Original Case: 5:20-cv-02164

Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:21-cv-02016
Typecivil / private / diversity
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Case Filed:May 27, 2021
Terminated:Aug 11, 2023
Last checked: Monday Aug 14, 2023 4:23 AM EDT
Amicus Appellee
DREXEL UNIVERSITY
Represented By
Christopher R. Healy
Troutman Pepper
contact info
Michael E. Baughman
Troutman Pepper
contact info
Amicus Appellee
NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF INDEPENDENT COLLEGES AND UNIVERSITIES
Represented By
Jessica L. Ellsworth
Hogan Lovells US
contact info
Nathaniel A.G. Zelinsky
Hogan Lovells US
contact info
Amicus Appellee
NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF STUDENT FINANCIAL AID ADMINISTRATORS
Represented By
Jessica L. Ellsworth
Hogan Lovells US
contact info
Nathaniel A.G. Zelinsky
Hogan Lovells US
contact info
Amicus Appellee
UNITED NEGRO COLLEGE FUND
Represented By
Jessica L. Ellsworth
Hogan Lovells US
contact info
Nathaniel A.G. Zelinsky
Hogan Lovells US
contact info
Amicus Appellee
UNIVERSITY RISK MANAGEMENT AND INSURANCE ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Jessica L. Ellsworth
Hogan Lovells US
contact info
Nathaniel A.G. Zelinsky
Hogan Lovells US
contact info
Amicus Appellee
ASSOCIATION OF INDEPENDENT COLLEGES AND UNIVERSITIES OF PENNSYLVANIA
Represented By
Christopher R. Healy
Troutman Pepper
contact info
Michael E. Baughman
Troutman Pepper
contact info
Amicus Appellee
BRYN MAWR COLLEGE
Represented By
Christopher R. Healy
Troutman Pepper
contact info
Michael E. Baughman
Troutman Pepper
contact info
Amicus Appellee
BUCKNELL UNIVERSITY
Represented By
Christopher R. Healy
Troutman Pepper
contact info
Michael E. Baughman
Troutman Pepper
contact info
Amicus Appellee
CARNEGIE MELLON UNIVERSITY
Represented By
Christopher R. Healy
Troutman Pepper
contact info
Michael E. Baughman
Troutman Pepper
contact info
Amicus Appellee
NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF DIVERSITY OFFICERS IN HIGHER EDUCATION
Represented By
Jessica L. Ellsworth
Hogan Lovells US
contact info
Nathaniel A.G. Zelinsky
Hogan Lovells US
contact info
Amicus Appellee
MARYWOOD UNIVERSITY
Represented By
Christopher R. Healy
Troutman Pepper
contact info
Michael E. Baughman
Troutman Pepper
contact info
Amicus Appellee
MUHLENBERG COLLEGE
Represented By
Christopher R. Healy
Troutman Pepper
contact info
Michael E. Baughman
Troutman Pepper
contact info
Amicus Appellee
SWARTHMORE COLLEGE
Represented By
Christopher R. Healy
Troutman Pepper
contact info
Michael E. Baughman
Troutman Pepper
contact info
Amicus Appellee
THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY
Represented By
Christopher R. Healy
Troutman Pepper
contact info
Michael E. Baughman
Troutman Pepper
contact info
Amicus Appellee
UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA TRUSTEES
Represented By
Christopher R. Healy
Troutman Pepper
contact info
Michael E. Baughman
Troutman Pepper
contact info
Amicus Appellee
VILLANOVA UNIVERSITY
Represented By
Christopher R. Healy
Troutman Pepper
contact info
Michael E. Baughman
Troutman Pepper
contact info
Amicus Appellee
WIDENER UNIVERSITY
Represented By
Christopher R. Healy
Troutman Pepper
contact info
Michael E. Baughman
Troutman Pepper
contact info
Amicus Appellee
NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF COLLEGE AND UNIVERSITY BUSINESS OFFICERS
Represented By
Jessica L. Ellsworth
Hogan Lovells US
contact info
Nathaniel A.G. Zelinsky
Hogan Lovells US
contact info
Amicus Appellee
APPA
Represented By
Jessica L. Ellsworth
Hogan Lovells US
contact info
Nathaniel A.G. Zelinsky
Hogan Lovells US
contact info
Amicus Appellee
ACCREDITATION COUNCIL FOR PHARMACY EDUCATION
Represented By
Jessica L. Ellsworth
Hogan Lovells US
contact info
Nathaniel A.G. Zelinsky
Hogan Lovells US
contact info
Amicus Appellee
AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF COMMUNITY COLLEGES
Represented By
Jessica L. Ellsworth
Hogan Lovells US
contact info
Nathaniel A.G. Zelinsky
Hogan Lovells US
contact info
Amicus Appellee
AMERICAN COUNCIL ON EDUCATION
Represented By
Jessica L. Ellsworth
Hogan Lovells US
contact info
Nathaniel A.G. Zelinsky
Hogan Lovells US
contact info
Amicus Appellee
ASSOCIATION OF CATHOLIC COLLEGES AND UNIVERSITIES
Represented By
Jessica L. Ellsworth
Hogan Lovells US
contact info
Nathaniel A.G. Zelinsky
Hogan Lovells US
contact info
Amicus Appellee
ASSOCIATION OF GOVERNING BOARDS OF UNIVERSITIES AND COLLEGES
Represented By
Jessica L. Ellsworth
Hogan Lovells US
contact info
Nathaniel A.G. Zelinsky
Hogan Lovells US
contact info
Amicus Appellee
ASSOCIATION OF PUBLIC AND LAND-GRANT UNIVERSITIES
Represented By
Jessica L. Ellsworth
Hogan Lovells US
contact info
Nathaniel A.G. Zelinsky
Hogan Lovells US
contact info
Amicus Appellee
COMMISSION ON INDEPENDENT COLLEGES AND UNIVERSITIES
Represented By
Jessica L. Ellsworth
Hogan Lovells US
contact info
Nathaniel A.G. Zelinsky
Hogan Lovells US
contact info
Amicus Appellee
CONSORTIUM OF UNIVERSITIES OF THE WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA
Represented By
Nathaniel A.G. Zelinsky
Hogan Lovells US
contact info
Amicus Appellee
COUNCIL FOR CHRISTIAN COLLEGES & UNIVERSITIES
Represented By
Jessica L. Ellsworth
Hogan Lovells US
contact info
Nathaniel A.G. Zelinsky
Hogan Lovells US
contact info
Amicus Appellee
COUNCIL FOR HIGHER EDUCATION ACCREDITATION
Represented By
Jessica L. Ellsworth
Hogan Lovells US
contact info
Nathaniel A.G. Zelinsky
Hogan Lovells US
contact info
Amicus Appellee
COUNCIL OF INDEPENDENT COLLEGES
Represented By
Jessica L. Ellsworth
Hogan Lovells US
contact info
Nathaniel A.G. Zelinsky
Hogan Lovells US
contact info
Amicus Appellee
NASPA - STUDENT AFFAIRS ADMINISTRATORS IN HIGHER EDUCATION
Represented By
Jessica L. Ellsworth
Hogan Lovells US
contact info
Nathaniel A.G. Zelinsky
Hogan Lovells US
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
TEMPLE UNIVERSITY
Represented By
Burt M. Rublin
Ballard Spahr
contact info
Jessica Davis Khan
Fine Kaplan & Black
contact info
Gerard A. Dever
Fine Kaplan & Black
contact info
Roberta D. Liebenberg
Fine Kaplan & Black
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
BROOKE RYAN, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By
Eric Poulin
Anastopoulo Law Firm
contact info
Nicholas Colella
Lynch Carpenter
contact info
Gary F. Lynch
Carlson Lynch
contact info
Stuart A. Carpey
Kreithen Baron & Carpey
contact info
Jamisen A. Etzel
Lynch Carpenter
contact info
Edward W. Ciolko
Carlson Lynch
contact info
Roy T. Willey IV
Anastopoulo Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
CHRISTINA FUSCA, on behalf of of herself all others similarly situated
Represented By
Eric Poulin
Anastopoulo Law Firm
contact info
Nicholas Colella
Lynch Carpenter
contact info
Gary F. Lynch
Carlson Lynch
contact info
Stuart A. Carpey
Kreithen Baron & Carpey
contact info
Jamisen A. Etzel
Lynch Carpenter
contact info
Edward W. Ciolko
Carlson Lynch
contact info
Roy T. Willey IV
Anastopoulo Law Firm
contact info

GPO Aug 11 2023
PRECEDENTIAL OPINION. Coram: HARDIMAN, KRAUSE and MATEY, Circuit Judges. Total Pages: 29. Judge: KRAUSE Authoring. [21-2013, 21-2016]
GPO Sep 06 2023
ORDER AMENDING OPINION (Coram: HARDIMAN, KRAUSE and MATEY, Circuit Judges) The aforementioned Unopposed Joint Motion of Defendants-Appellees University of Pittsburgh and Temple University to Amend Precedential Opinion is granted, and an amended opinion shall be filed contemporaneously with this order. As the amendment does not alter the Court's judgment, the judgment entered August 11, 2023 will remain as filed. Krause, Authoring Judge. [21-2013, 21-2016]
GPO Sep 06 2023
AMENDED PRECEDENTIAL OPINION Coram: HARDIMAN, KRAUSE and MATEY, Circuit Judges. Total Pages: 29. Authoring Judge: Krause [21-2013, 21-2016]

Docket last updated: 08/14/2023 4:23 AM EDT
Thursday, May 27, 2021
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (AMR)
Related: [-]
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants Christina Fusca and Brooke Ryan in District Court No. 5-20-cv-02164. (AMR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Notice of Appeal
Att: 2 21 pgs District Court Memorandum
Att: 3 1 pgs District Court Order
Att: 4 1 pgs Case Caption
Att: 5 3 pgs Case Opening Letter
1 pgs Appendix Citation Notice sent to Stuart A. Carpey, Esq., Edward W. Ciolko, Esq., Gary F. Lynch, Esq., Eric Poulin, Esq.. If unable to comply you must respond on or before 06/11/2021. (AMR)
Related: [-]