Oklahoma Western District Court
Judge:David L Russell
Case #: 5:20-cv-01253
Nature of Suit375 Other Statutes - False Claims Act
Cause31:3730 Qui Tam False Claims Act
Case Filed:Dec 14, 2020
Terminated:May 28, 2021
Last checked: Saturday Jun 12, 2021 3:50 AM CDT
Defendant
Munoz Construction Inc
Defendant
Robin Hausner Housemovers & Demolition LLC
Defendant
Reese Construction Inc
Defendant
Redlands Contracting LLC
Defendant
RRY Services LLC
Defendant
Quapaw Company The
Defendant
Paragon Contractors LLC
Defendant
PBX Corporation
Defendant
Overland Corporation
Defendant
Oklahoma Construction Materials
Defendant
OBC Inc
Defendant
Rudy Construction Co
Defendant
Millenial Asphalt
Defendant
Markwell Paving Company
Defendant
Manhattan Road & Bridge Company
Defendant
MJ Hughes Construction Inc
Defendant
Logos Construction Co LLC
Defendant
L&N Bridge LLC
Defendant
Klaver Construction Company Inc
Defendant
Keystone Services Inc
Defendant
KVK Contracting Inc
Defendant
TJ Campbell Construction Company
Defendant
Wyatt Construction Company Inc
Defendant
Wildcat Underground Services Division
Defendant
Wildcat Construction Co Inc
Defendant
Wildcat Concrete Services Inc
Defendant
Venture Corporation
Defendant
Tri-City Seal Company
Defendant
Treas Construction Inc
Defendant
Tom Hudson Paving Inc
Defendant
TTK Construction Company Inc
Defendant
K&R Builders Inc
Defendant
T McDonald Construction Inc
Defendant
Silver Star Construction Company Inc
Defendant
Sherwood Construction
Defendant
Shell Construction
Defendant
Sewell Bros Inc
Defendant
Seal Masters Inc
Defendant
Schwarz Sand LLC
Defendant
Schwarz Paving Company Inc
Defendant
Schiralli Construction Corp
Defendant
Bridgeco Contractors Inc
Defendant
Duit Construction Company Inc
Defendant
Crossland Construction Company Inc
Defendant
Caswell Contracting Inc
Defendant
Cantera Concrete Company
Defendant
C3 Construction Inc
Defendant
C-P Integrated Services Inc
Defendant
C-GAWF Construction Inc
Defendant
Built Right Construction LLC
Defendant
Bridges Inc
Defendant
Cummins Construction Company Inc
Defendant
Blue Rock
Defendant
Becco Contractors Inc
Defendant
B&B Construction Services
Defendant
B&B Bridge Company LLC
Defendant
Atlas Paving Company
Defendant
Allen Contracting Inc
Defendant
APAC-Central
Defendant
AM Cohron & Son Inc
Defendant
A&A Trucking
Defendant
Highway Contractors Inc
Defendant
Job Construction Company Inc
Defendant
Jensen Construction Company
Defendant
JLT Contracting LLC
Defendant
JK Industries Inc
Defendant
JE Dirt Wurx LLC
Defendant
Iowa Erosion Control Inc
Defendant
Interstate Improvements Inc
Defendant
Hub Construction Inc
Defendant
Elite Industrial Painting Inc
Defendant
Heatland Contracting Services Inc
Defendant
Haskell Lemon Construction Company
Defendant
H&H Bridge Company
Defendant
Greenhill Materials
Defendant
Greenhill Concrete
Defendant
Glover & Associates Inc
Defendant
Gibson and Associates Inc
Defendant
Frontier Bridge Inc
Defendant
Evans and Associates Construction Co Inc
non-party
United States of America
Represented By
Ronald R Gallegos
Us Attorney'S Office-Okc
contact info
Plaintiff
Kenneth Black
Represented By
Gaylon C Hayes
Hayes & Hollingsworth PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Thursday, June 03, 2021
10 10 1 pgs order Order Thu 06/03 1:47 PM
ORDER this action is dismissed withoutprejudice as to Relator and without prejudice as to the United States. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 6/3/21. (jw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 02, 2021
9 9 2 pgs notice ~Notice (other) Wed 06/02 10:39 AM
NOTICE (other) by United States of America of Consent to Dismissal (Gallegos, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 28, 2021
8 8 misc Sealed Document Fri 05/28 9:42 AM
(Document Restricted)SEALED DOCUMENT by Kenneth Black (Hayes, Gaylon)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 27, 2021
7 7 2 pgs order Order to Unseal Case Thu 05/27 2:46 PM
ORDER that the Complaint be unsealed, as more fully set out. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 5/27/2021. (kah)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 14, 2020
1 1 33 pgs COMPLAINT against A&A Trucking, AM Cohron & Son Inc, APAC-Central, Allen Contracting Inc, Atlas Paving Company, B&B Bridge Company LLC, B&B Construction Services, Becco Contractors Inc, Blue Rock, Bridgeco Contractors Inc, Bridges Inc, Built Right Construction LLC, C-GAWF Construction Inc, C-P Integrated Services Inc, C3 Construction Inc, Cantera Concrete Company, Caswell Contracting Inc, Crossland Construction Company Inc, Cummins Construction Company Inc, Duit Construction Company Inc, Elite Industrial Painting Inc, Evans and Associates Construction Co Inc, Frontier Bridge Inc, Gibson and Associates Inc, Glover & Associates Inc, Greenhill Concrete, Greenhill Materials, H&H Bridge Company, Haskell Lemon Construction Company, Heatland Contracting Services Inc, Highway Contractors Inc, Hub Construction Inc, Interstate Improvements Inc, Iowa Erosion Control Inc, JE Dirt Wurx LLC, JK Industries Inc, JLT Contracting LLC, Jensen Construction Company, Job Construction Company Inc, K&R Builders Inc, KVK Contracting Inc, Keystone Services Inc, Klaver Construction Company Inc, L&N Bridge LLC, Logos Construction Co LLC, MJ Hughes Construction Inc, Manhattan Road & Bridge Company, Markwell Paving Company, Millenial Asphalt, Munoz Construction Inc, OBC Inc, Oklahoma Construction Materials, Overland Corporation, PBX Corporation, Paragon Contractors LLC, Quapaw Company The, RRY Services LLC, Redlands Contracting LLC, Reese Construction Inc, Robin Hausner Housemovers & Demolition LLC, Rudy Construction Co, Schiralli Construction Corp, Schwarz Paving Company Inc, Schwarz Sand LLC, Seal Masters Inc, Sewell Bros Inc, Shell Construction, Sherwood Construction, Silver Star Construction Company Inc, T McDonald Construction Inc, TJ Campbell Construction Company, TTK Construction Company Inc, Tom Hudson Paving Inc, Treas Construction Inc, Tri-City Seal Company, Venture Corporation, Wildcat Concrete Services Inc, Wildcat Construction Co Inc, Wildcat Underground Services Division, Wyatt Construction Company Inc filed by Kenneth Black.(kmt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet