Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Leigh Martin May
Case #: 1:21-cv-02162
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(a) Injunction against Misappropriation of Trade Secrets
Case Filed:May 24, 2021
Terminated:Sep 15, 2021
Case in other court:Superior Court of Gwinnett County, 21A0380710
Last checked: Saturday Nov 20, 2021 6:07 AM EST
Defendant
Ravago Americas, LLC
Represented By
Jackie L. Toney
Kasowitz Benson Torres, Llp-Ga
contact info
Oliver Benton Curtis, III
Mcdermott Will & Emery- Miami
contact info
Defendant
Scott Wilson
Represented By
Kevin Robert Stone
Burr & Forman LLP
contact info
Jackie L. Toney
Kasowitz Benson Torres, Llp-Ga
contact info
William Coppedge Collins, Jr.
Burr & Forman, Llp-Atl
contact info
Plaintiff
Premier Polymers, LLC
Represented By
Ronald Thomas Coleman, Jr.
Parker, Hudson, Rainer & Dobbs, LLP
contact info
Anne McDonough Horn Baroody
Parker, Hudson, Rainer & Dobbs, LLP
contact info
Paul Raymond Barsness
Parker, Hudson, Rainer & Dobbs, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Vinmar Polymers America, LLC
Represented By
Ronald Thomas Coleman, Jr.
Parker, Hudson, Rainer & Dobbs, LLP
contact info
Anne McDonough Horn Baroody
Parker, Hudson, Rainer & Dobbs, LLP
contact info
Paul Raymond Barsness
Parker, Hudson, Rainer & Dobbs, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, September 15, 2021
28 28 utility Remark Wed 09/15 3:08 PM
Certified Copy of27 Order of Remand filed in Superior Court of Gwinnett County. (cmd)
Related: [-]
27 27 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Remand to State Court Wed 09/15 2:48 PM
ORDER granting26 Joint Motion to Remand to State Court. The Clerk is DIRECTED to remand this case to the Superior Court of Gwinnett County, Georgia and CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 9/15/2021. (cmd)
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Remand to State Court Wed 09/15 12:53 PM
Joint MOTION to Remand to State Court by Ravago Americas, LLC, Scott Wilson. (Toney, Jackie)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Wed 09/15 2:50 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (cmd)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 03, 2021
25 25 misc Leave of Absence Fri 09/03 4:30 PM
Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): October 11, 2021, October 12, 2021, October 13, 2021, October 14, 2021, October 15, 2021, October 18, 2021, December 13, 2021, December 14, 2021, December 15, 2021, December 16, 2021, December 17, 2021, by Ronald Thomas Coleman, Jr. (Coleman, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 30, 2021
utility Submission to District Judge Fri 07/30 12:56 PM
Submission of22 MOTION Request for Judicial Notice Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 01 to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (rjc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 21, 2021
utility Submission to District Judge Wed 07/21 9:41 AM
Submission of11 MOTION to Transfer Case and MOTION to Dismiss to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (rjc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 20, 2021
24 24 respm Reply Brief Tue 07/20 9:23 PM
REPLY BRIEF re11 MOTION to Transfer Case to Venue MOTION to Dismiss filed by Ravago Americas, LLC, Scott Wilson.(Toney, Jackie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of J. Toney,
Att: 2 Declaration of M. Reilly
Tuesday, July 13, 2021
utility Submission to District Judge Tue 07/13 2:03 PM
Submission of7 MOTION to Remand to State Court to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (rjc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 08, 2021
23 23 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 07/08 3:46 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Premier Polymers, LLC, Vinmar Polymers America, LLC. (Barsness, Paul)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 06, 2021
22 22 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 07/06 11:06 PM
MOTION Request for Judicial Notice Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 01 by Premier Polymers, LLC, Vinmar Polymers America, LLC.(Barsness, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Filing and Registration records of Georgia Secretary of State for Ravago Americas LLC,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Recorded property deed and public property tax records for Anthony Segale,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Recorded property deed and public property tax records for Christian Chomat,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Public property tax records for David Skoczen,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Recorded property deed and public property tax records for Edward Heckart,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Public property tax records for Gregory Wendt,
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Public property tax records for James Duffy,
Att: 8 Exhibit H - Public property tax records for Joseph St. Martin,
Att: 9 Exhibit I - Recorded property deed and public property tax records for Rick Purdy,
Att: 10 Exhibit J - Recorded property deed and public property tax records for Joshua Luster,
Att: 11 Exhibit K - Recorded property deed and public property tax records for Scott Wilson
21 21 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 07/06 10:32 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re11 MOTION to Transfer Case to Venue MOTION to Dismiss filed by Premier Polymers, LLC, Vinmar Polymers America, LLC.(Barsness, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Michael Clark,
Att: 2 Affidavit Declaration of Georgia Thomason
Thursday, June 24, 2021
20 20 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 06/24 4:24 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re7 MOTION to Remand to State Court - Defendants' Memorandum of Law filed by Ravago Americas, LLC, Scott Wilson.(Toney, Jackie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 J. Toney Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D
Tuesday, June 22, 2021
19 19 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal Order on Motion to Stay Tue 06/22 4:40 PM
ORDER: For good cause shown, the Court GRANTS Defendant Ravago Americas, LLC's Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal13 . The Clerk is DIRECTED to seal Dkt. Nos. [12-2] and [12-5]. Further, the Court GRANTS Defendants' Joint Motion to Stay16 . The respective deadlines imposed by Local Rules 16.1, 16.2, and 26.1 for the parties to conduct a Rule 26(f) planning conference, file a Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan, and submit Initial Disclosures are stayed. Finally, after careful review of the Motion and the parties' briefs, Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion to Stay15 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. (See Order for details.). Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 6/22/2021. (cmd)
Related: [-]
18 18 respm Response in Support of Motion Tue 06/22 9:52 AM
RESPONSE in Support re15 Emergency MOTION to Stay Consideration of Defendant's Motion to Transfer or Dismiss Pending Determination of Jurisdiction Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Emergency Motion to Stay Consideration of Defendants' Motion to Transfer or Dismiss Pending Determination of Jurisdiction filed by Premier Polymers, LLC, Vinmar Polymers America, LLC. (Barsness, Paul)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 21, 2021
17 17 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 06/21 11:13 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re15 Emergency MOTION to Stay Consideration of Defendant's Motion to Transfer or Dismiss Pending Determination of Jurisdiction filed by Ravago Americas, LLC, Scott Wilson.(Toney, Jackie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of J. Toney,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Exhibit F
Thursday, June 17, 2021
16 16 motion Stay Thu 06/17 12:15 PM
Defendants' Joint MOTION to Stay by Ravago Americas, LLC, Scott Wilson.(Toney, Jackie) Modified on 6/17/2021 to edit docket text (bnp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, June 15, 2021
15 15 motion Stay Tue 06/15 6:09 PM
Emergency MOTION to Stay Consideration of Defendant's Motion to Transfer or Dismiss Pending Determination of Jurisdiction with Brief In Support by Premier Polymers, LLC, Vinmar Polymers America, LLC.(Barsness, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of Emergency Motion to Stay Consideration of Motion to Transfer or Dismiss Pending Determination of Jurisdiction,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order on Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Stay Consideration of Motion to Transfer
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 06/15 11:43 AM
ORDER: This matter is before the Court on Plaintiffs' Motion for Appointment of Special Private Process Server2 . Defendants were served in state court prior to the removal of this action to federal court. Accordingly, the Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate Plaintiffs' motion as MOOT. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 6/15/2021. (tmf)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 14, 2021
utility Submission to District Judge Mon 06/14 12:53 PM
Submission of2 MOTION appointment, to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (tmf)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 11, 2021
13 13 motion Leave to File Matters Under Seal Fri 06/11 11:53 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re:11 MOTION to Transfer Case to Venue MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Ravago Americas, LLC.(Toney, Jackie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Seal,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
12 12 notice Notice of Filing Fri 06/11 11:49 PM
PROVISIONALLY SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Provisionally Sealed Documents by Ravago Americas, LLC re11 MOTION to Transfer Case to Venue MOTION to Dismiss (Toney, Jackie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consolidated Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to the First-Filed Rule and 28 U.S.C. 1404 and Motion to Dismiss Complaint,
Att: 2 Confidential Memorandum of Law in Support,
Att: 3 Declaration of J. Toney,
Att: 4 Exhibit A: Hearing Transcript date March 24, 201,
Att: 5 Exhibit C: Confidential Bittenbender Declaration,
Att: 6 Exhibit D: Georgia Complaint,
Att: 7 Exhibit E: Original Answer,
Att: 8 Exhibit F: Vinmar Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 9 Exhibit G: Preliminary Injunction,
Att: 10 Exhibit H: Clarification of the Order on Contempt,
Att: 11 Exhibit I: Hearing Transcript dated January 16, 2019,
Att: 12 Exhibit J: Order to Mediate,
Att: 13 Exhibit K: Vinmar Motion for Leave to Amend Answer,
Att: 14 Exhibit L: Management Order,
Att: 15 Exhibit M: Order on Contempt,
Att: 16 Exhibit N: Order on Fees,
Att: 17 Exhibit B: First Amended Complaint
11 11 motion Transfer Case Dismiss Fri 06/11 11:34 PM
MOTION to Transfer Case to Venue , MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Ravago Americas, LLC.(Toney, Jackie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law in Support,
Att: 2 Declaration of J. Toney,
Att: 3 Exhibit A: March 24, 2021 Hearing Transcript,
Att: 4 Exhibit B: First Amended Complaint,
Att: 5 Exhibit C: Bittenbender Declaration,
Att: 6 Exhibit D: Original Georgia Complaint,
Att: 7 Exhibit E: Original Answer,
Att: 8 Exhibit F: Vinmar Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 9 Exhibit G: Preliminary Injunction,
Att: 10 Exhibit H: Clarification of the Order on Contempt,
Att: 11 Exhibit I: Hearing Transcript dated January 16, 2019,
Att: 12 Exhibit J: Order to Mediate,
Att: 13 Exhibit K: Motion for Leave to Amend Answer,
Att: 14 Exhibit L: Management Order,
Att: 15 Exhibit M: Order on Contempt,
Att: 16 Exhibit N: Order on Fees
10 10 misc Withdrawal of Motion Fri 06/11 5:50 PM
Withdrawal of Motion8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Scott Wilson filed by Scott Wilson. (Stone, Kevin)
Related: [-]
9 9 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Fri 06/11 10:29 AM
ORDER: THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Defendants' Motion For Leave To File a Consolidated Omnibus Motion to Dismiss and Transfer Venue and to Exceed Page Limits, and Scott Wilsons Motion for One Day Extension To File Responsive Pleading or Motion, filed on June 4, 2021. THE COURT has considered the Motion and the pertinent parts of the record, and, it is ADJUDGED that the Motion is GRANTED. Defendants shall be permitted to file a forty-five (45) page consolidated Omnibus Motion to Dismiss and Transfer Venue on June 11, 2021, which includes a one-day extension of the deadline for Defendant Wilsons Motion to Dismiss; Plaintiffs shall be permitted to file a forty-five (45) page consolidated Response to Defendants' Omnibus Motion to Dismiss and Transfer Venue; and Defendants shall be permitted to file a twenty- five (25) page Reply in support of their Omnibus Motion to Dismiss and Transfer Venue. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 6/11/2021. (tmf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 10, 2021
8 8 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 06/10 8:14 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Scott Wilson.(Stone, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief
7 7 motion Remand to State Court Thu 06/10 1:56 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court with Brief In Support by Premier Polymers, LLC, Vinmar Polymers America, LLC.(Barsness, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Motion for Remand
order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 06/10 9:58 AM
ORAL ORDER granting5 Application for Admission of Oliver Benton Curtis, III Pro Hac Vice. Ruled on by Judge Leigh Martin May on 6/10/2021. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bnp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 09, 2021
misc Approval of Application for Admission PHV Wed 06/09 4:19 PM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:5 APPLICATION for Admission of Oliver Benton Curtis, III Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11019613). Attorney Oliver Benton Curtis, III added appearing on behalf of Ravago Americas, LLC (cdg)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 04, 2021
6 6 motion Leave to File Document Fri 06/04 4:16 PM
MOTION for Leave to File a Consolidated Omnibus Motion to Dismiss and Transfer Venue and to Exceed Page Limits and Scott Wilson's Motion for One Day Extension to File Responsive Pleading or Motion by Ravago Americas, LLC, Scott Wilson.(Toney, Jackie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
5 5 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Fri 06/04 11:50 AM
APPLICATION for Admission of Oliver Benton Curtis, III Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11019613).by Ravago Americas, LLC.(Toney, Jackie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, May 25, 2021
4 4 misc Certificate of Interested Persons Tue 05/25 3:16 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons by Ravago Americas, LLC, Scott Wilson. (Toney, Jackie)
Related: [-]
3 3 30+ pgs order Order Tue 05/25 11:02 AM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 5/25/2021. (tmf)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 24, 2021
2 2 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 05/25 8:46 AM
MOTION for Appointment of Special Private Process Server by Premier Polymers, LLC and Vinmar Polymers America, LLC. (Filed in Superior Court and included with Notice of Removal)(eop) Modified on 5/25/2021 to correct date filed (eop).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
1 1 7 pgs cmp Notice of Removal Tue 05/25 8:42 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Scott Wilson and Ravago Americas, LLC. (Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AGANDC-10995419)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit -A,
Att: 2 Exhibit -B,
Att: 3 Exhibit -C,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet