Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Carlos E Mendoza
Referred: Daniel C Irick
Case #: 6:21-cv-00912
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:May 26, 2021
Terminated:Aug 23, 2023
Last checked: Monday Nov 22, 2021 3:55 AM EST
Defendant
Exela Enterprise Solutions, Inc.
Represented By
Todd Sydney Aidman
Ford & Harrison LLP
contact info
Luis Santos
Ford & Harrison, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Exela Technologies, Inc.
Represented By
Todd Sydney Aidman
Ford & Harrison LLP
contact info
Luis Santos
Ford & Harrison, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Henry L. McCone
P.O. Box 551908
Orlando, FL 32855


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Monday, May 12, 2025
108 108 appeal Transmittal of initial appeal package Mon 05/12 11:43 AM
TRANSMITTAL of initial appeal package to USCA consisting of copies of notice of appeal, docket sheet, order/judgment being appealed, and motion, if applicable to USCA re106 Notice of Appeal. (MSN)
Related: [-]
appeal USCA Appeal Fees Mon 05/12 11:20 AM
USCA appeal fees received $605.00, receipt number ORL115115 re106 Notice of Appeal filed by Henry L. McCone. (WLB)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
107 107 appeal Transcript Information Form Mon 05/12 11:15 AM
TRANSCRIPT information form filed by Henry L. McCone re106 Notice of Appeal. USCA number: TBD. No transcript(s) requested. (MSN)
Related: [-]
106 106 appeal Notice of Appeal Mon 05/12 11:06 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to97 Order on Motion to Vacate, Order on Motion for Leave to File Document,105 Order on Motion to Alter Judgment by Henry L. McCone. Filing fee paid. (MSN) Modified on 5/12/2025 to edit docket text (MSN)
Related: [-]