California Central District Court
Judge:Virginia A Phillips
Referred: Alicia G Rosenberg
Case #: 2:21-cv-04476
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:May 28, 2021
Terminated:Aug 05, 2021
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 24, 2021 12:55 AM PST
Defendant
Scott Wood
Represented By
Trevor Douglas Large
Fauver Large Archibald And Spray LLP
contact info
Christopher M de la Vega
Fauver Large Archibald And Spray LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
K-4 Oil, LLC
Represented By
Marc L Greenwald
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart And Sullivan LLP
contact info
Bruce E Van Dalsem
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart And Sullivan LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, August 05, 2021
18 18 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Civil Case ~Util - Create Case Association Mon 08/09 4:44 PM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) GRANTING PLAINTIFF SCOTT WOOD'S MOTION FOR CONSOLIDATION OF CASES IN CASE NO. 2:21-CV-4476-VAP-AGRX (DOC. NO. 61) (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: Wood v. Newbridge Resources Group, LLC et al, 2:20-cv-10865-VAP-AGRx consolidated into a single action for all purposes. Case No. 2:20-cv-10865-VAP- AGRx shall serve as the lead case, and Case No. 2:21-cv-4476-VAP-AGRx shall be administratively closed. All documents filed in 2:21-cv-4476-VAP-AGRx is deemed filed in the lead consolidated case. The parties shall now file all future documents in the lead case. IT IS SO ORDERED.(Made JS-6. Case Terminated.), Cases associated with Lead Case 2:20-cv-10865-VAP-AGRx (yl)
Related: [-]
17 17 cs_rasgn Transferring Case purs GO 21-01 (CV-29) Thu 08/05 3:49 PM
ORDER TRANSFERRING CIVIL ACTION pursuant General Order 21-01. ORDER case transferred from Judge Dale S. Fischer to the calendar of Judge Virginia A. Phillips for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-04476 VAP(AGRx). Signed by Judge Dale S. Fischer and Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (rn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 04, 2021
16 16 order Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form Wed 08/04 12:29 PM
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Deputy Clerk of Court. The Document is Accepted; however, the parties must file their Notice of Interested parties no later than 8/12/21.13 AND15 (rfi)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 30, 2021
15 15 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Fri 07/30 3:16 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Scott Wood13 . The following error(s) was/were found: (1) No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. (2) Counsel must comply with Local Rule 7.1-1. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (jp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 29, 2021
14 14 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Thu 07/29 3:13 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Joint Report must include the completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates. Lead trial counsel are ordered to appear in person unless counsel have been excused by the Court. Scheduling Conference set for 8/30/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (rfi)
Related: [-]
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 07/29 2:50 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Scott Wood.(Large, Trevor)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 08, 2021
12 12 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Thu 07/08 2:33 PM
Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Scott Wood answer now due 7/29/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff K-4 Oil, LLC.(Van Dalsem, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 18, 2021
11 11 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Fri 06/18 11:19 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff K-4 Oil, LLC, upon Defendant Scott Wood served on 6/17/2021, answer due 7/8/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Juan Villalobos, Concierge in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Van Dalsem, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 04, 2021
10 10 order Transfer Pursuant to GO 21-01 DECLINED-(related case)(CV-34) Fri 06/04 11:24 AM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01 Related [+] filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Virginia A. Phillips, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:20-cv-10865 VAP (AGRx) (esa)
Related: [-] lated Case
Thursday, June 03, 2021
9 9 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 06/03 1:17 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Scott Wood. (jp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 02, 2021
8 8 notice Summons Request Wed 06/02 1:05 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff K-4 Oil, LLC. (Van Dalsem, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 01, 2021
7 7 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Tue 06/01 1:12 PM
STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (dd)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 06/01 11:33 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 06/01 11:33 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (car)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 28, 2021
4 4 notice Related Case(s) Fri 05/28 2:10 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by plaintiff K-4 Oil, LLC. Related Case(s): 2:20-CV-10865-VAP-AGR (Van Dalsem, Bruce)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 05/28 2:08 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff K-4 Oil, LLC, identifying Svati Limited (corporate parent). (Van Dalsem, Bruce)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 05/28 2:04 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff K-4 Oil, LLC. (Van Dalsem, Bruce)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 05/28 1:58 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31377461 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff K-4 Oil, LLC. (Attorney Bruce E Van Dalsem added to party K-4 Oil, LLC(pty:pla))(Van Dalsem, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 4 pgs Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit