, 2021 Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 8/12/2021 at 02:30 PM via Dial-In Number: 888-684-8852, Access Code:1118441.. (Nunnery, J.)
Related: [-]
Saturday, June 19, 2021
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 06/19 11:18 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Documen Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)3 Order of Recusal) Notice Date 06/19/2021. (Admin.
Thursday, June 17, 2021
3 3 order Recusal (Order) Thu 06/17 3:53 PM
Order of Recusal- Involvement of Meredith S. Grabill Terminated and Judge Douglas D. Dodd assigned to the case. Signed on June 17, 2021 (Nunnery, J.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 20, 2021
2 2 court Document (AP) Thu 05/20 2:29 PM
Documents filed in USDC 21-89 Related [+]. (Nunnery, J.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Strategic Value Group, LLC
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 05/20 1:14 PM
Adversary case 21-01020 Adversary Case - Notice of Removal from USDC - Civil Action No. 21-892, H(5) Strategic Value Group, LLC against UTC Laboratories, LLC , Prima Health, LLC . (01 (Determination of removed claim or cause)) (Nunnery, J.)
Related: [-]