California Eastern District Court
Judge:Jennifer L Thurston
Referred: Erica P Grosjean
Case #: 1:21-cv-00844
Nature of Suit362 Torts - Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice
Cause28:1402 Medical Malpractice
Case Filed:May 25, 2021
Last checked: Sunday Nov 21, 2021 2:23 AM PST
Defendant
Courtney L. Mapes, M.D.
Represented By
Amanda M Lucas
Lebeau-Thelen, LLP
contact info
Dennis Raymond Thelen
Lebeau Thelen, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Svetlana Krivencheva
Represented By
Patricia I. James
Miller & James, LLP
contact info
David Daniel Miller
Miller & Law, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Bradley Medina
Represented By
Patricia I. James
Miller & James, LLP
contact info
David Daniel Miller
Miller & Law, P.C.
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
United States of America
Terminated: 11/18/2021
Represented By
William Dean Carter, GOVT
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info

GPO Oct 27 2021
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on October 27, 2021. Pursuant to the parties' stipulation (Doc. 9), the Court orders the scheduling conference currently set for November 2, 2021, before Judge Grosjean vacated. Within ten days after issuance of a ruling on the United States' motion to dismiss, should the matter go forward, the parties are directed to contact Courtroom Deputy Michelle Rooney (mrooney@caed.uscourts.gov) to reset the scheduling conference.(Rooney, M)
GPO Nov 18 2021
ORDER RE: Notice of Dismissal of Defendant United States of America without Prejudice and Amending Caption signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/18/2021. (Sant Agata, S)
GPO Dec 21 2022
ORDER regarding plaintiffs' motion for administrative relief, document 25. After reviewing the parties' arguments, the Court will grant, in part, plaintiffs' motion. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that: 1. The deadline for Plaintiffs to depose Dr. Mapes is extended until January 27, 2023. No other non-expert discovery will be extended, and this date will not be extended. 2. In all other respects, the schedule remains as previously set. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on December 21, 2022. (Rooney, M)
GPO Jan 20 2023
ORDER regarding plaintiffs' motion for administrative relief, document 28, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on January 20, 2023. Based on the circumstances explained in the declaration of Plaintiffs' counsel, the Court will grant Plaintiffs' motion. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that the deadline for Plaintiffs to designate rebuttal expert witnesses be extended until February 7, 2023, to allow Plaintiffs time to finalize retention of Plaintiffs' rebuttal witness. (Rooney, M)
GPO Apr 21 2023
ORDER GRANTING 39 Patricia I. James's Renewed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiffs, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/20/2023. Attorney Patricia I. James and David Daniel Miller TERMINATED. (Rivera, O)
GPO Jun 07 2023
ORDER (1) Denying 45 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Without Prejudice and Requiring Plaintiffs to Each File Individual Long Form Applications; (2) Directing the Clerk of Court to Send Plaintiffs Long Form Applications; (3) Denying 44 Motion to Appoint Counsel and; (4) Granting Extension as to Expert Rebuttal Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/6/2023. Motion for IFP due within twenty-one (21) days. Rebuttal Expert Designation due by 7/6/2023. (Attachments: # (1) Long Form IFP Application). (Lawrence, A)
GPO Jun 28 2023
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on June 28, 2023, recommending as follows: 1. Plaintiffs' applications to proceed without prepayment of fees and costs (ECF Nos. 47 & 48) be DENIED. These findings and recommendations are submitted to the district judge assigned to this action, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(B) and this Court's Local Rule 304. Within fourteen (14) days of service of this recommendation, Plaintiffs may file written objections to these findings and recommendations with the court. Such a document should be captioned "Objections to Magistrate Judge's Findings and Recommendations." The district judge will review the magistrate judge's findings and recommendations pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(C). Plaintiffs are advised that failure to file objections within the specified time may result in the waiver of rights on appeal. Wilkerson v. Wheeler, 772 F.3d 834, 839 (9th Cir. 2014) (citing Baxter v. Sullivan, 923 F.2d 1391, 1394 (9th Cir. 1991)). (Rooney, M)
GPO Aug 21 2023
ORDER ADOPTING 51 Findings and Recommendations and DENYING Plaintiff's 47 48 Applications to Proceed In Forma Pauperis signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/20/2023.(Sant Agata, S)
GPO Apr 19 2024
ORDER granting Plaintiffs leave to supplement its opposition to the motion for summary judgment to submit amended expert reports that comply with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure within 30 days signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on April 18, 2024. It is ordered that if Plaintiffs choose to do so, Plaintiffs may submit amended expert reports by no later than May 17, 2024. If Plaintiffs fail to submit amended expert reports by this deadline, the Court will issue Findings and Recommendations regarding Defendant's motion for summary judgment based on the record before it. (Rooney, M)
GPO May 23 2024
nifer L. Thurston; Objections to F&R due within 30-Days. (Lundstrom, T)FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Defendant's Motion to strike Plaintiff's Expert Reports and Motion for Summary Judgment be granted 52, 63 signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/22/2024. Referred to Judge Jen
GPO Nov 22 2024
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment be Granted in Part and Denied in Part 52 re 1 signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/22/2024. Referred to Judge Thurston. Objections to F&R due by within 30 days. (Xiong, J.)
GPO Jan 17 2025
ORDER ADOPTING in Full the 72 Findings and Recommendations and GRANTING In Part and Denying in Part Defendant Mapes' 52 Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/17/2025. (Deputy Clerk CRM)

Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, April 10, 2025
90 90 notice Notice of Change of Address Thu 04/10 11:40 AM
NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS by Dennis Raymond Thelen. (Thelen, Dennis)
Related: [-]