Florida Southern District Court
Case #: 1:21-cr-20259
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2021
Last checked: Saturday May 29, 2021 3:19 AM EDT
Defendant
Rene Pedrosa (1)
Represented By
Enrique Lazaro Yabor
Law Office Of Rick Yabor, P.A.
contact info
Susy Elena Ribero-Ayala
Susy Ribero-Ayala, P.A.
contact info
Armando Hernandez
Martin & Hernandez LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Annika Marie Miranda
United States Attorney'S Office - Sdfl
contact info
Jessica Kahn Obenauf
contact info

GPO Sep 09 2022
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 63 Defendant's MOTION to Suppress and/or in Limine, or in the Alternative, Motion to Sever. Objections to R&R due by 9/16/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 9/9/2022. See attached document for full details. (dw00)
GPO May 16 2023
ORDER Adopting 126 Report and Recommendations, Denying 63 Motion to Suppress, and Excluding Intent Evidence. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 5/16/2023. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
GPO Jan 31 2024
ORDER denying 186 Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment 821/782 - 18:3582 as to Rene Pedrosa (1). Signed by Senior Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 1/31/2024. See attached document for full details. (cqs)

Docket last updated: 05/29/2021 4:57 AM EDT
Monday, March 23, 2020
1 1 MOTION to File Complaint Under Seal by USA as to Rene Pedrosa. (yha) Modified on 4/24/2020 (dgj). [1:20-mj-02478-LFL]
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER granting1 Motion to File Complaint Under Seal as to Rene Pedrosa (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis on 3/23/2020. See attached document for full details. (yha) Modified on 4/24/2020 (dgj). [1:20-mj-02478-LFL]
Related: [-]
3 3 CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Rene Pedrosa (1). (yha) Modified on 4/24/2020 (dgj). [1:20-mj-02478-LFL]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 26, 2020
5 5 ORDER UNSEALING CASE as to Rene Pedrosa. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis on 3/25/2020. See attached document for full details. (sl) (Main Document 5 replaced on 3/30/2020) (Omisca, Nerly). Modified date filed on 3/30/2020 (Omisca, Nerly). Modified on 4/24/2020 (dgj). [1:20-mj-02478-LFL]
Related: [-]
6 6 Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis: Initial Appearance as to Rene Pedrosa held on 3/26/2020 (Defendant appeared via video conference). Date of Arrest or Surrender: 3/25/20. Case unsealed. Armando Hernandez filed a notice of temporary appearance. Preliminary Examination/Arraignment set for 4/2/2020 01:30 PM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate. Detention Hearing set for 4/2/2020 01:30 PM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate. Report Re: Counsel Hearing set for 4/2/2020 01:30 PM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate. Attorney added: Armando Hernandez for Rene Pedrosa (Digital 13:44:20, 14:11:10, 14:12:03, 14:21:22) Signed by Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis on 3/26/2020. (sl) Modified on 4/24/2020 (dgj). [1:20-mj-02478-LFL]
Related: [-]
7 7 NOTICE OF TEMPORARY ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Armando Hernandez appearing for Rene Pedrosa (sl) Modified on 4/24/2020 (dgj). [1:20-mj-02478-LFL]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 30, 2020
8 8 United States Unoposed MOTION for Protective Order Regulating Disclosure of Victim Information and Personal Identifying Information by USA as to Rene Pedrosa. Responses due by 4/13/2020 (nf) Modified on 4/24/2020 (dgj). [1:20-mj-02478-LFL]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER granting8 Motion for Protective Order as to Rene Pedrosa (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 3/30/2020. See attached document for full details. (nf) Modified on 4/24/2020 (dgj). [1:20-mj-02478-LFL]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 02, 2020
Reset Hearings as to Rene Pedrosa: Arraignment reset for 4/3/2020 01:30 PM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate. Detention Hearing reset for 4/3/2020 01:30 PM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate. Preliminary Examination reset for 4/3/2020 01:30 PM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate. Report Re: Counsel Hearing reset for 4/3/2020 01:30 PM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate. (cg1) Modified on 4/24/2020 (dgj). [1:20-mj-02478-LFL]
Related: [-]
10 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan: Status Conference re: report re: counsel/preliminary/arraignment/detention as to Rene Pedrosa held on 4/2/2020. (Arraignment reset for 4/3/2020 01:30 PM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate. Detention Hearing reset for 4/3/2020 01:30 PM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate. Preliminary Examination reset for 4/3/2020 01:30 PM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate. Report Re: Counsel Hearing reset for 4/3/2020 01:30 PM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate.) (Digital N/A) (cg1) Modified on 4/24/2020 (dgj). [1:20-mj-02478-LFL]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 03, 2020
11 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan: Report Re Counsel Hearing as to Rene Pedrosa held on 4/3/2020. Preliminary Hearing as to Rene Pedrosa held on 4/3/2020. Detention Hearing as to Rene Pedrosa held on 4/3/2020; Witness Daniel Alfin - S/A - FBI testified. Bond set: Rene Pedrosa (1) Court set $200,000 Psb. (Arraignment reset for 4/24/2020 02:00 PM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate. Report Re: Counsel Hearing reset for 4/24/2020 02:00 PM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate.) (Digital 13:37:57) (cg1) Modified on 4/24/2020 (dgj). [1:20-mj-02478-LFL]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 06, 2020
12 12 $200,000.00 PSB Bond Entered as to Rene Pedrosa Approved by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan. Please see bond image for conditions of release. (cg1) (ra). Modified on 4/24/2020 (dgj). [1:20-mj-02478-LFL]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (4/7/2020) Restricted Bond with 5th Page
Friday, April 10, 2020
Set/Reset Hearings as to Rene Pedrosa: **TIME CHANGE ONLY** Arraignment reset for 4/24/2020 01:30 PM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate. Preliminary Examination trset for 4/24/2020 01:30 PM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate. Report Re: Counsel Hearing trset for 4/24/2020 01:30 PM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate. (cg1) Modified on 4/24/2020 (dgj). [1:20-mj-02478-LFL]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 17, 2020
13 13 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Enrique Lazaro Yabor appearing for Rene Pedrosa . Attorney Enrique Lazaro Yabor added to party Rene Pedrosa(pty:dft). (Yabor, Enrique) Modified on 4/24/2020 (dgj). [1:20-mj-02478-LFL]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 20, 2020
14 14 MOTION for Speedy Trial Tolling Due to Covid-19 by USA as to Rene Pedrosa. Responses due by 5/4/2020 (Johannes, Vanessa) Modified on 4/24/2020 (dgj). [1:20-mj-02478-LFL]
Related: [-]
15 15 RESPONSE in Support by Rene Pedrosa re14 MOTION for Speedy Trial Tolling Due to Covid-19 (Yabor, Enrique) Modified on 4/24/2020 (dgj). [1:20-mj-02478-LFL]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 22, 2020
Terminate Deadlines and Hearings as to Rene Pedrosa (cg1) Modified on 4/24/2020 (dgj). [1:20-mj-02478-LFL]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 24, 2020
16 16 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra: Telephonic Status Conference as to Rene Pedrosa held on 4/24/2020. Attorney Appearance(s): Vanessa S. Johannes, Enrique Lazaro Yabor, (Digital JB_01_4 24-2020 (dgj) Modified on 4/24/2020 (dgj). [1:20-mj-02478-LFL]
Related: [-]
17 17 Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra: Status Conference Re: Arraignment as to Rene Pedrosa held on 4/24/2020. Defendant WAIVES presence to appear in person. Defendant WAIVES preliminary examination and arraignment via phone. (Preliminary Examination / Arraignment RESET for 7/10/2020 10:00 AM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate). (Digital JB 01-0424 2020 via ZOOM) Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra on 4/24/2020. (mdc) [1:20-mj-02478-LFL]
Related: [-]
18 18 ORDER Tolling Speedy Trial Act Indictment Time Period due to COVID-19 as to Rene Pedrosa. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra on 4/24/2020. See attached document for full details. (mdc) [1:20-mj-02478-LFL]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 07, 2020
PAPERLESS NOTICE RESETTING HEARINGS as to Rene Pedrosa: **TIME CHANGE ONLY** Arraignment reset for 7/10/2020 01:30 PM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate. Preliminary Examination reset for 7/10/2020 01:30 PM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate. (cg1) [1:20-mj-02478-LFL]
Related: [-]
Friday, July 10, 2020
19 19 NOTICE of Compliance with Discovery Requirements by USA as to Rene Pedrosa (Johannes, Vanessa) [1:20-mj-02478-LFL]
Related: [-]
20 20 Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis: Status Prelim/Arraignment as to Rene Pedrosa held on 7/10/2020., ( Arraignment RESET for 11/6/2020 AT 01:30 PM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate., Preliminary Examination RESET for 11/6/2020 AT 01:30 PM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate.)The Court finds that in the interest of Justice the time from today thru 11/6/20 is excluded from the Speedy Trial Clock. (Digital 14:02:26) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis on 7/10/2020). (at) [1:20-mj-02478-LFL]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 21, 2020
Reset Hearings as to Rene Pedrosa: **TIME CHANGE ONLY** Arraignment reset for 11/6/2020 01:00 PM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate. Preliminary Examination reset for 11/6/2020 01:00 PM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate. (cg1) [1:20-mj-02478-LFL]
Related: [-]
Friday, October 30, 2020
21 21 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Hearing Scheduled for November 6, 2020 by Rene Pedrosa. Responses due by 11/13/2020 (Yabor, Enrique) [1:20-mj-02478-LFL]
Related: [-]
22 22 PAPERLESS ORDER granting21 Motion to Continue as to Rene Pedrosa (1). Arraignment reset for 1/6/2021 01:30 PM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate. Preliminary Examination reset for 1/6/2021 01:30 PM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis on 10/30/2020. (yha) [1:20-mj-02478-LFL]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 17, 2020
Set/Reset Hearings as to Rene Pedrosa: **TIME CHANGE ONLY** Arraignment set for 1/6/2021 10:00 AM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate. Preliminary Examination set for 1/6/2021 10:00 AM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate. (dgj) [1:20-mj-02478-LFL]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 05, 2021
23 23 NOTICE of Reassignment of Assistant US Attorney. Jessica Kahn Obenauf appearing for USA. Vanessa S. Johannes terminated. Attorney Jessica Kahn Obenauf added to party USA(pty:pla). (Obenauf, Jessica) [1:20-mj-02478-LFL]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 06, 2021
24 24 Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra: Status Conference Re: Preliminary Arraignment as to Rene Pedrosa held on 1/6/2021. Parties request continuance. ( Preliminary Examination / Arraignment RESET for 2/8/2021 10:00 AM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate). (Digital JB-01:1-6-21-ZOOM-10:16 am) Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra on 1/6/2021. (mdc) [1:20-mj-02478-LFL]
Related: [-]
Monday, February 08, 2021
25 25 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes: Status re Arraignment as to Rene Pedrosa held on 2/8/2021. Govt req 30 day cont. Court granted. Deft appeared by phone. Deft waived personal appearance. Preliminary hrg held on 4/3/2020. ( Arraignment set for 3/10/2021 10:00 AM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate.). (Digital 10:02:24) (dgj) [1:20-mj-02478-LFL]
Related: [-]
Monday, February 15, 2021
26 26 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Susy Elena Ribero-Ayala appearing for Rene Pedrosa AS CO-COUNSEL OF RECORD . Attorney Susy Elena Ribero-Ayala added to party Rene Pedrosa(pty:dft). (Ribero-Ayala, Susy) [1:20-mj-02478-LFL]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 08, 2021
27 27 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Arraignment by Rene Pedrosa. Responses due by 3/22/2021 (Yabor, Enrique) [1:20-mj-02478-LFL]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 09, 2021
28 28 PAPERLESS ORDER granting27 Motion to Continue as to Rene Pedrosa (1). Arraignment reset for 4/6/2021 10:00 AM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 3/9/2021. (cg1) [1:20-mj-02478-LFL]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 18, 2021
29 29 NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF CO-COUNSEL OF RECORD by Rene Pedrosa for dates of 4/9/21 through 4/19/21 (Ribero-Ayala, Susy) [1:20-mj-02478-LFL]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 05, 2021
30 30 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Hearing Scheduled for April 6, 2021 by Rene Pedrosa. Responses due by 4/19/2021 (Yabor, Enrique) [1:20-mj-02478-LFL]
Related: [-]
31 31 PAPERLESS ORDER granting30 Motion to Continue as to Rene Pedrosa (1). Preliminary Examination set for 5/7/2021 10:00 AM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate. Arraignment reset for 5/7/2021 10:00 AM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 4/5/2021. (sl) [1:20-mj-02478-LFL]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 29, 2021
32 32 INDICTMENT as to Rene Pedrosa (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3 and Forfeiture Allegations. (br) (ra).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (4/30/2021) Restricted Unredacted Indictment