James Ficken, et al v. City of Dunedin, Florida, et al
Original Case: 8:19-cv-01210
Eleventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-prici-11773 |
Type | private civil / federal question |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | May 25, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jul 14, 2022 |
Last checked: Thursday Jul 21, 2022 4:30 AM EDT |
Amicus Curiae
AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF FLORIDA
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
CATO INSTITUTE
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
R STREET INSTITUTE
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
RODERICK AND SOLANGE MACARTHUR JUSTICE CENTER
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
CITY OF DUNEDIN, FLORIDA
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
DUNEDIN CODE ENFORCEMENT BOARD
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
MICHAEL BOWMAN, in his official capacity as Code Enforcement Board Chairman
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
LOWELL SUPLICKI, in his official capacity as Code Enforcement Board Vice-Chair
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
ARLENE GRAHAM, in her official capacity as a member of the Code Enforcement Board
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
KEN CARSON, in his official capacity as a member of the Code Enforcement Board
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
WILLIAM MOTLEY, in his official capacity as a member of the Code Enforcement Board
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
DAVE PAULEY, in his official capacity as a member of the Code Enforcement Board
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
BUNNY DUTTON, in her official capacity as a member of the Code Enforcement Board
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
JAMES FICKEN, Trustee, Suncoast First Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
SUNCOAST FIRST TRUST
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Jul 14 2022
Opinion issued by court as to Appellants James Ficken and Suncoast First Trust. Decision: Affirmed. Opinion type: Non-Published. Opinion method: Per Curiam. The opinion is also available through the Court's Opinions page at this link http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/opinions. |
Docket last updated: 07/21/2022 4:30 AM EDT |