District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Randolph D Moss
Case #: 1:21-cv-01423
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:May 25, 2021
Last checked: Sunday Nov 21, 2021 4:00 AM EST
Defendant
THE KENIFIC GROUP, INC.,
Represented By
Sasha E. Hodge-Wren
Miles & Stockbridge P.C.
contact info
Merrell Beth Renaud
Miles & Stockbridge PC
contact info
Plaintiff
ALICE FRAGOLA
Represented By
Tiffany Joseph Goodson
Hkm Employment Attorneys LLP
contact info

GPO Jun 03 2022
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the attached Memorandum Opinion and Order, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's motion to dismiss, Dkt. 3, is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The motion is GRANTED with respect to Counts One, Two, and Four and DENIED with respect to Count Three. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/3/2022. (lcrdm1)

Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, January 06, 2025
38 38 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 01/06 4:02 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by KENIFIC GROUP, INC.,. (Schuler, Joseph)
Related: [-]
order .Order Mon 01/06 5:06 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice, Dkt.38 , it is hereby ORDERED that the case is DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1). The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the case. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/6/2025. (lcrdm1)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
minutes Settlement Conference Tue 11/12 5:14 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey: Settlement Conference held on 11/12/2024. (lcag)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
utility Set/Reset Hearings Mon 10/07 10:49 AM
Set/Reset Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 11/12/2024 at 10:00 AM in Telephonic/VTC before Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey. (lcag)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
37 37 order .Order Tue 10/01 11:34 AM
MEDIATION STANDING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey on 10/01/24. (lcag)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
36 36 misc Status Report Thu 09/26 5:27 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by ALICE FRAGOLA. (Joseph Goodson, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Thu 09/26 7:10 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt.36 , it is hereby ORDERED that this matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Harvey for mediation. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 09/26/2024. (lcrdm1)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Magistrate Judge Mon 09/30 8:58 AM
CASE DIRECTLY REFERRED to Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey for mediation. (zcb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
35 35 misc Transcript Thu 09/19 9:12 AM
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Randolph D. Moss held on 9/3/2024; Page Numbers: 1-51. Date of Issuance:9/19/2024. Court Reporter Sherry Lindsay, Telephone number 202-354-3053, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the[LINK:Transcript Order Form] For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 10/10/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/20/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/18/2024.(stl)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
34 34 1 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Mon 09/16 4:37 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Erwin Schuler on behalf of KENIFIC GROUP, INC., (Schuler, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
minutes Motion Hearing ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Wed 09/04 10:04 AM
Minute Order. Proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Motion Hearing held on 9/3/2024 re25 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by KENIFIC GROUP, INC. For the reasons stated on the record the motion is DENIED. Parties to file a Joint Status Report on or before 9/27/2024. (Court Reporter Sherry Lindsay) (zglw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
order .Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Thu 08/15 9:58 AM
MINUTE ORDER: In light of Defendant's motion for summary judgment, Dkt.25 , the parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for a hearing on the motion on September 3, 2024 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 8. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 8/15/2024. (lcrdm1)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
33 33 respm Surreply Mon 03/11 7:34 PM
SURREPLY to re25 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ALICE FRAGOLA. (Joseph Goodson, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
32 32 motion Amend/Correct Mon 03/11 1:11 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct31 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages of Reply Nunc Pro Tunc DEFENDANT'S AMENDED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS OF REPLY TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO FILE A CONDENSED AMENDED REPLY BRIEF NUNC PRO TUNC by KENIFIC GROUP, INC.,. Related [+]
Related: [-] naud, Merrell
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order
notice Notice of QC Mon 03/11 11:45 AM
NOTICE OF ERROR re31 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; emailed to shodgewren@milesstockbridge.com, cc'd 5 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please note the following for future filings; do not refile document , 2. DO NOT REFILE. Counsel is reminded that log in and password should match signature page. (zjm, )
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Strike Order on Motion for Leave to File Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 03/11 2:02 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's corrected motion for leave to file a reply with excess pages, Dkt.31 ; Dkt.32 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED, with respect to Defendant's reply, Dkt.28 . It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for leave file a sur-reply, Dkt.29 , is GRANTED. Plaintiff may file her sur-reply on or before March 12, 2024. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/11/2024. (lcrdm1)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
31 31 motion File Excess Pages Fri 03/08 8:25 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages of Reply Nunc Pro Tunc by KENIFIC GROUP, INC.,.(Hodge-Wren, Sasha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
30 30 motion Strike Leave to File Document Fri 03/08 5:17 PM
MOTION to Strike28 Reply to opposition to Motion, or in the alternative, , MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by ALICE FRAGOLA.(Joseph Goodson, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Sur-Reply,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, March 04, 2024
29 29 misc Errata Mon 03/04 10:53 AM
ERRATA AMENDED EXHIBIT 28 by KENIFIC GROUP, INC., re28 Reply to opposition to Motion,. Related [+]
Related: [-] naud, Merrell
Friday, March 01, 2024
28 28 respm Reply to opposition to motion Fri 03/01 3:38 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re25 MOTION for Summary Judgment DEFENDANT'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by KENIFIC GROUP, INC.,. Related [+]
Related: [-] naud, Merrell
Att: 1 Exhibit 23,
Att: 2 Exhibit 24,
Att: 3 Exhibit 25,
Att: 4 Exhibit 26,
Att: 5 Exhibit 27,
Att: 6 Exhibit 28,
Att: 7 Exhibit 29,
Att: 8 Exhibit 30
Monday, February 12, 2024
27 27 28 pgs respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Mon 02/12 11:51 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re25 Motion for Summary Judgment,,, filed by ALICE FRAGOLA.(Joseph Goodson, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Statement of Facts,
Att: 2 Exhibit Declaration of Alice Fragola,
Att: 3 Exhibit Deposition Transcript of Alice Frafgola,
Att: 4 Exhibit Deposition Transcipt of Michael Alexander Richardson,
Att: 5 Exhibit Deposition of Toby Burke,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit,
Att: 8 Exhibit,
Att: 9 Exhibit,
Att: 10 Exhibit,
Att: 11 Exhibit,
Att: 12 Errata,
Att: 13 Exhibit,
Att: 14 Exhibit,
Att: 15 Exhibit,
Att: 16 Exhibit,
Att: 17 Exhibit,
Att: 18 Exhibit,
Att: 19 Exhibit,
Att: 20 Exhibit,
Att: 21 Exhibit,
Att: 22 Exhibit,
Att: 23 Exhibit,
Att: 24 Exhibit,
Att: 25 Exhibit,
Att: 26 Exhibit,
Att: 27 Exhibit,
Att: 28 Exhibit,
Att: 29 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, February 02, 2024
26 26 misc Transcript Fri 02/02 3:56 PM
TRANSCRIPT OF PREMOTION CONFERENCE before Judge Randolph D. Moss held on 12/15/23; Page Numbers: 1-10. Date of Issuance:2/2/24. Court Reporter/Transcriber Tamara Sefranek, Telephone number 202-354-3246, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the[LINK:Transcript Order Form] For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 2/23/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/4/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/2/2024.(Sefranek, Tamara)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 15, 2024
25 25 motion Summary Judgment Mon 01/15 3:34 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by KENIFIC GROUP, INC.,. Related [+]
Related: [-] naud, Merrell
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Statement of Facts,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1,
Att: 4 Exhibit 2,
Att: 5 Exhibit 3,
Att: 6 Exhibit 4,
Att: 7 Exhibit 5,
Att: 8 Exhibit 6,
Att: 9 Exhibit 7,
Att: 10 Exhibit 8,
Att: 11 Exhibit 9,
Att: 12 Exhibit 10,
Att: 13 Exhibit 11,
Att: 14 Exhibit 12,
Att: 15 Exhibit 13,
Att: 16 Exhibit 14,
Att: 17 Exhibit 15 - Declaration of Kris Kenific,
Att: 18 Exhibit 16 - Declaration of Michael Alex Richardson,
Att: 19 Exhibit 17 - Declaration of Kim Bernard,
Att: 20 Exhibit 18 - Declaration of Colton Keyser,
Att: 21 Exhibit 19 - Declaration of Greg Gaston,
Att: 22 Exhibit 20 - Deposition Transcript of Alice Fragola,
Att: 23 Exhibit 21 - Deposition Transcript (Excerpt) of Michael Alex Richardson,
Att: 24 Exhibit 22 - Deposition Transcript (Excerpt) of Toby Burke,
Att: 25 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, December 15, 2023
minutes Pre-motion Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 12/15 11:01 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Pre-motion Conference held on 12/15/2023. For the reasons stated on the record, the Defendant is directed to file a Motion on or before due by 1/15/2024. The Plaintiff shall file a response on or before 2/12/2024 and Defendant shall file a reply on or before 3/1/2024. (Court Reporter Tammi Sefranek) (zglw)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
24 24 7 pgs respm Response to (non-motion) Document Mon 12/11 2:51 PM
RESPONSE to Defendant's Pre-Motion Statement filed by ALICE FRAGOLA. (Joseph Goodson, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
23 23 7 pgs misc Pretrial Statement Tue 12/05 3:13 PM
PRETRIAL STATEMENT by KENIFIC GROUP, INC.,. Related [+]
Related: [-] naud, Merrell
Thursday, November 09, 2023
minutes Discovery Hearing ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Thu 11/09 2:36 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Post Discovery Hearing held on 11/9/2023. Defendant to file pre-motion statement on or before 12/5/2023. Plaintiff to file a response on or before 12/11/2023. Pre-motion Conference set for 12/15/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8- In Person before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (Court Reporter Tammi Sefranek) (zglw)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 20, 2023
22 22 motion Continue Fri 10/20 12:17 PM
Joint MOTION to Continue Post-Discovery Conference by KENIFIC GROUP, INC.,.(Hodge-Wren, Sasha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
order Order on Motion to Continue Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Fri 10/20 4:32 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint motion to continue, Dkt.22 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the post-discovery conference scheduled for November 3, 2023 is VACATED and RESCHEDULED to November 9, 2023 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 8. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/20/2023. (lcrdm1)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
21 21 respm Reply to opposition to motion Thu 10/12 6:41 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re19 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by ALICE FRAGOLA. (Joseph Goodson, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 05, 2023
20 20 3 pgs respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Thu 10/05 7:42 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re19 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by KENIFIC GROUP, INC.,.(Hodge-Wren, Sasha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
19 19 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 10/05 3:41 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by ALICE FRAGOLA. (Joseph Goodson, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
order .Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 10/05 7:33 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's motion to extend time to complete discovery, Dkt.19 , it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant respond to the motion on or before October 10, 2023. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/5/2023. (lcrdm1)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 03, 2023
minutes Discovery Hearing ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Fri 08/04 2:17 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Discovery Dispute Hearing held on 8/3/2023 via Zoom. Discovery deadline extended to 10/13/2023. Defendant to pick up discovery from plaintiff, make necessary copies and return them on the same day. Post Discovery Conference set for 10/20/2023 at 11:00 AM before Judge Randolph D. Moss via Zoom). (Court Reporter Tammi Sefranek) (zglw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 01, 2023
utility Set/Reset Hearings Tue 08/01 1:48 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Post-Discovery Status Conference set for 9/22/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Randolph D. Moss via Zoom. (zglw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 27, 2023
notice Notice of Hearing Thu 07/27 2:30 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Discovery Hearing set for 8/3/2023 at 02:00 PM before Judge Randolph D. Moss to be held by video. (zglw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 06, 2023
18 18 order .Order Protective Order Thu 07/06 11:58 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' motion for stipulated protective order, Dkt.16 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/6/2023. (lcrdm1)
Related: [-]
minutes Discovery Hearing ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Thu 07/06 2:59 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Discovery Dispute Hearing held on 7/6/2023. Both parties' supplemental response to Interrogatories are due on or before 7/20/2023. Discovery deadline extended to 9/14/2023. Post-Discovery Hearing set for 9/22/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Randolph D. Moss via Zoom. (Court Reporter Tammi Sefranek) (zglw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 15, 2023
notice Notice of Hearing Thu 06/15 4:34 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Discovery Hearing set for 7/6/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Randolph D. Moss via Zoom. (zglw)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 17, 2023
17 17 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 03/17 3:58 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by KENIFIC GROUP, INC.,.(Hodge-Wren, Sasha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Fri 03/17 7:50 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's consent motion for extension of time to complete discovery, Dkt.17 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. The following schedule shall govern discovery in this matter going forward: (1) Plaintiff's expert disclosures shall be due on or before May 4, 2023; (2) Defendant's expert disclosures shall be due on or before June 8, 2023; and (3) fact discovery shall conclude on July 13, 2023. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a post-discovery status conference, to be held via Zoom, on August 2, 2023, at 2:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/17/2023. (lcrdm1)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 17, 2022
16 16 misc Stipulation Mon 10/17 3:43 PM
STIPULATION Protective Order by ALICE FRAGOLA. (Joseph Goodson, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 27, 2022
minutes Scheduling Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Wed 07/27 1:21 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Video (Zoom) Initial Scheduling Conference held on 7/27/2022. Any motion to amend the pleadings shall be filed on or before 30 days from today; Proponent's Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosures to be served by 12/16/2022; Opponent's 26(a)(2) Disclosures to be served by 2/28/2022; Discovery to close on 3/23/2022. Fact depositions are limited to five per side; Interrogatories are limited to twenty-five including sub-parts. A post-discovery Status Conference/Pre-motion Conference is set for 4/28/2023, at 10:00 AM, by video, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. The parties shall use the same link for connecting to the hearing. (Court Reporter: Lisa Edwards.) (kt) Modified on 7/27/2022 to correct typo in Status Conference/Pre-motion Conference date (year) (kt)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Wed 07/27 4:24 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference/Pre-motion Conference set for 4/28/2023, at 10:00 AM, by video, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 07, 2022
15 15 misc Meet and Confer Statement Thu 07/07 2:34 PM
MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT.(Joseph Goodson, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order
Friday, June 17, 2022
14 14 order .Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Fri 06/17 6:16 PM
ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to appear by video for an Initial Scheduling Conference on July 27, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall submit a report and a proposed scheduling order pursuant to Local Civil Rule 16.3(d) on or before July 20, 2022. See attached order for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/17/2022. (lcrdm1)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 15, 2022
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 06/15 3:44 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by THE KENIFIC GROUP, INC.,.(Hodge-Wren, Sasha)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 03, 2022
12 12 21 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Fri 06/03 6:34 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the attached Memorandum Opinion and Order, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's motion to dismiss, Dkt.3 , is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The motion is GRANTED with respect to Counts One, Two, and Four and DENIED with respect to Count Three. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/3/2022. (lcrdm1)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 22, 2021
11 11 respm Reply to opposition to motion Tue 06/22 5:17 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re3 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS filed by THE KENIFIC GROUP, INC.,. (Hodge-Wren, Sasha)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 17, 2021
order .Order Thu 06/17 1:36 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' stipulation to correct the caption and named Defendant in this case, it is hereby ORDERED that the docket be corrected to reflect that the Defendant is THE KENIFIC GROUP, INC., not KENIFIC GROUP, INC. The Court directs the Clerk of Court to correct the docket to reflect that Defendant is THE KENIFIC GROUP, INC. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 06/17/2021. (lcrdm1)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 16, 2021
10 10 misc Stipulation Wed 06/16 5:03 PM
STIPULATION TO CORRECT CAPTION AND NAMED DEFENDANT by ALICE FRAGOLA. (Joseph Goodson, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 15, 2021
9 9 28 pgs respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Tue 06/15 9:56 AM
Memorandum in opposition to re3 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS filed by ALICE FRAGOLA.(Joseph Goodson, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Tuesday, June 08, 2021
8 8 notice LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests Tue 06/08 9:59 AM
LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by KENIFIC GROUP, INC. (Hodge-Wren, Sasha)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 04, 2021
7 7 order Standing Order .Order Fri 06/04 9:38 AM
STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 06/04/2021. (lcrdm1)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 01, 2021
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 06/01 10:32 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sasha E. Hodge-Wren on behalf of All Defendants (Hodge-Wren, Sasha)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice to Counsel/Party Tue 06/01 5:09 PM
NOTICE to Counsel/Party re1 Notice of Removal, (zsb)
Related: [-]
4 4 17 pgs misc Memorandum Tue 06/01 3:26 PM
MEMORANDUM re3 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS filed by KENIFIC GROUP INC by KENIFIC GROUP INC. Related [+]
Related: [-] naud, Merrell
3 3 motion Dismiss Tue 06/01 3:25 PM
MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS by KENIFIC GROUP INC. Related [+]
Related: [-] naud, Merrell
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
2 2 misc Receipt of Superior Court Transfer Documents Tue 06/01 10:16 AM
Receipt on 06/01/2021 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number 2021 CA 001430 B. (zjf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 06/01 5:06 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zsb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 26, 2021
notice Notice of QC- New Case Wed 05/26 1:18 PM
NOTICE OF ERROR re1 Notice of Removal; emailed to merrell.renaud@squirepb.com, cc'd 3 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Attorney is provisional. Please renew your membership. See https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-and-renewal-information., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zsb, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 25, 2021
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Tue 05/25 9:31 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court for the District of Columbia, case number 2021 CA 001430 B Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADCDC-8481012 filed by THE KENIFIC GROUP INC.(Hodge-Wren, Sasha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 26 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet