Michigan Western District Court
Judge:Hala Y Jarbou
Referred: Sally J Berens
Case #: 1:21-cv-00430
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:2409(a) Quiet Title Action
Case Filed:May 24, 2021
Terminated:Apr 25, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Nov 20, 2021 5:42 AM EST
defendant
Kingdom Warriors Ministry
defendant
RESTRICTED FILER Keturah Mixon
243 Devon Rd.
Battle Creek, MI 49015
plaintiff
Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By
Kelli L. Baker
Plunkett Cooney (grand Rapids)
contact info

GPO Dec 22 2021
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the Court deny Mixon's motion to dismiss,14, and that it find that: (1) diversity jurisdiction exists over BANA's claim; and (2) KWM is a fictitious entity that cannot be served with process; objections to R&R due within 14 days; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jln)
GPO Jan 18 2022
T. Neff, clb)ORDER APPROVING AND ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 47; Motion to Dismiss 14 is DENIED; Defendant Keturah Mixon shall, not later than February 3, 2022, file an answer to Plaintiff's Complaint; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet
GPO Apr 11 2022
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the Court deny the Mixons' motions to dismiss 56, 64; objections to R&R due within 14 days; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jln)
GPO Jun 15 2022
OPINION AND ORDER APPROVING AND ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 71; Defendants' Motions to Dismiss [ 56] and 64 are DENIED; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
GPO Jun 06 2023
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the Court deny the Mixons' motion to withdraw the settlement agreement 111, direct the Mixons to execute and deliver the Settlement Documents within seven days, deem the Settlement Documents executed if the Mixons fail to comply with the Court's order, and that the Court retain jurisdiction to enforce the settlement agreement; objections to R&R due within 14 days; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jln)
GPO Dec 14 2023
ORDER APPROVING AND ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 123; denying motion to withdraw the settlement agreement and 111 objections; dismissal papers or updated proposed dates due by 1/11/2024; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (kml)

Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Thursday, April 24, 2025
196 196 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Reopen Case Thu 04/24 1:15 PM
ORDER denying189 motion to Reopen Case; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (tmb)
Related: [-]
utility Copies Mailed Thu 04/24 1:19 PM
Copy of Order on Motion to Reopen Case196 sent via U.S. Mail to Keturah Mixon and Antonio Mixon (ns)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
utility Copies Mailed Fri 04/18 8:03 AM
Copy of Stipulation and Order195 sent via U.S. Mail to Keturah Mixon and Antonio Mixon (ns)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
195 195 order Stipulation and Order Thu 04/17 5:58 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER for Substitution of Counsel; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (aks)
Related: [-]
194 194 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 04/17 3:16 PM
REPLY to response to motion189 filed by Antonio Mixon, Keturah Mixon (ns)
Related: [-]