New Jersey District Court
Judge:Julien Xavier Neals
Referred: James B Clark
Case #: 2:21-cv-11844
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:May 27, 2021
Re-opened:Aug 14, 2024
Terminated:Aug 02, 2021
Case in other court:Sussex County Superior Court, SSX-L-184-21
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 23, 2021 3:47 AM EST
Defendant
COUNTY OF SUSSEX
Represented By
TRACY BROOKE BUSSEL
Gebhardt & Kiefer PC
contact info
Defendant
EMMANUEL RIVERA
Represented By
JOHN JOSEPH ZUNIN
Decotiis, Fitzpatrick, Cole & Giblin, LLP
contact info
Defendant
TOWNSHIP OF VERNON
Represented By
TRACY BROOKE BUSSEL
Gebhardt & Kiefer PC
contact info
Defendant
VERNON POLICE DEPARTMENT
Represented By
TRACY BROOKE BUSSEL
Gebhardt & Kiefer PC
contact info
Defendant
DANIEL B YOUNG
Represented By
TRACY BROOKE BUSSEL
Gebhardt & Kiefer PC
contact info
Defendant
ABC ENTITIES/CORPORATIONS 1-10
Defendant
JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-100
Defendant
MAYOR HARRY SHORTWAY
Represented By
TRACY BROOKE BUSSEL
Gebhardt & Kiefer PC
contact info
Plaintiff
RACHEL SOUTHEY
Represented By
JONATHAN ANDREW ELLIS
Law Offices Of Herbert I. Ellis PC
contact info
RICHARD S. PANITCH
Herbert I. Ellis, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
48 48 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Wed 05/07 1:57 PM
ORDER granting in part25 Motion to Dismiss; Dismissing without prejudice Counts One, Two, Four, and Five of Plaintiff's Complaint except as to Officer Rivera; dismissing Count Three without prejudice; Dismissing Counts One through Five with prejudice to the extent that they assert claims against MAYOR SHORTWAY and CHIEF YOUNG in their official capacities. Signed by Judge Julien Xavier Neals on 5/7/2025. (adc, )
Related: [-]
47 47 order Opinion Wed 05/07 1:09 PM
OPINION. Signed by Judge Julien Xavier Neals on 5/7/2025. (adc, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
46 46 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 04/29 11:01 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Hearing set for 6/16/2025 at 11:30 AM in Newark - Courtroom 2A before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. MR. RIVERA'S Response due by 6/9/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 4/28/2025. (adc) Modified on 4/29/2025 (adc)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
minutes Telephone Conference Tue 04/29 8:25 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark: Telephone Conference held on 4/28/2025. (seb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
45 45 misc Letter Tue 04/22 2:15 PM
Letter from Richard Panitch, Esq.. (PANITCH, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
44 44 1 pgs order Order Mon 04/21 2:43 PM
LETTER ORDER that the telephone status conference scheduled with the parties in this matter on April 29, 2025 at 10:30 AM [see Dkt. No. 37 paragraph 10] is canceled; instead, the telephone conference on April 28, 2025 at 11:30 AM [see Dkt. No. 40 paragraph 2] will proceed as scheduled. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the call. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 4/21/2025. (sm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
43 43 order Discovery Confidentiality Order Tue 03/18 10:01 AM
CONFIDENTIALITY DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 3/18/2025. (adc, )
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
42 42 misc Proposed Order Mon 03/17 2:36 PM
Proposed Order Confidentiality Order by HARRY SHORTWAY, TOWNSHIP OF VERNON, VERNON POLICE DEPARTMENT, DANIEL B YOUNG re37 Scheduling Order.(PARIKH, LESLIE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Confidentiality Order
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
41 41 misc Letter Tue 03/04 4:23 PM
Letter from Michael DiFazio, II re40 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney,. (DIFAZIO, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
40 40 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Mon 02/24 2:49 PM
ORDER granting35 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney MICHAEL DANIEL DIFAZIO, II terminated. EMMANUEL RIVERA shall have thirty (30) days from the date of this Order to retain new counsel. The court will conduct a telephone status conference on 4/28/2025 at 11:30 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 2/24/2025. (adc, )
Related: [-]
minutes Motion Hearing Tue 02/25 7:33 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark: Motion Hearing held on 2/24/2025 re35 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by EMMANUEL RIVERA. (seb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
39 39 misc Letter Wed 02/19 1:23 PM
Letter from Michael DiFazio, II re35 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ,38 Order, Set Hearings. (DIFAZIO, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
38 38 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 01/14 3:36 PM
LETTER ORDER setting Telephone Conference for 2/24/2025 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 1/14/2025. (adc)
Related: [-]
37 37 order Scheduling Order Tue 01/14 12:47 PM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 1/14/2025. (dam)
Related: [-]
minutes Scheduling Conference Wed 01/15 8:42 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark: Scheduling Conference held on 1/14/2025. (seb)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
36 36 misc Letter Mon 01/13 2:02 PM
Letter from Richard S. Panitch, Esq.. (PANITCH, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 01/13 11:47 AM
Set Deadlines as to35 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney . Motion set for 2/3/2025 before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mxw, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
35 35 motion Withdraw as Attorney Thu 01/09 2:34 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by EMMANUEL RIVERA.(DIFAZIO, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Monday, December 30, 2024
34 34 respm Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion Mon 12/30 3:12 PM
REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by TOWNSHIP OF VERNON, COUNTY OF SUSSEX, HARRY SHORTWAY, DANIEL B YOUNG, EMMANUEL RIVERA, VERNON POLICE DEPARTMENT re25 MOTION to Dismiss (PARIKH, LESLIE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A thru D
Monday, December 16, 2024
33 33 30+ pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition of Motion Mon 12/16 3:21 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by RACHEL SOUTHEY re25 MOTION to Dismiss (PANITCH, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
32 32 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 12/03 3:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by SHARON MARIE FLYNN on behalf of TOWNSHIP OF VERNON, COUNTY OF SUSSEX, HARRY SHORTWAY, DANIEL B YOUNG, VERNON POLICE DEPARTMENT (FLYNN, SHARON)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
31 31 order Order Mon 12/02 10:34 AM
TEXT ORDER - The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's letter dated November 27, 2024 (ECF No.28 ) requesting, with the consent of Defendants, an adjournment of Defendants' motion to dismiss (ECF No.25 ). The request is GRANTED. Plaintiff's opposition shall be due on or by December 16, 2024, and Defendants' reply shall be filed by December 30, 2024. So Ordered by Judge Julien Xavier Neals on 12/2/2024. (kd)
Related: [-]
30 30 2 pgs order Order Mon 12/02 10:24 AM
LETTER ORDER that the initial conference scheduled for 12/4/2024 is adjourned to 1/14/2025 a t 11:30 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 12/2/2024. (sm)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Mon 12/02 10:29 AM
Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 1/14/2025 at 11:30 AM in Newark - Courtroom 2A before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. (sm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
29 29 misc Letter Wed 11/27 2:14 PM
Letter from Ryan A. Notarangelo, Esq. (Adjournment Request). (NOTARANGELO, RYAN)
Related: [-]
28 28 misc Letter Wed 11/27 1:58 PM
Letter from Ryan A. Notarangelo, Esq. (Adjournment Request). (NOTARANGELO, RYAN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
27 27 2 pgs order Order Tue 11/19 4:29 PM
LETTER ORDER granting Plaintiff's26 Letter request to adjourn the motion date for Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by one cycle to 12/16/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 11/19/2024. (mxw, )
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 11/19 4:29 PM
Set Deadlines as to25 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 12/16/2024 before Judge Julien Xavier Neals. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mxw, )
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
26 26 misc Letter Mon 11/18 9:52 AM
Letter from Ryan A. Notarangelo, Esq.. (NOTARANGELO, RYAN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 10/16 12:02 PM
Set Deadlines as to25 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion set for 11/4/2024 before Judge Julien Xavier Neals. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jd, )
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
25 25 motion Dismiss Fri 10/11 3:36 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by COUNTY OF SUSSEX, HARRY SHORTWAY, TOWNSHIP OF VERNON, VERNON POLICE DEPARTMENT, DANIEL B YOUNG. Responses due by 12/2/2024.(PARIKH, LESLIE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exbs A thru G,
Att: 3 Brief,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 5 Certificate of Service
Thursday, September 26, 2024
24 24 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/26 2:59 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by RYAN NOTARANGELO on behalf of RACHEL SOUTHEY (NOTARANGELO, RYAN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
23 23 1 pgs order Order Wed 09/25 5:10 PM
LETTER ORDER reinstating this matter; Granting Defendants leave to file an Amended Motion to Dismiss. Defendants motion shall be filed by 10/11/2024 and the motion shall be returnable on 12/2/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 9/24/2024. (jd, )
Related: [-]
22 22 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 09/25 10:49 AM
LETTER ORDER: Initial Conference set for 12/4/2024 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 9/25/2024. (seb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
21 21 misc Substitution of Attorney Tue 09/24 2:15 PM
Substitution of Attorney - Attorney JOHN JOSEPH ZUNIN terminated. Attorney MICHAEL DANIEL DIFAZIO, II for EMMANUEL RIVERA added.. (DIFAZIO, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Conference Wed 09/25 9:53 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark: Telephone Conference held on 9/24/2024. (seb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
20 20 misc Status Report Tue 09/17 2:19 PM
STATUS REPORT Richard S. Panitch, Esq. by RACHEL SOUTHEY. (PANITCH, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
19 19 1 pgs order Order Reopening Case ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 08/14 4:18 PM
LETTER ORDER: This matter shall be REOPENED. The Court will conduct a telephonic case management conference with the parties on September 24, 2024 at 3:00 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 8/14/2024. (qa, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
18 18 misc Letter Tue 08/13 11:43 AM
Letter from Attorney Richard S. Panitch. (PANITCH, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 09, 2022
17 17 misc Substitution of Attorney Fri 12/09 10:10 AM
Substitution of Attorney - Attorney JONATHAN ANDREW ELLIS terminated. Attorney RICHARD S. PANITCH for RACHEL SOUTHEY added.. (PANITCH, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 22, 2022
16 16 misc Substitution of Attorney Tue 02/22 11:45 AM
Substitution of Attorney - Attorney TRACY BROOKE BUSSEL terminated. Attorney LESLIE ANN PARIKH for COUNTY OF SUSSEX,LESLIE ANN PARIKH for HARRY SHORTWAY,LESLIE ANN PARIKH for TOWNSHIP OF VERNON,LESLIE ANN PARIKH for VERNON POLICE DEPARTMENT,LESLIE ANN PARIKH for DANIEL B YOUNG added.. (PARIKH, LESLIE)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 02, 2021
15 15 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Mon 08/02 11:54 AM
LETTER ORDER: This action and any pending motions are ADMINISTRATIVELY TERMINATED. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 8/2/2021. (ams, )
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Conference Wed 08/04 12:29 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark: Telephone Conference held on 8/2/2021. (seb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 28, 2021
14 14 3 pgs order Order Scheduling Order Wed 07/28 10:46 AM
ORDER re11 Letter; The Court will conduct a Telephone Conference with the parties on 8/2/2021 at 10:00 AM, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 7/28/2021. (ams, )
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Letter Wed 07/28 10:37 AM
Letter. (BUSSEL, TRACY)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Order Wed 07/28 10:16 AM
TEXT ORDER - Per counsel's letter dated 7/14/202110 , the request to adjourn the return date, in regards to the Motion to Dismiss3 , to 8/16/2021 is Granted.So Ordered by Judge Julien Xavier Neals on 7/28/2021. (kd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 27, 2021
11 11 misc Letter Tue 07/27 4:10 PM
Letter from Richard Panitch. (PANITCH, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 14, 2021
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 07/14 3:11 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to3 MOTION to Dismiss In lieu of Answer R 12(b)(6) by RACHEL SOUTHEY. (PANITCH, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 30, 2021
9 9 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Wed 06/30 12:12 PM
LETTER ORDER: Initial Conference set for 8/23/2021 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 6/30/2021. (seb)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 28, 2021
8 8 order Order Reassigning Case Tue 06/29 12:59 PM
TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Julien Xavier Neals for all further proceedings. Judge Susan D. Wigenton no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 6/28/21. (ak, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 23, 2021
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 06/23 2:28 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by EMMANUEL RIVERA.(ZUNIN, JOHN)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 06/23 2:24 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN JOSEPH ZUNIN on behalf of EMMANUEL RIVERA (ZUNIN, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 14, 2021
5 5 1 pgs order Order Mon 06/14 11:34 AM
ORDER granting4 Letter re Adjournment of3 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 6/14/2021. (ams, )
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 06/14 11:35 AM
Reset Deadlines as to3 MOTION to Dismiss In lieu of Answer R 12(b)(6) . Motion set for 8/2/2021 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ams, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 10, 2021
4 4 misc Letter Thu 06/10 3:09 PM
Letter from Jonathan A. Ellis, Esq.. (ELLIS, JONATHAN)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 07, 2021
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 06/07 2:16 PM
Set Deadlines as to3 MOTION to Dismiss In lieu of Answer R 12(b)(6) . Motion set for 7/6/2021 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (JB, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 03, 2021
3 3 motion Dismiss Thu 06/03 2:39 PM
MOTION to Dismiss In lieu of Answer R 12(b)(6) by COUNTY OF SUSSEX, HARRY SHORTWAY, TOWNSHIP OF VERNON, VERNON POLICE DEPARTMENT, DANIEL B YOUNG. Responses due by 6/22/2021(BUSSEL, TRACY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief in support of motion,
Att: 2 Certification of Exhibits,
Att: 3 Exhibit A-G,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 06/03 2:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by TRACY BROOKE BUSSEL on behalf of COUNTY OF SUSSEX, HARRY SHORTWAY, TOWNSHIP OF VERNON, VERNON POLICE DEPARTMENT, DANIEL B YOUNG (BUSSEL, TRACY)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 27, 2021
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 05/27 12:54 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by COUNTY OF SUSSEX, VERNON POLICE DEPARTMENT, TOWNSHIP OF VERNON from Sussex County Superior Court, case number SSX-L-184-21. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12500691), filed by COUNTY OF SUSSEX, VERNON POLICE DEPARTMENT, TOWNSHIP OF VERNON.(BUSSEL, TRACY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-B,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 05/27 1:03 PM
Case assigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. (jr)
Related: [-]