Michigan Western District Court
Judge:Jane M Beckering
Referred: Phillip J Green
Case #: 1:21-cv-00440
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Case Filed:May 26, 2021
Case in other court:Ottawa County Circuit Court, 20-06328-CB
Last checked: Monday Nov 22, 2021 4:43 AM EST
defendant
Paks Logistics, LLC
Represented By
Alexander J. Thibodeau
Foster Swift Collins & Smith Pc (gr)
contact info
Matthew T. Tompkins
Straub, Seaman & Allen, P.C.
contact info
Dirk H. Beckwith
Foster Swift Collins & Smith Pc (southfield)
contact info
mediator
Facilitative Mediator
Represented By
Thomas R. Behm
Gruel Mills Nims & Pylman LLP
contact info
plaintiff
Fresh Transport, LLC
Represented By
Michael S. Dantuma
Holmes & Wiseley PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, February 22, 2022
20 20 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation to Dismiss Tue 02/22 2:47 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL granting STIPULATION to dismiss19 ; this matter is dismissed with prejudice and without an award of costs; Final Order closing the case; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 02/22 12:40 PM
CORRECTED STIPULATION of dismissal with Prejudice by plaintiff Fresh Transport, LLC (Dantuma, Michael) Modified text on 2/22/2022 (ns)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 21, 2022
18 18 motion Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 02/21 3:22 PM
STIPULATION of dismissal with Prejudice by plaintiff Fresh Transport, LLC (Dantuma, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 18, 2022
17 17 1 pgs order Order Regarding Dismissal Papers Fri 02/18 10:12 AM
ORDER requiring dismissal papers to be filed no later than 3/11/2022; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw)
Related: [-]
16 16 adr Facilitative Mediation Report Fri 02/18 9:40 AM
REPORT of facilitative mediation held 01/11/2022; mediation is Complete; case is Settled, (Behm, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 05, 2022
15 15 misc Notice Regarding Reassignment (JMB) Wed 01/05 10:55 AM
NOTICE that this case is reassigned to District Judge Jane M. Beckering under[LINK:Administrative Order No. 22-CA-01] ; Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker is no longer assigned to the case (mlc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 28, 2021
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation and Proposed Order Thu 10/28 11:47 AM
ORDER granting STIPULATION13 FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 27, 2021
13 13 motion Stipulation and Order (Proposed-one document) Wed 10/27 4:26 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER For Substitution of Counsel by defendant Paks Logistics, LLC (Beckwith, Dirk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 05, 2021
notice Attorney Appearance Tue 10/05 2:26 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Matthew T. Tompkins on behalf of defendant Paks Logistics, LLC Appearance as Co-Counsel (Tompkins, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 29, 2021
12 12 service Certificate of Service Wed 09/29 8:52 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant Paks Logistics, LLC for interrogatories and requests for production of documents (Beckwith, Dirk)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 12, 2021
adr Facilitative Mediation - Fee Received Fri 07/16 3:58 PM
VFM FEE RECEIVED in the amount of $25.00, check number 12499 as to plaintiff Fresh Transport, LLC (mkc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 06, 2021
11 11 adr Facilitative Mediation - Notice of Appointment of Facilitative Mediator Tue 07/06 12:47 PM
NOTICE of appointment of Facilitative Mediator Thomas R. Behm ; plaintiff VFM fee to be submitted by 7/13/2021 defendant VFM fee to be submitted by 7/13/2021 (mkc)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 02, 2021
10 10 adr Facilitative Mediation - Notice of Selection of Facilitative Mediator Fri 07/02 9:31 AM
SELECTION of Thomas R. Behm as facilitative mediator by plaintiff Fresh Transport, LLC (Dantuma, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 25, 2021
9 9 order Case Management Order Fri 06/25 5:05 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: discovery to be completed by 2/1/2022; dispositive motions due by 3/31/2022; settlement conference set for 6/21/2022 at 09:00 AM at 601 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; final pretrial conference set for 7/29/2022 at 03:00 PM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker; bench trial set for 8/16/2022 at 08:30 AM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 24, 2021
8 8 minutes Scheduling Conference - Rule 16 Thu 06/24 3:16 PM
MINUTES of Rule 16 scheduling conference held before Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Court Reporter: Paul Brandell) (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 15, 2021
7 7 misc Joint Status Report (Rule 16) Tue 06/15 12:20 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT (Dantuma, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 14, 2021
notice Attorney Appearance Mon 06/14 10:13 AM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Alexander J. Thibodeau on behalf of defendant Paks Logistics, LLC (Thibodeau, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 27, 2021
6 6 5 pgs order Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Thu 05/27 4:48 PM
ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 6/24/2021 at 03:00 PM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker; status report due by 6/17/2021 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Proof of Service Thu 05/27 11:32 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant Paks Logistics, LLC re Answer to Complaint (Petition for Removal)4 , Notice of Removal,1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement3 (Beckwith, Dirk)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint (Petition for Removal) Thu 05/27 11:28 AM
ANSWER to complaint1 with affirmative defenses by Paks Logistics, LLC (Beckwith, Dirk) Modified text on 5/27/2021 (ns)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 05/27 10:18 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Paks Logistics, LLC (Beckwith, Dirk)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Notice Regarding Assignment of Case Thu 05/27 9:51 AM
NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re corporate disclosure statement (ns)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 26, 2021
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Wed 05/26 5:07 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ottawa County Circuit Court case number 20-6328 CB filed by Paks Logistics, LLC (Beckwith, Dirk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D
misc Receipt Thu 05/27 9:50 AM
RECEIPT: in the amount of $402.00, receipt number AMIWDC-6446898; for filing fee (ns)
Related: [-]