New York Western District Court
Judge:Lawrence J Vilardo
Case #: 1:21-cv-00675
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause29:621 Job Discrimination (Age)
Case Filed:May 26, 2021
Terminated:Mar 31, 2022
Last checked: Monday Nov 22, 2021 3:33 AM EST
Defendant
Kelly Grobe
Defendant
SDN Insurance Agency, LLC
Defendant
Cathy Scherrer
Plaintiff
Anita M. Lewczyk
6448 Rapids Rd
Lockport, NY 14094


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, March 31, 2022
3 3 order Judgment Thu 03/31 11:18 AM
JUDGMENT dismissing the matter without prejudice under Rule 4(m) and the case is closed. Signed by Clerk on 3/31/22. Clerk mailed copy to pro se plaintiff. (JHF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 23, 2021
2 2 order Text Order Thu 09/23 10:35 AM
NOTICE BEFORE DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO EFFECT SERVICE The pro se plaintiff, Anita M. Lewczyk, filed this action on 5/26/2021. Docket Item 1 . Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure provides: "If a defendant is not served within 90 days after the complaint is filed, the court--on motion or on its own after notice to the plaintiff--must dismiss the action without prejudice against that defendant or order that service be made within a specified time. But if the plaintiff shows good cause for the failure, the court must extend the time for service for an appropriate period." Id. The time to effect service now has elapsed. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Lewczyk shall show cause within 30 days of the date of this order why this matter should not be dismissed for failure to timely effect service. She may do so by providing "good reasons" for the failure to effect service. Lewczyk also may request that this Court direct the United States Marshals Service to effect service. See https://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/sites/nywd/files/ProSe_Forms_U.S.Marshal%20Service%20Info%20and%20Request_4_2014.pdf. If Lewczyk does not respond to this order within 30 days, the matter shall be dismissed without prejudice under Rule 4(m), and the Clerk of the Court shall close this case without further order. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 9/23/2021. (WMH) (Chambers mailed a copy of this order to the pro se plaintiff.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 26, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 05/28 12:37 PM
COMPLAINT against Kelly Grobe, SDN Insurance Agency, LLC, Cathy Scherrer filed by Anita M. Lewczyk. (JLV)
Related: [-]
misc Filing Fee Received Fri 05/28 12:38 PM
Filing fee received: $402.00, receipt number BUF072170. (JLV)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Fri 05/28 12:39 PM
Plaintiff has been given a pro se packet including a privacy notice, consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge, Civil Case Timeline, Pro Se Assistance Program Information and ADR Notification. (JLV)
Related: [-]
adr Automatic Referral to Mediation Fri 05/28 12:40 PM
AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at[LINK:http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution] . (JLV)
Related: [-]
service Summons Issued Fri 05/28 12:44 PM
Summons Issued as to Kelly Grobe, SDN Insurance Agency, LLC, Cathy Scherrer. (JLV)
Related: [-]