Illinois Central District Court
Judge:Sara Darrow
Referred: Jonathan E Hawley
Case #: 1:21-cv-01166
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Case Filed:May 28, 2021
Terminated:Sep 08, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 24, 2021 3:17 AM CST
Defendant
McDonald's Corporation
Represented By
Edward C Young
Proskauer Rose LLP
contact info
Nigel F Telman
Proskauer Rose LLP
contact info
Defendant
McDonald's USA, LLC.
Represented By
Edward C Young
Proskauer Rose LLP
contact info
Nigel F Telman
Proskauer Rose LLP
contact info
Defendant
Jaxiel Avilla Ramos
Defendant
Zane, Inc.
Defendant
Dennis Gendron
Represented By
Mark F Wolfe
Traub Lieberman Straus & Shrewsberry LLP
contact info
Defendant
Trina Gendron
Represented By
Mark F Wolfe
Traub Lieberman Straus & Shrewsberry LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Sydnee Gann
Represented By
Dennis R Favaro
Favaro & Gorman Ltd
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, September 08, 2022
misc Remark Thu 09/08 9:01 AM
Remark: Case closed pursuant to34 Stipulation of Dismissal. (RES)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 07, 2022
34 34 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 09/07 5:00 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Stipulation to Dismiss by Sydnee Gann. (Favaro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 29, 2022
order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 08/29 10:28 AM
TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to the filing of the33 Status Report, the Court sets a deadline for the filing of a Stipulation to dismiss by 9/16/2022. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 8/29/22. (WG)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 26, 2022
33 33 misc Status Report Fri 08/26 9:58 AM
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Sydnee Gann. (Favaro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 01, 2022
order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 08/01 2:51 PM
TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to the filing of the32 Status Report filed by Sydnee Gann, a Stipulation to dismiss shall be filed by 8/27/2022. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 8/1/22. (WG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 27, 2022
32 32 misc Status Report Wed 07/27 9:57 AM
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Sydnee Gann. (Favaro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 01, 2022
order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 07/01 8:45 AM
TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley: Pursuant to the filing of the31 Status Report filed by Sydnee Gann, a Stipulation to dismiss shall be filed by 7/27/2022. Entered on 7/1/22. (WG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 30, 2022
31 31 misc Status Report Thu 06/30 10:39 AM
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Sydnee Gann. (Favaro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 02, 2022
order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 06/02 8:51 AM
TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to the30 Status Report, the Court sets a further Status Report deadline for 6/30/2022. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 6/2/22. (WG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 01, 2022
30 30 misc Status Report Wed 06/01 1:18 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Sydnee Gann. (Favaro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 12, 2022
order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 05/12 8:57 AM
TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to the filing of the29 Status Report filed by Sydnee Gann, a further Status Report shall be filed by 6/3/2022. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 5/12/22. (WG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 11, 2022
29 29 misc Status Report Wed 05/11 2:17 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Sydnee Gann. (Favaro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 18, 2022
28 28 order Protective Order Mon 04/18 11:22 AM
AGREED CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 4/18/22. (WG)
Related: [-]
order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 04/18 11:11 AM
TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to the filing of the26 Status Report, a further Status Report is due by 5/13/2022. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 4/18/22. (WG)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 15, 2022
27 27 motion Protective Order Fri 04/15 12:24 PM
MOTION for Protective Order Joint Motion for Entry of Agreed Confidentiality Order by Plaintiff Sydnee Gann. Responses due by 4/29/2022 (Favaro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
26 26 misc Status Report Fri 04/15 12:21 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Sydnee Gann. (Favaro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 22, 2022
order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 03/22 2:20 PM
TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to the filing of the25 Status Report by Sydnee Gann, a further Status Report is due by 4/16/2022. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 3/22/22. (WG)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 21, 2022
25 25 misc Status Report Mon 03/21 2:33 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Sydnee Gann. (Favaro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 02, 2022
order Order on Motion to Continue ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 02/02 9:44 AM
TEXT ORDER granting24 Motion to Continue. Further status report due by 3/20/2022. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 2/2/22. (WG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 01, 2022
24 24 motion Continue Tue 02/01 2:39 PM
MOTION to Continue Joint Motion to Continue Stay of Proceedings Pending Outcome of Private Mediation by Plaintiff Sydnee Gann. Responses due by 2/15/2022 (Favaro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 30, 2021
order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 12/30 12:37 PM
TEXT ORDER re23 Joint Status Report: Parties report that mediation is set for 1/26/22 and thus the Court agrees to a Status Report deadline of 2/6/2022. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 12/30/21. (WG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 29, 2021
23 23 misc Status Report Wed 12/29 3:19 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Sydnee Gann. (Favaro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 24, 2021
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Wed 11/24 9:52 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting22 the Plaintiff's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Effect Service of Process. The Plaintiff's deadline to serve Defendant Jaxiel Avilla Ramos is extended to 1/24/2022. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 11/24/21. (WG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 23, 2021
22 22 motion Extension of Time to File Document Tue 11/23 10:56 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Effect Service of Process by Plaintiff Sydnee Gann. Responses due by 12/7/2021 (Favaro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 05, 2021
order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 11/05 8:33 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley: Court having reviewed the21 Status Report, sets a further Status Report deadline for 1/3/2022. Entered on 11/5/21. (WG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 04, 2021
21 21 misc Status Report Thu 11/04 11:05 AM
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Sydnee Gann. (Favaro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 20, 2021
order Order on Motion to Stay Order Staying Case ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 09/20 10:29 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting20 Motion to Stay. CASE STAYED. Status Report due by 11/4/2021. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 9/20/21. (WG)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 17, 2021
20 20 motion Stay Fri 09/17 11:35 AM
First MOTION to Stay The Proceedings to Conduct Mediation by Defendants Dennis Gendron, Trina Gendron. Responses due by 10/1/2021 (Wolfe, Mark)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 26, 2021
order Order on Motion Thu 08/26 9:06 AM
TEXT ORDER granting19 the Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Effect Service of Process. The Plaintiff's deadline to serve Defendant Jaxiel Avilla Ramos is extended to 11/24/2021. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 8/26/2021. (KZ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 25, 2021
19 19 4 pgs motion Order Wed 08/25 11:02 AM
MOTION for Order Motion for Extension of Time to Effect Service of Process by Plaintiff Sydnee Gann. (Favaro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 08/25 10:22 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (UNOPPOSED) by Defendants McDonald's Corporation, McDonald's USA, LLC.. Responses due by 9/8/2021 (Young, Edward)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 08/25 3:18 PM
TEXT ORDER granting17 unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer and18 unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. McDonald's Corporation and McDonald's USA, LLC. shall filed their responsive pleading by 9/10/2021. Defendant Trina Gendron shall file her responsive pleadings by 9/8/2021. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 8/25/21. (WG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 18, 2021
17 17 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 08/18 3:26 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants Dennis Gendron, Trina Gendron. Responses due by 9/1/2021(Wolfe, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance of Attorney Wed 08/18 3:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Mark F Wolfe on behalf of Dennis Gendron, Trina Gendron (Wolfe, Mark)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 05, 2021
15 15 service Summons Returned Executed (21 days to answer) Thu 08/05 3:42 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sydnee Gann. Trina Gendron served on 7/27/2021, answer due 8/17/2021. (Favaro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Summons Returned Executed (21 days to answer) Thu 08/05 3:41 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sydnee Gann. Dennis Gendron served on 7/27/2021, answer due 8/17/2021. (Favaro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 30, 2021
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 07/30 8:34 AM
TEXT ORDER granting13 unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or otherwise plead re Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Defendants McDonald's Corporation and McDonald's USA, LLC.shall file their responsive pleading by 8/27/2021. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 7/30/21. (WG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 29, 2021
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 07/29 10:11 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (UNOPPOSED MOTION) by Defendants McDonald's Corporation, McDonald's USA, LLC.. Responses due by 8/12/2021 (Telman, Nigel)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance of Attorney Thu 07/29 10:08 AM
NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Edward C Young on behalf of McDonald's Corporation, McDonald's USA, LLC. (Young, Edward)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance of Attorney Thu 07/29 10:06 AM
NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Nigel F Telman on behalf of McDonald's Corporation, McDonald's USA, LLC. (Telman, Nigel)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 16, 2021
10 10 service Summons Issued Fri 07/16 3:06 PM
Summons Issued as to Dennis Gendron, Trina Gendron, Jaxiel Avilla Ramos and returned to Attorney to effect service. (ANW)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed (21 days to answer) Fri 07/16 11:06 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sydnee Gann. McDonald's USA, LLC. served on 7/6/2021, answer due 7/27/2021. (Favaro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed (21 days to answer) Fri 07/16 11:05 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sydnee Gann. Zane, Inc. served on 7/8/2021, answer due 7/29/2021. (Favaro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed (21 days to answer) Fri 07/16 11:04 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sydnee Gann. McDonald's Corporation served on 7/6/2021, answer due 7/27/2021. (Favaro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 25, 2021
6 6 service Summons Issued Fri 06/25 8:51 AM
Summons Issued as to McDonald's Corporation, McDonald's USA, LLC., Zane, Inc. and returned to counsel to effect service. (RES)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 24, 2021
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 06/24 2:25 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Sydnee Gann.(Favaro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I
Monday, June 07, 2021
order Order on Motion to Transfer Case Mon 06/07 10:06 AM
TEXT ORDER granting4 Motion to Transfer Case. This matter is transferred from the Peoria division to the Rock Island division of the Central District of Illinois. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 6/7/21. (WG)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 04, 2021
4 4 motion Transfer Case Fri 06/04 1:58 PM
MOTION to Transfer Case by Plaintiff Sydnee Gann. Responses due by 6/18/2021 (Favaro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 02, 2021
order Order Wed 06/02 9:52 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Plaintiff's Complaint1 alleges that: the employment practices alleged to be unlawful were committed within the jurisdiction of the United States District Court for the Central District of Illinois, Peoria Division; and, "[t]his Court also has jurisdiction and venue, for the parties resided and did business in this District and the acts and transactions alleged occurred within this District." (Doc. 1 at pg. 2). Additional allegations provide that during the events alleged in the Complaint, the Plaintiff "was employed by the defendants at its restaurant located at 315 South Tenney Street, Kewanee, Henry County, Illinois." Id. at pg. 4. Local Rule 40.1(C) provides, in relevant part, that "All complaints and subsequent filings in cases which arise from the following counties:... Henry... will be filed at ROCK ISLAND, ILLINOIS." CDIL-LR 40.1(C). Accordingly, the Plaintiff is ordered to show cause in writing, by 6/9/2021, why this case should not be transferred to the Rock Island Division of the U.S. District Court for the Central District of Illinois. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 6/2/2021. (KZ)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 28, 2021
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Fri 05/28 4:28 PM
NOTICE Civil Cover Sheet (Favaro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance of Attorney Fri 05/28 4:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Dennis R Favaro on behalf of Sydnee Gann (Favaro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
1 1 85 pgs cmp Attorney Complaint Fri 05/28 4:18 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILCDC-3677037.), filed by Sydnee Gann.(Favaro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G