Kansas Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Dale L Somers
Case #: 6:21-bk-10495
Case Filed:May 28, 2021
Terminated:Jan 23, 2025
Plan Confirmed:Nov 28, 2022

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Bear Communications, LLC
725 N 2nd St Ste M
Lawrence, KS 66044-1475
Represented By
Nicholas R Grillot
Hinkle Law Firm, LLC
contact info
W. Thomas Gilman
Hinkle Law Firm, L.L.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee 301 North Main Suite 1150
Wichita, KS 67202
Represented By
Christopher T. Borniger
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Saturday, January 25, 2025
957 957 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 01/25 11:32 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 01/25/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 956 Final Decree
Thursday, January 23, 2025
956 956 order Final Decree Thu 01/23 10:35 AM
Final Decree Signed on 1/23/2025 (waa)
Related: [-]
court Close Bankruptcy Case Thu 01/23 10:39 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (waa)
Related: [-]